Skolkin v. Shorefront Operating LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rita Skolkin
Defendant: Shorefront Operating LLC, Shorefront Realty LLC, Sentosacare LLC, Excelsior Care Group LLC, Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Leah Friedman, Esther Farkovitz, Avi Philipson, Berish Rubinstein, David Rubinstein, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick, Bent Philipson, Benjamin Landa, Deena Landa and Does 1-25
Case Number: 1:2022cv07664
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: James R Cho
2 Judge: Peggy Kuo
3 Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Letter MOTION to Stay filed by Rita Skolkin. (Blankinship, D.)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Rita Skolkin. (Blankinship, D.)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Excelsior Care Group LLC, Leah Friedman, Benjamin Landa, Deena Landa, Avi Philipson, Bent Philipson, Berish Rubinstein, David Rubinstein, Sentosacare LLC, Shorefront Operating LLC, Shorefront Realty LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Semlies, Lori)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Request for Certificate of Default by Rita Skolkin (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affirmation of D. Greg Blankinship, #2 Exhibit A - Skolkin Complaint ECF No. 1, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service of all Defendants, #4 Exhibit C - Order Granting Defendants Motion For An Extension Of Time To Respond To The Complaint, #5 Proposed Judgment Certificate of Default) (Blankinship, D.)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: By 3/8/2023, plaintiff is directed to respond to Dkt. #28 Letter Motion to Stay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/1/2023. (SG)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter MOTION to Stay by Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Excelsior Care Group LLC, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Benjamin Landa, Deena Landa, Avi Philipson, Bent Philipson, Berish Rubinstein, David Rubinstein, Sentosacare LLC, Shorefront Operating LLC, Shorefront Realty LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick. (Semlies, Lori)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Shaindy Berko served on 1/31/2023, answer due 3/1/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Rita Skolkin. (Blankinship, D.)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Shorefront Operating LLC. (Semlies, Lori)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Excelsior Care Group LLC, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Benjamin Landa, Deena Landa, Avi Philipson, Bent Philipson, Berish Rubinstein, David Rubinstein, Sentosacare LLC, Shorefront Operating LLC, Shorefront Realty LLC, Bruscha Singer, and Joel Zupnick shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 3/1/2023. If the Law Firm Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman, & Dicker, LLP intends to represent the defendants in this action, counsel shall file a notice of appearance for each defendant represented. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/20/2023. (SG)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Benjamin Landa served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Bent Philipson served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Joel Zupnick served on 12/30/2022, answer due 1/20/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Bruscha Singer served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. David Rubinstein served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Berish Rubinstein served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Avi Philipson served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Esther Farkovitz served on 1/7/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Deena Landa served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Leah Friedman served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Rochel David served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Shaindy Berko served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Excelsior Care Group LLC served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Sentosacare LLC served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Shorefront Realty LLC served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Skolkin. Shorefront Operating LLC served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023. (Blankinship, D.)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho for pretrial purposes. The telephonic initial conference previously scheduled for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 a.m. will proceed as scheduled. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 3/28/2023. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (SG)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter (Notice Regarding Related Cases) by Shorefront Operating LLC (Semlies, Lori)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho (as related to 19-cv-3541) for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/27/2022. (KD)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter Notice of Related Case and Request for Re-Assignment by Rita Skolkin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chow Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Skolkin Class Action Complaint) (Blankinship, D.)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on March 30, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By March 24, 2023, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/16/2022. (RO)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shaindy Berko, Rochel David, Does 1-25, Excelsior Care Group LLC, Esther Farkovitz, Leah Friedman, Benjamin Landa, Deena Landa, Avi Philipson, Bent Philipson, Berish Rubinstein, David Rubinstein, Sentosacare LLC, Shorefront Operating LLC, Shorefront Realty LLC, Bruscha Singer, Joel Zupnick filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16236130 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Rita Skolkin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Blankinship, D.) (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/16/2022) (SR). (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/16/2022) (SR). (Attachment 5 replaced on 12/16/2022) (SR).
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skolkin v. Shorefront Operating LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Skolkin
Represented By: D. Greg Blankinship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorefront Operating LLC
Represented By: Lori Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorefront Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentosacare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excelsior Care Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaindy Berko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Farkovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Philipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berish Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruscha Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Zupnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bent Philipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deena Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?