Unique Logistics International (NYC), LLC v. Williams-Sonoma, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unique Logistics International (NYC), LLC
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma, Inc. and Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2022cv07826
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order /Joint Proposed Civil Case Management Plan, by Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (Skopec, Allison)
January 29, 2023 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Unique Logistics International (NYC), LLC (Ross, Steven)
January 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jordan Robinson on behalf of Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Robinson, Benjamin)
January 19, 2023 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin R. Robinson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16284058. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16320812 (Robinson, Benjamin)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYED homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/13/2023. (MG)
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin R. Robinson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16284058. by Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd., Williams-Sonoma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Robinson, Benjamin)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 2/22/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 2/7/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/30/2022.(MG)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Nolan, Christopher)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
December 28, 2022 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
December 28, 2022 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
December 28, 2022 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (KD)
December 28, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Nicole Skopec on behalf of Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Skopec, Allison)
December 26, 2022 Filing 4 Letter dated December 26, 2022 to Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court re: revised Civil Cover Sheet by Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Revised) Civil Cover Sheet) (Skopec, Allison)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Williams-Sonoma Jersey 2 I.L.P. for Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd.. (Nolan, Christopher)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (Nolan, Christopher)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 724769/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16255878) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nolan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unique Logistics International (NYC), LLC v. Williams-Sonoma, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unique Logistics International (NYC), LLC
Represented By: Steven Benjamin Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Rocco Nolan
Represented By: Allison Nicole Skopec
Represented By: Benjamin Jordan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma Singapore PTE Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Rocco Nolan
Represented By: Allison Nicole Skopec
Represented By: Benjamin Jordan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?