Portillo v. Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC et al
Plaintiff: Silvestre Portillo, Roberto Macario and Jesus Villegas
Defendant: Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC doing business as Szechuan Mountain House, Junping Ren, East Village Grand Sichuan Inc., Grand Sichuan International St Marks Inc., Dashan Inc., ABC Companies 1-10 and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv02130
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nina R Morrison
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Silvestre Portillo, Roberto Macario. Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC served on 4/10/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 14, 2023 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Joint Status Report Order served on All Defendants on April 12th and April 13th, filed by Roberto Macario. (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 12, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Villegas, Silvestre Portillo, Roberto Macario. Grand Sichuan International St Marks Inc. served on 4/7/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 12, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Macario. Dashan Inc. served on 4/7/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 12, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Silvestre Portillo, Roberto Macario. East Village Grand Sichuan Inc. served on 4/7/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS REPORT ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, on or before 8/21/2023, the parties in this FLSA action will file a joint status report regarding the outcome of their compliance with the herein instructions for preliminary discovery and informal settlement discussions. In addition to appearing parties' submission of the joint status report as directed herein, in the event that any Defendant has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiffs must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address for such Defendant and file proof on ECF by the status report filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/11/2023. (GS)
April 4, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Junping Ren, Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC. (JC)
April 3, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. by Roberto Macario, Silvestre Portillo, Jesus Villegas (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 3, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Dashan Inc., East Village Grand Sichuan Inc., Grand Sichuan International St Marks Inc. (JC)
April 1, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jesus Villegas (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 1, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jesus Villegas (Aronauer, Jacob)
April 1, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Roberto Macario (Aronauer, Jacob)
March 31, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Roberto Macario, Silvestre Portillo, Jesus Villegas (Aronauer, Jacob)
March 31, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Junping Ren, Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC, Jesus Villegas, East Village Grand Sichuan Inc., Grand Sichuan International St Marks Inc., Dashan Inc., ABC Companies 1-10, John Does 1-10, filed by Roberto Macario. (Aronauer, Jacob)
March 27, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Silvestre Portillo (Aronauer, Jacob)
March 22, 2023 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR)
March 22, 2023 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR)
March 22, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Junping Ren) (SR)
March 22, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Silvestre Portillo (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Pollack, Yale)
March 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Nina R. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR)
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Silvestre Portillo (Pollack, Yale)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Junping Ren, Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16514924 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Silvestre Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pollack, Yale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portillo v. Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvestre Portillo
Represented By: Jacob Aronauer
Represented By: Yale Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Macario
Represented By: Jacob Aronauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Szechuan Mountain House NY LLC doing business as Szechuan Mountain House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junping Ren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Village Grand Sichuan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Sichuan International St Marks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dashan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?