In Re Horizon Bancorp, Inc. Stockholder Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: Sally Hundley and Aziz Chowdhury
Defendant: Craig M. Dwight, Mark E. Secor, Susan D. Aaron, Eric P. Blackhurst, Lawrence E. Burnell, James B. Dworkin, Julie Scheck Freigang, Michele M. Magnuson, Peter L. Pairitz, Steven William Reed, Spero W. Valavanis and Horizon Bancorp, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv06423
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James R Cho
2 Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/26/2023. (TLH)
October 26, 2023 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Staying Consolidated Action by Aziz Chowdhury. (Stone, Erica)
October 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 26, 2023, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda D. Danelczyk, Telephone number 718-613-2330. Email address: LindaDan226@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 11/16/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2024. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-06423-BMC, 1:23-cv-06555-BMC (Danelczyk, Linda)
October 2, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Luc W. M. Mitchell on behalf of Susan D. Aaron, Eric P. Blackhurst, Lawrence E. Burnell, Craig M. Dwight, James B. Dworkin, Julie Scheck Freigang, Horizon Bancorp, Inc., Michele M. Magnuson, Peter L. Pairitz, Steven William Reed, Mark E. Secor, Spero W. Valavanis (aty to be noticed) (Mitchell, Luc)
October 2, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Parlovecchio on behalf of Susan D. Aaron, Eric P. Blackhurst, Lawrence E. Burnell, Craig M. Dwight, James B. Dworkin, Julie Scheck Freigang, Horizon Bancorp, Inc., Michele M. Magnuson, Peter L. Pairitz, Steven William Reed, Mark E. Secor, Spero W. Valavanis (aty to be noticed) (Parlovecchio, Gina)
October 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph DeSimone on behalf of Susan D. Aaron, Eric P. Blackhurst, Lawrence E. Burnell, Craig M. Dwight, James B. Dworkin, Julie Scheck Freigang, Horizon Bancorp, Inc., Michele M. Magnuson, Peter L. Pairitz, Steven William Reed, Mark E. Secor, Spero W. Valavanis (aty to be noticed) (DeSimone, Joseph)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING DERIVATIVE ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND DECONSOLIDATING FROM SECURITIES CLASS ACTION. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/29/2023. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-06423-BMC, 1:23-cv-06555-BMC (TLH)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING DERIVATIVE ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND DECONSOLIDATING FROM SECURITIES CLASS ACTION by Sally Hundley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GPM Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - RLF Firm Resume) (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
September 26, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L. Stone on behalf of Aziz Chowdhury (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-02961-BMC, 1:23-cv-06423-BMC, 1:23-cv-06555-BMC (Stone, Erica)
September 26, 2023 Minute Entry and Order for Status Conference held on 9/26/2023 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties appeared by videoconference. Parties shall file a stipulation regarding deconsolidation by 9/27/2023. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Linda Danelczyk.) Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-02961-BMC, 1:23-cv-06423-BMC, 1:23-cv-06555-BMC (PW)
September 22, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Craig M. Dwight, Horizon Bancorp, Inc., Mark E. Secor, filed by Chad Key.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-02961-BMC, 1:23-cv-06423-BMC, 1:23-cv-06555-BMC (Tourek, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Status Conference on 9/26/2023 at 11:30 AM by video. A ZoomGov link will be emailed to counsel of record. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2023. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-02961-BMC, 1:23-cv-06423-BMC, 1:23-cv-06555-BMC (PW)
September 21, 2023 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. (KD)
September 21, 2023 Cases associated. (TLH)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate In re Horizon Bancorp, Inc. Sec. Litig., No. 1:23-cv-02961, Hundley v. Dwight, No. 1:23-cv-06423 and Chowdhury v. Dwight, No. 1:23-cv-06555. The parties are advised that future filings shall be filed in the lead case In re Horizon Bancorp, Inc. Sec. Litig., No. 1:23-cv-02961 and "spread" to the member cases, thus avoiding the need for separate filings. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2023. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-02961-BMC, 1:23-cv-06423-BMC, 1:23-cv-06555-BMC (TLH)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan (as related to 23-cv-2961) for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/21/2023. (KD)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 Letter re related case by Susan D. Aaron, Eric P. Blackhurst, Lawrence E. Burnell, Craig M. Dwight, James B. Dworkin, Julie Scheck Freigang, Horizon Bancorp, Inc., Michele M. Magnuson, Peter L. Pairitz, Steven William Reed, Mark E. Secor, Spero W. Valavanis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - letter-motion) (DeSimone, Joseph)
August 30, 2023 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR)
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR)
August 30, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR)
August 30, 2023 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Sally Hundley (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan D. Aaron, Eric P. Blackhurst, Lawrence E. Burnell, Craig M. Dwight, James B. Dworkin, Julie Scheck Freigang, Horizon Bancorp, Inc., Michele M. Magnuson, Peter L. Pairitz, Steven William Reed, Mark E. Secor, Spero W. Valavanis filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17030761 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sally Hundley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Horizon Bancorp, Inc. Stockholder Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Hundley
Represented By: Benjamin Isaac Sachs-Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz Chowdhury
Represented By: Erica L. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig M. Dwight
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Secor
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan D. Aaron
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P. Blackhurst
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E. Burnell
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Dworkin
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Scheck Freigang
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele M. Magnuson
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter L. Pairitz
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven William Reed
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spero W. Valavanis
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph DeSimone
Represented By: Gina Marie Parlovecchio
Represented By: Luc W. M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?