Morris v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Isaiah Morris
Defendant: City of New York, New York City Department of Homeless Services and Westhab, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv08281
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by George Peter Cornell (Cornell, George)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants request, with plaintiff's consent, an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. ECF Nos. #17 , #18 . The request is granted. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by February 26, 2024. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case pursuant to EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. The parties may consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this action. If all parties consent, they should fill out, sign, and file the consent form available at ECF No. #2 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/21/2023. (VP)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Westhab, Inc.. (O'Sullivan, Cara)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of New York, New York City Department of Homeless Services. (Teszler, Eric)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William Doheny on behalf of Westhab, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Doheny, William)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Ann O'Sullivan on behalf of Westhab, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (O'Sullivan, Cara)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Teszler on behalf of City of New York, New York City Department of Homeless Services (aty to be noticed) (Teszler, Eric)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isaiah Morris. Westhab, Inc. served on 12/1/2023, answer due 12/25/2023. (Ogden, Jessica)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isaiah Morris. New York City Department of Homeless Services served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Ogden, Jessica)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isaiah Morris. City of New York served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Ogden, Jessica)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to City of New York, New York City Department of Homeless Services, Westhab, Inc.. (CV)
November 17, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Isaiah Morris (Ogden, Jessica)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ogden on behalf of Isaiah Morris (aty to be noticed) (Ogden, Jessica)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Stephenson on behalf of Isaiah Morris (aty to be noticed) (Stephenson, Anne)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Isaiah Morris (Duke, Peter)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Isaiah Morris (Duke, Peter)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Isaiah Morris (Duke, Peter)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (KD)
November 8, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
November 8, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, New York City Department of Homeless Services, Westhab, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17262127 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Isaiah Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Duke, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Morris
Represented By: Peter Benjamin DeWitt Duke
Represented By: Anne Stephenson
Represented By: Jessica Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Eric M. Teszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Homeless Services
Represented By: Eric M. Teszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhab, Inc.
Represented By: Cara Ann O'Sullivan
Represented By: William Doheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?