Malichi v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Malichi
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv08628
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Hector Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell Carr Dvorak on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Dvorak, Maxwell)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris)
January 17, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris)
January 17, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownstein, Boris)
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court declines to adopt the proposed case management plan filed by Plaintiff, which Plaintiff represents that Defendants did not participate in preparing because Defendants have not yet appeared. See ECF No. #8 . Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is January 19, 2024. Plaintiff shall attempt to confer with Defendants, and the parties shall file a jointly proposed case management plan and joint letter describing the case by that date.The Court likely will not provide the parties the approximately six months of fact discovery requested in Plaintiff's proposed case management plan unless the parties explain with specificity in their joint letter why they need more than 90 days to complete fact discovery. If the parties do not submit a jointly proposed case management plan by January 19, 2024, then the Court will promptly enter a discovery schedule allowing no more than 90 days for fact discovery without seeking further input from the parties. As the Court stated in its prior order, although the Court will be amenable to a reasonable extension of Defendants' deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, the Court will require the parties to demonstrate additional good cause to adjourn the deadline for filing the joint letter and proposed case management plan required by this order because the Court does not need Defendants' answers to set a discovery schedule. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 1/3/2024. (BH)
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order by Jonathan Malichi, Letter by Jonathan Malichi (Attachments: #1 Letter describing the case) (Babad, Eliyahu)
December 26, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan Malichi. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Babad, Eliyahu)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan Malichi. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Babad, Eliyahu)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by January 2, 2024, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Plaintiff's counsel shall notify Defendants' counsel of this scheduling order, in writing, as soon as reasonably possible.Although the Court will be amenable to a reasonable extension of Defendants' deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, the Court will require the parties to demonstrate additional good cause to adjourn the deadline for filing the joint letter and proposed case management plan required by this order because the Court does not need Defendants' answers to set a discovery schedule. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 11/27/2023. (BH)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT pursuant to the Court's November 27, 2023 Order for Plaintiff to describe Plaintiff's efforts to serve Plaintiff's complaint and a summons on each Defendant by Jonathan Malichi (Babad, Eliyahu)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (AF)
November 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AF)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a letter no longer than three pages on or before December 11, 2023, describing Plaintiff's efforts to serve Plaintiff's complaint and a summons on each Defendant. If Plaintiff fails to file the letter required by this order, or if Plaintiff's letter demonstrates a lack of diligence in attempting service, then the Court is unlikely to extend the deadline for Plaintiff to complete service under Rule 4(m) in the absence of unusual circumstances demonstrating good cause.The Court will not extend the deadline for Plaintiff to file the letter required by this order unless Plaintiff requests an extension in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 11/27/2023. (BH)
November 27, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint. The plaintiff's name is incorrectly spelled. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (AF)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan Malichi. Trans Union, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Babad, Eliyahu)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17304673 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Jonathan Malichi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendants, #2 Supplement Summons Rider, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Babad, Eliyahu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malichi v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Malichi
Represented By: Eliyahu Babad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Maxwell Carr Dvorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?