Shinkle et al v. Angi Homeservices, et al
Plaintiff: Amos Shinkle and Nika Mosenthal
Defendant: Angi Homeservice, Inc., Handy Technologies, Angi Homeservices, and Handy Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv08700
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion of Gordon Cooney Jr. for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #16 is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/22/2024. (MEG)
January 18, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #15 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for February 2, 2024 and related deadlines as well as a stay of discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AAA Decline, #2 Exhibit Email acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit Email to defendants) (Pontone, Michael)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gordon Cooney Jr. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-17471094 by Angi Homeservices,, Handy Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Cooney, J.)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for February 2, 2024 and related deadlines as well as a stay of discovery by Angi Homeservices,, Handy Technologies, Inc.. (MacQueen, Grant)
January 2, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Angi Homeservices,, Handy Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IAC for Angi Homeservices,, Handy Technologies, Inc.. (MacQueen, Grant)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants letter application #8 dated 12/15/24 is GRANTED. An in person pre motion conference is scheduled for February 7, 2024 @ 4:00PM . The Court expects the parties to be conversant with the underlying facts and prepared to discuss the legal issues arising therefrom. The parties are reminded that they are obligated to discuss the prospect of settlement and may be required to provide the Court with a report of such discussions . If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this in person pre-motion conference and then file a letter application. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this in person pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/27/2023. (MI)
December 27, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/7/2024 04:00 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (MI)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 Letter in response to Plaintiffs' letter dated December 21, 2023 (Dkt.# 11) by Angi Homeservices,, Handy Technologies, Inc. (MacQueen, Grant)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY in Opposition to letter for leave to file motion to dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit arbitration letter, #2 Exhibit email re conference, #3 Exhibit AAA decline, #4 Exhibit Email, #5 Exhibit Email) (Pontone, Michael)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file #4 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 1/4/2024. Defendants' Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements #3 fail to comply with the newly amended Rule 7.1, which became effective on December 1, 2022. Specifically, they only include information about corporate relationships, and nothing about diversity of citizenship, which is what the newly amended Rule requires where the alleged subject-matter jurisdiction is based upon diversity of citizenship. Counsel is directed to review the Rule and file compliant statements by 1/4/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/21/2023. (MEG)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 2:30 P.M. on 2/02/2024 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 1/30/2024. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/19/2023. (EM)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J.S. Pontone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Pontone, Michael)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendants Anticipated Motion to Compel Arbitration and Alternative Motion to Dismiss by Angi Homeservices,, Handy Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- AAA Correspondence) (MacQueen, Grant)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (AF)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (AF)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Angi Homeservice, Inc., Handy Technologies (MacQueen, Grant)
November 29, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Sanket J. Bulsara. (AF)
November 29, 2023 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (AF)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 15, 2023 by Angi Homeservice, Inc., Handy Technologies. (MacQueen, Grant)
November 28, 2023 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. PLease submit FIRST and SECOND page of civil cover sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (AF)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Angi Homeservice, Inc., Handy Technologies identifying Corporate Parent IAC for Angi Homeservice, Inc.. (MacQueen, Grant)
November 24, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Angi Homeservice, Inc., Handy Technologies dated November 24, 2023 from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 530099/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-17313544) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint) (MacQueen, Grant)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant MacQueen on behalf of Angi Homeservice, Inc., Handy Technologies (aty to be noticed) (MacQueen, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinkle et al v. Angi Homeservices, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Shinkle
Represented By: Michael J.S. Pontone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nika Mosenthal
Represented By: Michael J.S. Pontone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angi Homeservice, Inc.
Represented By: Grant MacQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handy Technologies
Represented By: Grant MacQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angi Homeservices,
Represented By: Grant MacQueen
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handy Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Grant MacQueen
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?