Nyanjom v. Reckitt Benckiser LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harold Nyanjom
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Bayer Corporation and Bayer Healthcare L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2023cv09277
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Schultz Colton on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
February 8, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren S. Colton Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17551506 by Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lauren S. Colton, #2 Exhibit A - Cerificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
February 8, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Munro Young on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Young, Christopher)
February 1, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Bernard, James)
January 31, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17520702 by Robert Fichera, Natalie Juneau, Harold Nyanjom, Archanatep Boonparn, Kristin Depaola, Mari Jones, Natalie Juneau, Harold Nyanjom, Rachel Parker, Richard Scoffier, Richard Scoffier, Kristin Depaola, Rachel Parker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Stanoch, David)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2024. (PW)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Flahive Wu on behalf of The Procter & Gamble Company (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Flahive Wu, Laura)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Young Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17465148 by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Young, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Young, Christopher)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Edwards on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Edwards, Cara)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Campbell on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Campbell, Christopher)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:23-cv-02426. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 12/15/23. (msb) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination. For good cause shown, all deadlines are hereby stayed and held in abeyance until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") determines whether this action should be transferred to a different forum. The parties shall report to the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers within 7 days in the event the JPML denies the motion to transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/25/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to Substitute Party Name and Amend Caption. It is hereby ordered that Defendant "Bayer Corporation" is dismissed and will be replaced by defendant "Bayer HealthCare LLC," and the caption in this action shall be amended to reflect that substitution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/25/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending JPML Determination by Defendant Bayer Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Byard, Adrienne) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendant Bayer Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Byard, Adrienne) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Adrienne L. Byard on behalf of Bayer Corporation (Byard, Adrienne) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by All Plaintiffs Without Predjudice (Burrows, Stacy) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
September 22, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer Corporation, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Harold Nyanjom - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Burrows, Stacy) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Harold Nyanjom. (Burrows, Stacy) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6157013.), filed by Harold Nyanjom.(Burrows, Stacy) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]
September 19, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac) [Transferred from Kansas on 12/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyanjom v. Reckitt Benckiser LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Nyanjom
Represented By: Seth K. Jones
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: David J. Stanoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: Lauren Schultz Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare L.L.C.
Represented By: Adrienne L. Byard
Represented By: Cara Edwards
Represented By: Christopher G. Campbell
Represented By: Christopher Munro Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?