Adkin et al v. Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Millard Adkins, Rosalyn Anderson, Eli Erlick, Donna Bailey, Rosalie Jackson, Recoa Russell, Frank Anderson and Tina Haluszka
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., Bayer Corporation and GSK Consumer Health Inc. doing business as Haleon
Other: PHV Sara J. Watkins and PHV Daniel Aaron Rihn
Case Number: 1:2023cv09291
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Schultz Colton on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
February 16, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn E. Bladow on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon US Holdings LLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Bladow, Robyn)
February 9, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Rae on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon PLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Rae, Jacob)
February 9, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P. Lefkowitz on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon PLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
February 8, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren S. Colton Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17551506 by Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lauren S. Colton, #2 Exhibit A - Cerificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
February 8, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Amy Laurendeau Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17551372 by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Amy J. Laurendeau, #2 Exhibit A - COGS, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Laurendeau, Amy)
February 8, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Munro Young on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Young, Christopher)
February 6, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Y Shay Chanoine on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Chanoine, Hannah Y)
February 1, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Bernard, James)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2024. (PW)
January 16, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Flahive Wu on behalf of The Procter & Gamble Company (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Flahive Wu, Laura)
January 16, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Young Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17465148 by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Young, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Young, Christopher)
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Edwards on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Edwards, Cara)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Campbell on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Campbell, Christopher)
December 20, 2023 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:23-cv-21051. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RECOA RUSSELL, ELI ERLICK, FRANK ANDERSON, ROSALYN ANDERSON, TINA HALUSZKA, MILLARD ADKINS, DONNA BAILEY, ROSALIE JACKSON. GSK CONSUMER HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 11/8/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 15, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Aaron Rihn to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14873011.) (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 15, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sara J. Watkins to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14872978.) (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 14, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RECOA RUSSELL, ELI ERLICK, FRANK ANDERSON, ROSALYN ANDERSON, TINA HALUSZKA, MILLARD ADKINS, DONNA BAILEY, ROSALIE JACKSON. RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ALL CASE PROCEEDINGS PENDING MDL DETERMINATION that the Court stays all defendants deadlines to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint until further order of this Court or any Court to which the JPML assigns related actions. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 11/13/2023. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay all Case Proceedings Pending MDL Determination by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. (KOPCZYNSKI, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MILLARD ADKINS. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MILLARD ADKINS. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RECOA RUSSELL, ELI ERLICK, FRANK ANDERSON, ROSALYN ANDERSON, TINA HALUSZKA, MILLARD ADKINS, DONNA BAILEY, ROSALIE JACKSON. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. waiver sent on 11/2/2023, answer due 1/1/2024. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RECOA RUSSELL, ELI ERLICK, FRANK ANDERSON, ROSALYN ANDERSON, TINA HALUSZKA, MILLARD ADKINS, DONNA BAILEY, ROSALIE JACKSON. BAYER CORPORATION served on 10/27/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RECOA RUSSELL, ELI ERLICK, FRANK ANDERSON, ROSALYN ANDERSON, TINA HALUSZKA, MILLARD ADKINS, DONNA BAILEY, ROSALIE JACKSON. KENVUE INC. served on 10/19/2023, answer due 11/9/2023. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
November 7, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Sara J. Watkins and Daniel Aaron Rihn: $ 300, receipt number 135477 (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sara J. Watkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/27/2023. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Aaron Rihn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/27/2023. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/27/23. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/24/23. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER CORPORATION, GSK CONSUMER HEALTH INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., KENVUE INC., RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 13, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAYER CORPORATION, GSK Consumer Health, Inc., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., KENVUE INC., RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14779235) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RECOA RUSSELL, ELI ERLICK, FRANK ANDERSON, ROSALYN ANDERSON, TINA HALUSZKA, MILLARD ADKINS, DONNA BAILEY, ROSALIE JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkin et al v. Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: PHV Sara J. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: PHV Daniel Aaron Rihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millard Adkins
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Anderson
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Erlick
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Bailey
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Jackson
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recoa Russell
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Anderson
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Haluszka
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: Lauren Schultz Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Represented By: Amy J. Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenvue Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Cara Edwards
Represented By: Christopher G. Campbell
Represented By: Christopher Munro Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSK Consumer Health Inc. doing business as Haleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?