Jones v. Bayer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Janet Jones
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company and Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv09297
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Schultz Colton on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
February 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn E. Bladow on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon US Holdings LLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Bladow, Robyn)
February 9, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Rae on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon PLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Rae, Jacob)
February 9, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P. Lefkowitz on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Haleon PLC, Haleon Us Capital LLC, Pfizer Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
February 8, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren S. Colton Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17551506 by Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lauren S. Colton, #2 Exhibit A - Cerificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Colton, Lauren)
February 8, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Amy Laurendeau Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17551372 by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Amy J. Laurendeau, #2 Exhibit A - COGS, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Laurendeau, Amy)
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Munro Young on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Young, Christopher)
February 6, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Y Shay Chanoine on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Chanoine, Hannah Y)
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., RB Health LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt & Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Bernard, James)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2024. (PW)
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Flahive Wu on behalf of The Procter & Gamble Company (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Flahive Wu, Laura)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Young Filing fee $ 150, receipt number NYEDC-17465148 by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Young, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Young, Christopher)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Edwards on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Edwards, Cara)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Campbell on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare L.L.C., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Health Care, LLC, Bayer Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03089-BMC et al. (Campbell, Christopher)
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:23-cv-21411. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER CORPORATION, HALEON US CAPITAL LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., KENVUE INC., RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/19/2023.]
October 25, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/19/2023.]
October 25, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/19/2023.]
October 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAYER CORPORATION, HALEON US CAPITAL LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., KENVUE INC., RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-14817039) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JANET JONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KASHURBA, ALEX) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/19/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Jones
Represented By: Alex M. Kashurba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Cara Edwards
Represented By: Christopher G. Campbell
Represented By: Christopher Munro Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haleon Us Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Represented By: Amy J. Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenvue Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: Lauren Schultz Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?