Abdaljalil v. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Huda Abdaljalil
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. doing business as PJ&A
Case Number: 1:2024cv01166
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 7, 2024, before Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda D. Danelczyk, Telephone number 718-613-2330. Email address: LindaDan226@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/6/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2024. Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD et al. (Danelczyk, Linda)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: An initial status conference was held on 3/7/2024 before Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst in Courtroom 4E North. Counsel for the parties appeared in person and by Zoom. The Court set the following schedule: Leadership Selection: Applications to serve as Interim Class Counsel shall be submitted by 3/21/2024. Individual applications shall not exceed five pages and five pages of exhibits. Slate applications shall not exceed twenty pages and twenty pages of exhibits. Counsel for defendant Perry Johnson & Associates shall serve as Defendants' Liaison Counsel for all defendants except Cook County Health. Case Organizational Structure and Consolidated Complaints: Within 14 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a letter containing a joint or disputed organizational plan. The plan should address whether the case should be organized in "tracks" and whether there should be a single consolidated complaint or multiple consolidated complaints. The parties are encouraged to direct the Court to other cases that have used the organizational structure they are proposing. Within 45 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the plaintiffs shall file the consolidated complaint(s). Rule 12(b) Motions: Within 10 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for any Rule 12(b) motions. The letter shall replace the pre-motion conference letter that is usually required under Judge Kovner's rules. Cook County Health's requests for a pre-motion conference and to proceed on a separate briefing schedule for its anticipated Rule 12(b)(2) motion are denied for the reasons stated on the record. Discovery: Within 30 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a proposed protective order and ESI protocol. Within 30 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery schedule. In the event that the parties do not agree on such schedule or seek to stay discovery, the parties shall submit a joint letter to Magistrate Judge Dunst pursuant to his Individual Practice Rule IV.D.1. Status Reports and Conferences: The parties shall file a monthly joint status report. The first such report is due on 4/8/2024. The Court will hold a status conference every three months. The next status conference will be held via Zoom and telephone before Judge Kovner and Judge Dunst on 6/14/2024 at 9 AM. A Zoom link will be distributed to the parties in advance of the conference, and phone dial-in information will be made available on the docket. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/7/2024. (Court Reporter: Linda Danelczyk) (XW)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: At the initial conference to be held on 3/7/2024, the Court and parties shall discuss the topics outlined in the parties' 23 joint proposed agenda. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/6/2024. (XW)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Parties wishing to attend the Initial Status Conference on 3/7/2024 remotely may access the proceeding using the Zoom invitation link sent to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel are directed to forward the Zoom link to their respective clients. The parties shall join the video call (5) minutes before the conference.To access this conference telephonically, the public can call (888) 278-0296 and type in the access code 2012636. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, or rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/4/2024. (XW)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1: The parties are directed to review the attached Case Management Order, which outlines the Court's preliminary rules for the process of this case. An initial status conference will be held before Judge Kovner and Magistrate Judge Dunst on 3/7/2024 at 10 AM in a hybrid format. Parties may either appear in person in Courtroom 4E-N, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY 11201; or remotely by Zoom at a link the Court will share prior to the Conference. By 2/29/2024, the parties shall submit a joint proposed agenda listing items for discussion at the Conference. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 2/20/2024. (XW)
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:24-cv-00025. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 16, 2024 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of Eastern District of New York. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFIED MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3096) transferring case to the District of Eastern District of New York. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
February 14, 2024 Filing 12 UNCERTIFIED MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3096) transferring case to the District of Eastern District of New York. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/14/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 25, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huda Abdaljalil re #1 Complaint,,. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. served on 1/18/2024. (Fornetti, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Jamisen A. Etzel for Plaintiff Huda Abdaljalil and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Jennifer A. Fornetti. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/16/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jamisen A. Etzel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer A. Fornetti (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7552758) by Plaintiff Huda Abdaljalil. (Fornetti, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 8 ERROR: Duplicative entry entered in error. See 7 Notice. NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jamisen Etzel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/19/2024. (no image attached) (CAH) Modified on 1/5/2024 (HAM). [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary F. Lynch to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/19/2024. (no image attached) (CAH) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (CAH) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jamisen A. Etzel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/19/2024. (no image attached) (WJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary F. Lynch to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/19/2024. (no image attached) (WJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:23-cv-01851, 2:23-cv-01857, 2:23-cv-01866, 2:23-cv-01874, 2:23-cv-01880, 2:23-cv-01892, 2:23-cv-01900, 2:23-cv-01905, 2:23-cv-01910, 2:23-cv-01925, 2:23-cv-01926, 2:23-cv-01932, 2:23-cv-01935, 2:23-cv-01947, 2:23-cv-01964,2:23-cv-01983, 2:23-cv-01987, 2:23-cv-02014, 2:23-cv-02090 by Plaintiff Huda Abdaljalil. . (Fornetti, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HUDA ABDALJALIL. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fornetti, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7543243) by HUDA ABDALJALIL. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/14/2024. Proof of service due by 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fornetti, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 2/20/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdaljalil v. Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huda Abdaljalil
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Jamisen A. Etzel
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. doing business as PJ&A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?