Horsley et al v. Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christa Horsley, Sherry O'Neal and Albert Shifflett, Jr.
Defendant: Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. and Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01175
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 7, 2024, before Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda D. Danelczyk, Telephone number 718-613-2330. Email address: LindaDan226@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/6/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2024. Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD et al. (Danelczyk, Linda)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Lamb on behalf of Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01175-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01179-RPK-LGD (Lamb, Chelsea)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: An initial status conference was held on 3/7/2024 before Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst in Courtroom 4E North. Counsel for the parties appeared in person and by Zoom. The Court set the following schedule: Leadership Selection: Applications to serve as Interim Class Counsel shall be submitted by 3/21/2024. Individual applications shall not exceed five pages and five pages of exhibits. Slate applications shall not exceed twenty pages and twenty pages of exhibits. Counsel for defendant Perry Johnson & Associates shall serve as Defendants' Liaison Counsel for all defendants except Cook County Health. Case Organizational Structure and Consolidated Complaints: Within 14 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a letter containing a joint or disputed organizational plan. The plan should address whether the case should be organized in "tracks" and whether there should be a single consolidated complaint or multiple consolidated complaints. The parties are encouraged to direct the Court to other cases that have used the organizational structure they are proposing. Within 45 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the plaintiffs shall file the consolidated complaint(s). Rule 12(b) Motions: Within 10 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for any Rule 12(b) motions. The letter shall replace the pre-motion conference letter that is usually required under Judge Kovner's rules. Cook County Health's requests for a pre-motion conference and to proceed on a separate briefing schedule for its anticipated Rule 12(b)(2) motion are denied for the reasons stated on the record. Discovery: Within 30 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a proposed protective order and ESI protocol. Within 30 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery schedule. In the event that the parties do not agree on such schedule or seek to stay discovery, the parties shall submit a joint letter to Magistrate Judge Dunst pursuant to his Individual Practice Rule IV.D.1. Status Reports and Conferences: The parties shall file a monthly joint status report. The first such report is due on 4/8/2024. The Court will hold a status conference every three months. The next status conference will be held via Zoom and telephone before Judge Kovner and Judge Dunst on 6/14/2024 at 9 AM. A Zoom link will be distributed to the parties in advance of the conference, and phone dial-in information will be made available on the docket. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/7/2024. (Court Reporter: Linda Danelczyk) (XW)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wiech on behalf of Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01175-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01179-RPK-LGD (Wiech, Christopher)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: At the initial conference to be held on 3/7/2024, the Court and parties shall discuss the topics outlined in the parties' 23 joint proposed agenda. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/6/2024. (XW)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Parties wishing to attend the Initial Status Conference on 3/7/2024 remotely may access the proceeding using the Zoom invitation link sent to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel are directed to forward the Zoom link to their respective clients. The parties shall join the video call (5) minutes before the conference.To access this conference telephonically, the public can call (888) 278-0296 and type in the access code 2012636. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, or rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/4/2024. (XW)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00835. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 26, 2024 The case of Horsley et al v. Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. et al, has been transferred from Southern District of Ohio to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 24-cv-1175. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (AF)
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Eastern District of New York. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 2/15/2024; certified by the Clerk's Office from the Eastern District of New York on 2/15/2024. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/26/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 2) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of January 30, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner (pb) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/26/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Case transferred to District of USDC Eastern District of New York.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (pb) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/26/2024.]
February 15, 2024 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 2/15/2024. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/26/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against BON SECOURS MERCY HEALTH, INC., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9741934), filed by Christa Horsley, Albert Shifflett, Jr., Sherry O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Horsley notice letter, #2 Exhibit B: O'Neal notice letter, #3 Exhibit C: Shifflett notice letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/26/2024.]
December 21, 2023 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/26/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horsley et al v. Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Horsley
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry O'Neal
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Shifflett, Jr.
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Wiech
Represented By: Chelsea Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?