Stein v. Cangemi et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Stein
Defendant: Thomas R. Cangemi, Alessandro P. Dinello, James J. Carpenter, Hanif Dahya, Leslie D. Dunn, Marshall Lux, Lawrence Rosano, Jr., Ronald A. Rosenfeld, Lawrence J. Savarese, Peter Schoels, David L. Treadwell, Robert Wann, Jennifer R. Whip, John J. Pinto and New York Community Bancorp, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02363
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Diane Gujarati
2 Judge: Marcia M Henry
3 Judge: Nina R Morrison
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Filing 14 Letter Explaining Why Additional Notice of the Voluntary Dismissal is Not Required under Rule 23.1(c) by Herbert Stein (Brown, Timothy)
May 24, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Herbert Stein [AMENDED] (Brown, Timothy)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. While Plaintiff's #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal notes that Plaintiff will not be compensated by Defendants, it does not address whether, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23.1(c), additional notice of the voluntary dismissal must be given to shareholders. Therefore, on or before May 27, 2024, Plaintiff is directed file a letter explaining whether additional notice of the voluntary dismissal is required under Rule 23.1(c). Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 5/21/2024. (AD)
May 17, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Herbert Stein (Brown, Timothy)
April 30, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Community Bancorp, Inc. (Saltzstein, Susan)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant New York Community Bancorp, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/18/2024. Any party wishing to file a dispositive motion should consult District Judge Nina R. Morrison's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/19/2024. (SGC)
April 17, 2024 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by New York Community Bancorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Defendant's Time to Respond) (Saltzstein, Susan)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nina R. Morrison and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho (as Related to 24-cv-903) for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gujarati, Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/17/2024. (KD)
April 9, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaud Gerard Tavakoli on behalf of New York Community Bancorp, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Tavakoli, Shaud)
April 9, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Leslie Saltzstein on behalf of New York Community Bancorp, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Saltzstein, Susan)
April 9, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of New York Community Bancorp, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kasner, Jay)
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 Letter re Consolidation and Leadership by Herbert Stein (Brown, Timothy)
April 4, 2024 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (KD)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Herbert Stein. New York Community Bancorp, Inc. served on 4/1/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (Brown, Timothy)
March 29, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thomas R. Cangemi, James J. Carpenter, Hanif Dahya, Alessandro P. Dinello, Leslie D. Dunn, Marshall Lux, New York Community Bancorp, Inc., John J. Pinto, Lawrence Rosano, Jr, Ronald A. Rosenfeld, Lawrence J. Savarese, Peter Schoels, David L. Treadwell, Robert Wann, Jennifer R. Whip. (KD)
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (KD)
March 29, 2024 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
March 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas R. Cangemi, James J. Carpenter, Hanif Dahya, Alessandro P. Dinello, Leslie D. Dunn, Marshall Lux, New York Community Bancorp, Inc., John J. Pinto, Lawrence Rosano, Jr, Ronald A. Rosenfeld, Lawrence J. Savarese, Peter Schoels, David L. Treadwell, Robert Wann, Jennifer R. Whip filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17722834 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Herbert Stein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Brown, Timothy)
March 29, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Cangemi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Stein
Represented By: Timothy William Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Cangemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro P. Dinello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanif Dahya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie D. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Lux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Rosano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Savarese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Schoels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer R. Whip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Pinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Community Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Shaud Gerard Tavakoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?