Ji v. USCIS Office of General Counsel et al
Plaintiff: Hanrong Ji
Defendant: USCIS Office of General Counsel, USCIS Attorney General of the USA and United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney
Case Number: 1:2024cv03178
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign a district judge to this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/11/2024. (DB)
June 11, 2024 Case Re to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (TLH)
May 15, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanrong Ji. USCIS Attorney General of the USA served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024; USCIS Office of General Counsel served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney served on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (SG)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order CONSENT NOTICE: This case was directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak pursuant to a #Pilot Program governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. Under the rules set forth in that Administrative Order, the parties' deadline to fully consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction is 06/06/2024; otherwise, a district judge will be assigned to this case at random. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/8/2024. (DB)
May 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Elizabeth Mahoney on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Mahoney, Diana)
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (CV)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USCIS Attorney General of the USA, USCIS Office of General Counsel, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (CV)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 FILING FEE: $ 405.00, receipt number 100014177 (CV)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USCIS Attorney General of the USA, USCIS Office of General Counsel, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney, filed by Ji Hanrong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CV) Modified on 4/30/2024 (CV).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ji v. USCIS Office of General Counsel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanrong Ji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Office of General Counsel
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Attorney General of the USA
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York Office of the United States Attorney
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?