In Re: Perry Johnson & Associates Medical Transcription Data Security Breach Litigation
Plaintiff: Laurie Gay Gerber, David Mayo, Madeleine E. Schwartz, Sandra Vasquez, Anatoli Belov, Irina Belov, Eryn Kaplan, Amanda Marconi, R.M., Cory Coyle, Patrick Nealon, John Kerly Jerome, Crystal Brewster, Taylor Ambrosio, Elena Gelman, Hinda Leah Yudin, Maureen Hutcheon, Joan Mancuso, Stacey Slotchiver, Denise Faivre, Michael Stone, Leeanne Varner, Ronnie Gill, Ratiek Lowery, Noel Carter, Prospero Rodriguez, Maria Rodriguez, Kevin O'Rourke, Richard Vetere, Neil Levitt, Martin Kurtev, Izabela Debowczyk, Byron Colon, Edward Miller, Jr., Irina Belova, Camille Davis, Linda Kaufman, Kevin K. Shanahan, Michael Newton, Rosemary Kerrane, James Shoforth, Bridget O'Neill, Kirk Moses, Lance Sept, Sparkle Jenkins, L.G., Jeffrey Ruderman, Laura Ruderman, S. R., Huda Abdaljalil, Michele Carino, W.W., Andrea Kay, Christa Horsley, Sherry O'Neal, Albert Shifflett, Jr., Douglas Bishop, Charles Metzger, Ilise Heitzner, Debra L. Brown, Robert Jon, Caitlin Sullivan, Bessie Jackson, H.Z., Mz, G.Z., A.J., Kathleen Secko, Andrea Tudda, Marc Brown, Stephen Tate, Elliot Curry, Eric Franczak, Gary Ballard, Mary Devling, Tiffany Williams, Jo Joaquim, JOHN HVIDSTEN, SAVERIA GARCIA-MACRI and Lazema Johnson
Defendant: Northwell Health, Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc., Salem Community Hospital, Cook County Health, Cook County Health & Hospital System, Salem Regional Medical Center, Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc., Board of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, Meritas Health Corporation, North Kansas City Hospital Auxiliary, Concentra Health Services, Inc., Select Medical Holdings Corporation and Concentra Inc.
Not Yet Classified: In Re: Perry Johnson & Associates Medical Transcription Data Security Breach Litigation
Case Number: 1:2024md03096
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Majority Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs Leadership Group Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)) filed by Northwell Health, Inc.. (Roberts, William)
March 26, 2024 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Ostrow on behalf of Elliot Curry, Neil Levitt (aty to be noticed) (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2024 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Haroutunian on behalf of Linda Kaufman (aty to be noticed) (Haroutunian, Gregory)
March 22, 2024 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Green Comite on behalf of Marc Brown (aty to be noticed) (Comite, Erin)
March 22, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Lisogorsky on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc., Concentra Inc., Select Medical Holdings Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Lisogorsky, Jacob)
March 22, 2024 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence Coates on behalf of Noel Carter (aty to be noticed) (Coates, Terence)
March 22, 2024 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey H. Taylor on behalf of Maureen Hutcheon, Kathleen Secko, Andrea Tudda (aty to be noticed) (Taylor, Lindsey)
March 21, 2024 Filing 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application of Anthony L. Parkhill) by Bessie Jackson, JOHN HVIDSTEN, SAVERIA GARCIA-MACRI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony L. Parkhill) (Parkhill, Anthony)
March 21, 2024 Filing 51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeffrey Ruderman, S. R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Firm Resume) (Longman, Howard)
March 21, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Todd S. Garber as Interim Lead Counsel by Crystal Brewster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Firm Resume) (Garber, Todd)
March 21, 2024 Filing 49 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Melissa R. Emert, as a Member of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, by Laura Ruderman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Firm Resume of Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.) (Graifman, Gary)
March 21, 2024 Filing 48 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Majority Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs Leadership Group Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)) by Debra L. Brown, Byron Colon, Elliot Curry, Maureen Hutcheon, John Kerly Jerome, Rosemary Kerrane, Edward Miller, Jr., Michael Newton, Kathleen Secko, Kevin K. Shanahan, Andrea Tudda, Tiffany Williams, Jo Joaquim. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 J. Pizzirusso Resume, #2 Ex. 2 S. Davidson Resume, #3 Ex. 3 J. Martin Resume, #4 Ex. 4 I. David Resume, #5 Ex. 5 M. Canty Resume, #6 Ex. 6 L. Nussbaum Resume, #7 Ex. 7 J. Ostrow Resume, #8 Ex. 8 G. Stranch Resume, #9 Ex. 9 R. Liebenberg Resume, #10 Ex. 10 E. Hughes Resume, #11 Ex. 11 G. Klinger Resume, #12 Ex. 12 J. Cecchi Resume, #13 Ex. 13 A. Schubert Resume, #14 Ex. 14 M. Dann Resume, #15 Ex. 15 T. Wolfson Resume, #16 Ex. 16 C. Schaffer Resume, #17 Ex. 17 M. Brady Resume, #18 Ex. 18 T. Coates Resume, #19 Ex. 19 P. Bishop Resume, #20 Ex. 20 C. Hayes Resume) (Davidson, Stuart)
March 21, 2024 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Marie Rolon on behalf of Marc Brown (aty to be noticed) (Rolon, Amanda)
March 21, 2024 Filing 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application for Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel) by Marc Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume Consumer Litigation) (Guglielmo, Joseph)
March 21, 2024 Filing 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as a Member of the Executive Committee by Camille Davis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Ra O. Amen as a Member of the Executive Committee, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ra O. Amen) (Amen, Ra)
March 21, 2024 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrice L. Bishop on behalf of Hinda Leah Yudin (aty to be noticed) (Bishop, Patrice)
March 21, 2024 Filing 43 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 5): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of January 30, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner. (AF)
March 19, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Ra O Amen on behalf of Camille Davis (aty to be noticed) (Amen, Ra)
March 15, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Braude on behalf of Concentra Health Services, Inc., Concentra Inc., Select Medical Holdings Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Braude, Daniel)
March 13, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Lamb on behalf of Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01175-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01179-RPK-LGD (Lamb, Chelsea)
March 12, 2024 Filing 39 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 4): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of January 30, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner. (AF)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: The #37 #38 motions to appear pro hac vice are denied as unnecessary. Per the Court's Case Management Order No.1, "[a]ttorneys not admitted to practice in this District are allowed electronic filing privileges" for this case. Case Management Order No.1 at 4 (Dkt. #14). The Clerk's Office is directed to refund the filing fee to the moving attorneys. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/12/2024. (XW)
March 11, 2024 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Maureen M. Brady Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-17653514 by A.J., G.Z., H.Z., Mz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Brady, Maureen)
March 11, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul Doolittle Filing fee $ 200, receipt number NYEDC-17653312 by Stacey Slotchiver. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In support of the Motion, #2 Exhibit "A" Certificate of Good Standing SC, #3 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01171-RPK-LGD (Doolittle, Paul)
March 8, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Samuel Binder on behalf of Marc Brown (aty to be noticed) (Binder, Ethan)
March 7, 2024 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl V. Malmstrom on behalf of Kirk Moses, Bridget O'Neill (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-00755-RPK-LGD (Malmstrom, Carl)
March 7, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Schaffer on behalf of Christa Horsley, David Mayo, Sherry O'Neal, Madeleine E. Schwartz, Albert Shifflett, Jr., Michael Stone, Leeanne Varner (aty to be noticed) (Schaffer, Charles)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: An initial status conference was held on 3/7/2024 before Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst in Courtroom 4E North. Counsel for the parties appeared in person and by Zoom. The Court set the following schedule: Leadership Selection: Applications to serve as Interim Class Counsel shall be submitted by 3/21/2024. Individual applications shall not exceed five pages and five pages of exhibits. Slate applications shall not exceed twenty pages and twenty pages of exhibits. Counsel for defendant Perry Johnson & Associates shall serve as Defendants' Liaison Counsel for all defendants except Cook County Health. Case Organizational Structure and Consolidated Complaints: Within 14 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a letter containing a joint or disputed organizational plan. The plan should address whether the case should be organized in "tracks" and whether there should be a single consolidated complaint or multiple consolidated complaints. The parties are encouraged to direct the Court to other cases that have used the organizational structure they are proposing. Within 45 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the plaintiffs shall file the consolidated complaint(s). Rule 12(b) Motions: Within 10 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for any Rule 12(b) motions. The letter shall replace the pre-motion conference letter that is usually required under Judge Kovner's rules. Cook County Health's requests for a pre-motion conference and to proceed on a separate briefing schedule for its anticipated Rule 12(b)(2) motion are denied for the reasons stated on the record. Discovery: Within 30 days of the appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the parties shall file a proposed protective order and ESI protocol. Within 30 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint(s), the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery schedule. In the event that the parties do not agree on such schedule or seek to stay discovery, the parties shall submit a joint letter to Magistrate Judge Dunst pursuant to his Individual Practice Rule IV.D.1. Status Reports and Conferences: The parties shall file a monthly joint status report. The first such report is due on 4/8/2024. The Court will hold a status conference every three months. The next status conference will be held via Zoom and telephone before Judge Kovner and Judge Dunst on 6/14/2024 at 9 AM. A Zoom link will be distributed to the parties in advance of the conference, and phone dial-in information will be made available on the docket. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/7/2024. (Court Reporter: Linda Danelczyk) (XW)
March 6, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Anderson Berry on behalf of Linda Kaufman (notification declined or already on case) (Berry, M.)
March 6, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wiech on behalf of Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01175-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01179-RPK-LGD (Wiech, Christopher)
March 6, 2024 Filing 31 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Cook County Health, Cook County Health & Hospital System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kimber Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Martin Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Hubbard Affidavit) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD et al. (VanderWeele, Meagan)
March 6, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Whitney Boardman on behalf of Maureen Hutcheon, Kathleen Secko, Andrea Tudda (aty to be noticed) (Boardman, Erin)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: At the initial conference to be held on 3/7/2024, the Court and parties shall discuss the topics outlined in the parties' #23 joint proposed agenda. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/6/2024. (XW)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: The #29 motion to appear pro hac vice is denied as unnecessary. Per the Court's Case Management Order No.1, "[a]ttorneys not admitted to practice in this District are allowed electronic filing privileges" for this case. Case Management Order No.1 at 4 (Dkt. #14). The Clerk's Office is directed to refund the filing fee to the moving attorney. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/6/2024. (XW)
March 5, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number NYEDC-17633882 by Izabela Debowczyk, Martin Kurtev, Douglas Bishop, Charles Metzger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-00748-RPK-LGD, 1:24-cv-01179-RPK-LGD (Harris, Sharon)
March 4, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor P. Hayes on behalf of Huda Abdaljalil (aty to be noticed) (Hayes, Connor)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Parties wishing to attend the Initial Status Conference on 3/7/2024 remotely may access the proceeding using the Zoom invitation link sent to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel are directed to forward the Zoom link to their respective clients. The parties shall join the video call (5) minutes before the conference.To access this conference telephonically, the public can call (888) 278-0296 and type in the access code 2012636. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, or rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/4/2024. (XW)
March 1, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Davidson on behalf of Maureen Hutcheon, Kathleen Secko, Andrea Tudda (aty to be noticed) (Davidson, Stuart)
March 1, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Robert Fish on behalf of Salem Community Hospital, Salem Regional Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Fish, Eric)
February 29, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E Caldwell on behalf of Northwell Health, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Caldwell, Kathryn)
February 29, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen J Dalakian, II on behalf of Northwell Health, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Dalakian, Glen)
February 29, 2024 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Proposed Agenda for Initial Conference (Maxwell, Joel)
February 29, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Mara Feldstein on behalf of Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Feldstein, Robyn)
February 28, 2024 Filing 21 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 3): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation,the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of January 30, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner. (AF)
February 27, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Wolfson on behalf of Joan Mancuso (notification declined or already on case) (Wolfson, Tina)
February 27, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary L Russell on behalf of Michele Carino (aty to be noticed) (Russell, Mary)
February 27, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Dann on behalf of Douglas Bishop, Charles Metzger (notification declined or already on case) (Dann, Marc)
February 22, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence D. Levit on behalf of Hinda Leah Yudin (aty to be noticed) (Levit, Lawrence)
February 22, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack G Fruchter on behalf of Hinda Leah Yudin (aty to be noticed) (Fruchter, Jack)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1: The parties are directed to review the attached Case Management Order, which outlines the Court's preliminary rules for the process of this case. An initial status conference will be held before Judge Kovner and Magistrate Judge Dunst on 3/7/2024 at 10 AM in a hybrid format. Parties may either appear in person in Courtroom 4E-N, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY 11201; or remotely by Zoom at a link the Court will share prior to the Conference. By 2/29/2024, the parties shall submit a joint proposed agenda listing items for discussion at the Conference. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 2/20/2024. (XW)
February 20, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of Richard Vetere (notification declined or already on case) (Nussbaum, Linda)
February 15, 2024 Filing 15 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 2): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation,the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of January 30, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner. (AF)
February 15, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Cecchi on behalf of Denise Faivre (aty to be noticed) (Cecchi, James)
February 15, 2024 Filing 11 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 1): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation,the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of January 30, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner. (AF)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: This Multidistrict Litigation ("MDL") was recently transferred to this District and assigned to District Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 2/2/2024 (DE #6 ) and the undersigned on 2/8/2024 (2/8/2024 Order). However, as Judge Kovner noted in her 2/8/2024 order, "the conditional transfer order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring those cases to this Court will not become effective until 2/13/2024 at the earliest." The aforementioned conditional transfer order was then filed in this District on 2/15/2024. See DE #11 . Notwithstanding the infancy of this MDL, several parties already have filed competing letters regarding which parties and law firms should (or should not) serve in a coordinating role even prior to the issuance of the first scheduling order by Judge Kovner. See DE #9 at 1 (seeking permission to "consult and coordinate with counsel for all plaintiffs in this MDL") & DE 10 (arguing that "the pre-appointment coordinating counsel role described in [DE #9 ] is unnecessary"). While the undersigned certainly appreciates the desire of Plaintiffs "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of this MDL (Fed. R. Civ. P. 1), this complex matter was transferred to this District only days ago and, as a result, the Court has not yet issued its first comprehensive scheduling order in this case. See 2/14/2024 Order (the undersigned granting requests to adjourn the deadlines for Defendants to respond "pending the issuance of the MDL scheduling order"). The submission of these dueling letters at such an early stage of the MDL is unproductive and does not serve the interests of the Court. The undersigned therefore DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE any and all relief requested in DE #9 and DE #10 . The parties may request such further relief in the future only after (1) Judge Kovner issues the first scheduling order, and (2) the parties have satisfied their meet and confer obligations prior to raising issues with the Court. Furthermore, the parties shall refrain from any further submissions absent a showing of good cause prior to Judge Kovner's issuance of the first scheduling order. Finally, the parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Kovner's and the undersigned's Individual Practice Rules during the pendency of the MDL. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 2/15/2024. (CT)
February 14, 2024 Filing 10 Letter to Judge Kovner in response to the January 12, 2024 letter filed by Israel David LLC by Crystal Brewster Associated Cases: 1:24-md-03096-RPK-LGD et al. (Garber, Todd)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay; granting #4 Motion to Stay; granting #5 Motion to Stay. Defendants request that the Court stay their deadlines to respond to various complaints pending the entry of a scheduling order in this Multidistrict Litigation matter ("MDL"). DE #3 at 1; DE #4 at 1, DE #5 at 1. The Court finds that there is good cause justifying this reasonable extension and therefore GRANTS the requests to adjourn sine die the deadlines to respond to the aforementioned complaints (cited in DEs #3 , #4 and #5 ) pending the issuance of the MDL scheduling order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 2/14/2024. (CT)
February 12, 2024 Filing 9 Letter to Judge Kovner regarding proposed scheduling for Plaintiffs anticipated motions and briefing pursuant to FRCP Rule 23(g) by Laurie Gay Gerber (David, Israel)
February 8, 2024 Filing 8 Letter re: Consolidation & Coordination with the Gerber Action by Hinda Leah Yudin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PJ&A MDL Dkt. 1) (Twersky, Mitchell)
February 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell M.Z. Twersky on behalf of Hinda Leah Yudin (aty to be noticed) (Twersky, Mitchell)
February 8, 2024 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Lee G. Dunst. (AM)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the #3 #4 #5 motions to stay the three cases currently before the Eastern District of Michigan. However, the conditional transfer order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring those cases to this Court will not become effective until 2/13/2024 at the earliest. See 2/6/2024 Conditional Transfer Order, MDL No. 3096 (Dkt. # 137) (stating that the order "does not become effective until it is filed" with the EDNY Clerk's Office and ordering that the "transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof"). It therefore appears that the Court currently lacks jurisdiction to adjudicate these motions. If parties believe that the Court already possesses jurisdiction to rule on these motions, they may file a brief letter by 2/9/2024 indicating the basis for such belief. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 2/8/2024. (XW)
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 Letter MOTION to Stay Action (First Request) re: Defendants' deadlines to Respond to the Complaint pending entry of a Scheduling Order for Coordinated or Consolidated Proceedings in 5:24-cv-10100 by Northwell Health, Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.. (Roberts, William)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 Letter MOTION to Stay Action (First Request) re: Defendants' deadlines to Respond to the Complaint pending entry of a Scheduling Order for Coordinated or Consolidated Proceedings in 2:24-cv-10098 by Northwell Health, Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.. (Roberts, William)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 Letter MOTION to Stay Action (First Request) re: Defendants' deadlines to Respond to the Complaint pending entry of a Scheduling Order for Coordinated or Consolidated Proceedings by Northwell Health, Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.. (Roberts, William)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 Letter Re: Gelman Request for Reassignment to Kovner. by Northwell Health, Inc. (Roberts, William)
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 JPMDL Transfer Order, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Eastern District of New York are transferred to the Eastern District of New York and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner for coordinated or consolidated proceedings with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A. (TLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Perry Johnson & Associates Medical Transcription Data Security Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: In Re: Perry Johnson & Associates Medical Transcription Data Security Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Gay Gerber
Represented By: Blake Hunter Yagman
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mayo
Represented By: Andrew G. Costello
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey Goldenberg
Represented By: Philip J. Furia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeleine E. Schwartz
Represented By: Andrew G. Costello
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey Goldenberg
Represented By: Philip J. Furia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Vasquez
Represented By: Jason Scott Goldstein
Represented By: Raymond C Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anatoli Belov
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Represented By: Britany A. Kabakov
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Matthew J. Langley
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Belov
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eryn Kaplan
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Represented By: Britany A. Kabakov
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Represented By: Matthew J. Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Marconi
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.M.
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Coyle
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Nealon
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kerly Jerome
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Sedgh
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Brewster
Represented By: Todd Seth Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Ambrosio
Represented By: Michael Arthur Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Gelman
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hinda Leah Yudin
Represented By: Mitchell M.Z. Twersky
Represented By: Jack G Fruchter
Represented By: Lawrence D. Levit
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Hutcheon
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Represented By: Mario Alba, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Erin Whitney Boardman
Represented By: Lindsey H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Mancuso
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Slotchiver
Represented By: Blake Garrett Abbott
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Paul Doolittle
Represented By: Paul J Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Faivre
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Kevin G. Cooper
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Jordan Steele
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stone
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Goldenberg
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeanne Varner
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Goldenberg
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Gill
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Joseph M Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ratiek Lowery
Represented By: Alexandra M. Honeycutt
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Carter
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Terence Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospero Rodriguez
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Murphy
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rodriguez
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Murphy
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Rourke
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Vetere
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Levitt
Represented By: Jeff Ostrow
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Grunfeld
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Kurtev
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izabela Debowczyk
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Colon
Represented By: Francesca K. Burne
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Francesca K. Burne
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Belova
Represented By: Britany A. Kabakov
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Represented By: Matthew J. Langley
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Davis
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Salena J. Chowdhury
Represented By: Ra O Amen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kaufman
Represented By: Brandon P. Jack
Represented By: Gregory Haroutunian
Represented By: M. Anderson Berry
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin K. Shanahan
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Justin J Hawal
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Newton
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Justin J Hawal
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Kerrane
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Justin J Hawal
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shoforth
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Justin J Hawal
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget O'Neill
Represented By: Alex J Tramontano
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Moses
Represented By: Alex J Tramontano
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Sept
Represented By: David DiSabato
Represented By: Lee I. Iglody
Represented By: Mason Barney
Represented By: Tyler Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparkle Jenkins
Represented By: David DiSabato
Represented By: Lee I. Iglody
Represented By: Mason Barney
Represented By: Tyler Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.G.
Represented By: Gustavo E. Ponce
Represented By: Mona Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Ruderman
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Howard T. Longman
Represented By: Melissa R Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ruderman
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Howard T. Longman
Represented By: Melissa R Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. R.
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Howard T. Longman
Represented By: Melissa R Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huda Abdaljalil
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Jamisen A. Etzel
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fornetti
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Valerie Christian
Represented By: Connor P. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Carino
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: Mary L Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.W.
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Kay
Represented By: Amber Love Schubert
Represented By: Martin Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Horsley
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry O'Neal
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Shifflett, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Represented By: Todd B. Naylor
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bishop
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Metzger
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilise Heitzner
Represented By: Benjamin David Baker
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Brown
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: James Joseph Pizzirusso
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jon
Represented By: Andrew E Mize
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Sullivan
Represented By: Andrew E Mize
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Jackson
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Represented By: John S. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.Z.
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mz
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.Z.
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.J.
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Secko
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Erin Whitney Boardman
Represented By: Lindsey H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Tudda
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Erin Whitney Boardman
Represented By: Lindsey H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Brown
Represented By: Joseph Guglielmo
Represented By: Amanda Marie Rolon
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ethan Samuel Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Tate
Represented By: Tiffany M. Yiatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Curry
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Franczak
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ballard
Represented By: Andrew B Protzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Devling
Represented By: David D. Burkhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Williams
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Joaquim
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HVIDSTEN
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVERIA GARCIA-MACRI
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazema Johnson
Represented By: David H. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwell Health, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Buckley Cashmore
Represented By: Christopher Conniff
Represented By: William L Roberts
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: Alex Fugazzi
Represented By: Glen J Dalakian, II
Represented By: Kathryn E Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Flynn
Represented By: Joel Michael Maxwell
Represented By: Seth Adam Nirenberg
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Community Hospital
Represented By: Eric Robert Fish
Represented By: Melissa Bilancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Health
Represented By: Meagan P. VanderWeele
Represented By: Scott L. Schmookler
Represented By: Sean Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Health & Hospital System
Represented By: Meagan P. VanderWeele
Represented By: Scott L. Schmookler
Represented By: Sean Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Amanda M. Perach
Represented By: Eric Robert Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc.
Represented By: Robyn Mara Feldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital
Represented By: Brandon J. Boulware
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Represented By: Timothy S. Frets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritas Health Corporation
Represented By: Brandon J. Boulware
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Represented By: Timothy S. Frets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Kansas City Hospital Auxiliary
Represented By: Brandon J. Boulware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentra Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Braude
Represented By: Jacob Lisogorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Medical Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M Braude
Represented By: Jacob Lisogorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentra Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Braude
Represented By: Jacob Lisogorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?