United States of America v. Salten et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John Doe #1 through #10, Howard Salten, Margaret Salten and Patricia Salten
Case Number: 2:2003cv00578
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the default of Defendants MARGARET SALTEN and BROOKHAVEN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL be, and the same hereby is, noted; and it is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the Plaintiff have jud gment herein for the sum of $95,323.51, with interest from November 28, 2017, through the date of entry of this Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale at the rate of $8.63 per day, and with interest thereafter at the legal rate; and for the sum o f $1,013.12, as taxed by the Court for the costs and disbursements of plaintiff in this action, with interest as aforesaid, and it is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the mortgaged premises described in theComplaint and as hereinafter describe d, be sold in one parcel, subject to the following: any states of facts that an accurate survey may show; easements, covenants, restrictions or reservations of record, if any; zoning restrictions and any amendments thereto according to law, and now i n force; existing violations and orders of the appropriate departments of any City, Town or Village, if any; the physical condition of the premises at the time of closing; and without any apportionment or adjustments; at public auction to be held in the lobby of the United States District Court, Eastern District of New York, Long Island Federal Courthouse, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York by and under the direction of Bryan Mullee, the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of New York (the "Marshal"); that Plaintiff give public notice of the time and place of said sale according to federal law and the practice of this Court by advertising in the Suffolk edition of Newsday, a daily newspaper, once a week for at l east four weeks prior to the sale, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 202; that the Marshal give public notice of the time and place of said sale by posting a physical notice of the same in three (3) public locations in Suffolk County, NY, at least four (4) weeks prior to the sale. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Judgment of Foreclosure and sale on defendants and file proof of service on ECF within fourteen (14)days. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 1/10/2018. (Florio, Lisa)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM & ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; For the foregoing reasons, the Court ADOPTS Judge Lindsay's R&R (Docket Entry 146) in its entirety. The Government's motion (Docket Entry 139) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. T he Court GRANTS the Government's motion to the extent it requests the dismissal of defendants Patricia Salten and John Does #1-10, joinder of Brookhaven Memorial Hospital as a necessary defendant, and entry of a default judgment against defendan ts Margaret Salten and Brookhaven Memorial Hospital. The Government's motion is DENIED to the extent it requests the appointment of a special master to sell the Premises. The United States Marshal Service shall conduct the sale of the Premises. The Government is directed to submit a proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale that conforms to the Court's directives within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. The Government is also directed to serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on Defendants and file proof of service on ECF within fourteen (14) days. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TERMINATE Patricia Salten and John Does #1-10 as defendants in this action. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to amend the caption to reflect the addition of Brookhaven Memorial Hospital as a defendant in this action. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/10/2017. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 128 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; denying 134 Motion to Dismiss; denying 134 Motion for Leave to File; For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion to correct the April 19, 2007 Judgment (Docket Entry 128) is GRANTED; and Mr. Salten's motion to vacate and for leave to file an amended answer (Docket Entry 134) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the April 19, 2007 Judgment so that the judgment is against Mr. Salten only. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/26/2015. C/ECF; C/M (Valle, Christine)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM & ORDER re: 114 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, 123 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to permit Defendant to file an amended answer are DENIED. Counsel for Government is ORDERED to serve a copy of this Order on the pro se Defendants and file proof of service within 7 days. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/30/2013. (Nohs, Bonnie)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 108 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; finding as moot 111 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Counsel for the Government, Thomas A. McFarland, Esq., is hereby ORDERED to serve a copy of this Order on Defendants and to file proof of service within seven (7) days. The Clerk of Court is directed to (1) terminate the appearance of Mr. McFarland on behalf of Defendant Howard Salten, which appears to have been entered in error, and (2) terminate Mr. Salten's motion for an extension, which is now moot. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 4/29/2013. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Salten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1 through #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Salten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Salten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Salten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas A. McFarland
Represented By: Francis E. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?