Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc. v. Xcentric Ventures, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Cambridge Who\'s Who Publishing, Inc. alleges that defendant Xcentric Ventures, LLC publishes materially false, deceptive and defamatory reports on its websites, ripoffreport.com and badbusinessbureau.com, and is engaged in a scheme to extort money from legitimate businesses by forcing them to seek relief from the bad publicity they received.

Plaintiff: Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc.
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Edward Magedson
Case Number: 2:2006cv06590
Filed: December 11, 2006
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
County: Nassau
Referring Judge: E. Thomas Boyle
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2007 19
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on consent to the Hon. E. Thomas Boyle by Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc.. (Fertig, Suzanne)
August 10, 2007 17
NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC of Appearance (Speth, Maria)
July 25, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Re: 9 Motion to Substitute Attorney; 12 Amended Order Authorizing Substitution of Counsel - Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is ordered to mark this on the record and terminate the appearance of prior counsel. Attorney Donald E. Morris terminated. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/25/07. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
June 29, 2007 10
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc.. (Fertig, Suzanne)
May 4, 2007 5
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc.. Xcentric Ventures, LLC served on 4/5/2007, answer due 4/25/2007. (Morris, Donald)
April 5, 2007 4
Letter Request for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants and Request to Adjourn Initial Scheduling Conference to Later Date by Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc. (Morris, Donald)
December 28, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/20/2007 09:30 AM before Magistrate-Judge E. Thomas Boyle. See order for further instructions. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) or Plaintiff pro se is obligated to serve a copy of this order on each defendant.. Ordered by Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 12/28/06. (Lundy, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc. v. Xcentric Ventures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cambridge Who's Who Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne Fertig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Magedson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?