Restivo et al v. Nassau County et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv06720
Filed: December 21, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Presiding Judge: William D. Wall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 332 Motion for Attorney Fees; For the reasons set forth herein, NSB's application for attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court awards $114, 135.00 in attorneys' fees plus $1,483.95 in costs for a total of $115,618.95 in attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment for $115,618.95 in attorneys' fees and costs. Post-judgment interest, calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a), shall run on the award of attorney fees and costs from the date of this Memorandum & Order until the date the fees and costs are paid. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 1/4/2019. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 300 Motion for Attorney Fees. SO ORDERED that NSB's supplemental motion for attorneys' fees (Docket Entry 300) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court awards attorney fees in the amount of $572,324.2511 plus $21,806.5412 in costs for a total of $594,130.79 in attorney fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment for $594,130.79 in attorneys' fees and costs. Post-judgment interest, calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a), shall run on the award of attorney fees and costs from the date of this Memorandum & Order until the date the fees and costs are paid. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/28/2017. (Florio, Lisa)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER finding as moot 260 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; For the reasons set forth herein, the Court finds that Plaintiffs' motion (Docket Entry 260) seeking to disqualify the County Attorney's Office from representing the County is MOOT. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/8/2015. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 233 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 240 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; The Court awards attorney fees in the amount of $4,677,897.50 (which includes the cost of the fee petition) plus $320,017.05 i n costs for a total of $4,997,914.55 in attorney fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the judgment to include attorney fees and costs. Post-judgment interest, calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a), shall run on t he award of attorney fees and costs from the date of this Memorandum & Order until the date the fees and costs are paid. In addition, NSB's motion to amend (Docket Entry 240) is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/30/2015. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 229 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; Plaintiffs' motion to amend the Judgment (Docket Entry 229) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the Judgment in this case to include: (1) post-verdict i nterest at a rate of nine percent per year, accruing from April 11, 2014, the date of the liability verdict in this case, until November 17, 2014, the date of entry of judgment; and (2) post-judgment interest computed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961, accruing from November 17, 2014 until the Judgment is paid. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/30/2015. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Pending before the Court are Dfts' motions for judgment on the pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. For the foregoing reasons, Dfts' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court permits the following claims to continue forward: (1) Kogut's malicious prosecution claim relating to his second trial, his negligent supervision claim, and a claim based on respondeat superior; and (2) Restivo's and Hal stead's conspiracy claims. Furthermore, all claims against Gruber are DISMISSED. Finally, Pltffs fail to allege sufficient facts to state a claim against Kane, Willett, Kozier, and Donnelly. Accordingly, Gruber, Kane, Willett, Kozier and Donnelly are DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to update the docket accordingly. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/3/09. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; Pursuant to the Local Rules of this District, the following cases: 06-CV-6695 (JS)(WDW), and 06-CV-6720 (JS)(WDW) shall be consolidated under the earliest filed case, Kogut v. County of Nassau, 06-CV-6695. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the 06-CV-6720 action, and all papers are to be filed under the Kogut action, 06-CV-6695. ( Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/31/2009.) (Fagan, Linda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restivo et al v. Nassau County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?