CDR-Wantagh, Inc. et al v. Motiva Enterprises LLC
Plaintiff: |
CDR-Wantagh, Inc. and Christine D. Rivera |
Defendant: |
Shell Oil Company and Motiva Enterprises LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2007cv04497 |
Filed: |
October 26, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Central Islip Office |
County: |
Nassau |
Presiding Judge: |
Denis R. Hurley |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael L. Orenstein |
Nature of Suit: |
Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 5, 2012 |
Filing
102
ORDER re 100 : For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order plaintiff's request that the Court defer calculation of attorney's fees is granted. As set forth in the attached decision, the Clerk of the Court is hereby dire cted to enter judgment in accordance with the Court's December 20, 2011 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. The case is not, however, to be marked closed because the issue of attorney's fees remains to be resolved. To that end, the p arties are directed to notify the Court within fourteen (14) days of the Second Circuit's decision on plaintiffs' appeal. At that time, the Court will set a briefing schedule on any appropriate motion for attorney's fees by the prevailing party. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/5/2012. (Malley, Sean)
|
December 20, 2011 |
Filing
98
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; Motions terminated: 68 MOTION in Limine is denied in part and denied as moot. Rulings on 85 Motion in Limine were made from the bench during trial and the motion is terminated. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 12/20/2011. (Best, Patricia)
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
66
ORDER: The Court will begin the Bench Trial on 3/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley.. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/1/2011. (Best, Patricia)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER denying 54 Motion in Limine. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, Defendants' motion to strike the Expert Report and preclude Mr. Balin from testifying at trial is DENIED. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge William D. Wall's Chambers forthwith, at (631) 712-5720, to schedule a final settlement conference. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 2/28/2011. (Monaco, Laura)
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth herein, Pltffs' motion for partial summary judgment, and Defts' motion for summary judgment, are both DENIED. ( Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/31/09.) (Fagan, Linda)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?