Tretola et al v. County of Nassau et al
Plaintiff: Martin Tretola and Marbles Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: County of Nassau, Faltings, Nassau County Police Officer John Does #1-5 and Nassau County Assistant District Attorneys Does #1-5
Case Number: 2:2008cv03225
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Presiding Judge: William D. Wall
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court awards Plaintiff prejudgment interest on $440,605.00 at a rate of.0013. Plaintiff is directed to submit a proposed judgment within 30 days of this Order in accordance with this Order as well as the Courts prior Orders and its acceptance of the remittitur. (Docket Entries 93 , 95 , and 96 .) Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 6/24/2014. (Kaley, Regina)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 (AMENDED) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. The Memorandum and Order dated February 19, 2014 has been amended solely to modify the caption "County of Nassau" instead of "County of Suffolk" as a defendant.. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 4/16/2014. (Lundy, Lisa) (Main Document 95 replaced on 4/16/2014) (Fagan, Linda). Modified on 4/16/2014 (Fagan, Linda).
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Rule 50(b) is denied. Their application made under Rule 59 for a new trial is denied if plaintiff accepts the two remittitur amounts established above. Which is to say, unless plaintiff agrees no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, in writing, filed electronically with the Court and served on defendants, to accept a remittitur of the compensatroy damage award to $760,605 and a remittitur of the punitive damages award to $175,000, a new trial will be ordered.. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 2/19/2014. (Lundy, Lisa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tretola et al v. County of Nassau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Tretola
Represented By: Charles H. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marbles Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Charles H. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Nassau
Represented By: Ryan Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faltings
Represented By: Ryan Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Police Officer John Does #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Assistant District Attorneys Does #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?