Brinn v. Syosset Public Library et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Joshua Brinn
Defendant: Syosset Public Library, Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley, Utica National Insurance Company, Judith Lockman and Robert Glick
Case Number: 2:2009cv01151
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Thomas C. Platt
Presiding Judge: William D. Wall
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2010 Filing 40 Letter from Mercedes Colwin, Gordon & Rees to Clerk dated 2/9/10 re: we write this letter to advise you that Jennifer H. Pymm is no longer with our firm and we respectfully request that you remove her from the docket on cases from this office. (Mahon, Cinthia)
December 18, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas C. Platt:Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2009 re 33 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss filed by Utica National Insurance Company, 27 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley, 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Judith Lockman, Syosset Public Library, Robert Glick. Raymond Nardo, Thomas Catalano, Sherri Pavloff and Peter Contini present. Motion argued DECISION RESERVED. (Court Reporter Harry Rappaport.) (McMorrow, Karen)
November 10, 2009 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Brinn re 36 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 38 Exhibit. (Glueckert, Lisa)
November 10, 2009 Filing 38 EXHIBIT by Joshua Brinn. Related document: 36 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Joshua Brinn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 2) (Glueckert, Lisa)
November 10, 2009 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 33 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua Brinn. (Glueckert, Lisa)
November 10, 2009 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Joshua Brinn, Esq. in Opposition re 33 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua Brinn. (Glueckert, Lisa)
November 10, 2009 Filing 35 REPLY in Support re 33 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by Utica National Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Pavloff, Sherri)
November 10, 2009 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss filed by Utica National Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Pavloff, Sherri)
November 10, 2009 Filing 33 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss by Utica National Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/10/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit of Sherri Pavloff, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Robyn Nelson, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Pavloff, Sherri)
November 10, 2009 Filing 32 REPLY in Support re 27 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley. (Contini, Peter)
November 10, 2009 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 27 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua Brinn. (Contini, Peter)
November 10, 2009 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 27 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua Brinn. (Contini, Peter)
November 10, 2009 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re 27 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley. (Contini, Peter)
November 10, 2009 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 27 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Contini, Peter)
November 10, 2009 Filing 27 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley. Responses due by 11/20/2009 (Contini, Peter)
November 10, 2009 Filing 26 REPLY in Support re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) Reply Memorandum of Law filed by Robert Glick, Judith Lockman, Syosset Public Library. (Catalano, Thomas)
November 10, 2009 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Joshua Brinn. (Catalano, Thomas)
November 10, 2009 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) Declaration of Joshua Brinn, Esq. filed by Joshua Brinn. (Catalano, Thomas)
November 10, 2009 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Robert Glick, Judith Lockman, Syosset Public Library. (Catalano, Thomas)
November 10, 2009 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) Declaration of Richard Granofsky, Esq. filed by Robert Glick, Judith Lockman, Syosset Public Library. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B-First Notice of Claim, # 3 Exhibit C-October 15, 2007 letter) (Catalano, Thomas)
November 10, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Robert Glick, Judith Lockman, Syosset Public Library. (Catalano, Thomas)
October 27, 2009 Filing 20 Letter in opposition to defendant Utica's request to submit an oversized reply brief by Joshua Brinn (Nardo, Raymond)
October 26, 2009 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages requesting permission to file 20 page MOL by Utica National Insurance Company (Pavloff, Sherri) Modified on 10/27/2009, entry changed to a motion (Glueckert, Lisa).
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion to dismiss Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1040 before Senior Judge Thomas C. Platt. (McMorrow, Karen)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Robert Glick answer due 9/11/2009; Judith Lockman answer due 9/11/2009; Syosset Public Library answer due 9/11/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 8/28/2009. (Hepworth, F.)
August 26, 2009 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or to move or otherwise repond to the complaint by Robert Glick, Judith Lockman, Syosset Public Library. (Catalano, Thomas)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The stipulation extending defendant Utica National Insurance Company's time to respond to the complaint is hereby So Ordered. Utica National Insurance Company answer due 9/11/2009. Ordered by Judge William D. Wall on 8/21/2009. (Disbrow, Sandra)
August 21, 2009 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, to be So Ordered by Utica National Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation Extending Time) (Farber, Braden)
August 19, 2009 Filing 16 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley. (Contini, Peter)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 13 , 14 , 15 defendants' Motions for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond. The stipulations attached to the motions are hereby So Ordered. Judith Lockman answer due 8/26/2009; Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley answer due 8/19/2009; Syosset Public Library answer due 8/26/2009; Robert Glick answer due 8/26/2009; Utica National Insurance Company answer due 8/26/2009. Ordered by Judge William D. Wall on 7/23/2009. (Disbrow, Sandra)
July 23, 2009 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Utica National Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation Extending Time) (Farber, Braden)
July 22, 2009 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation) (Pymm, Jennifer)
July 21, 2009 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, letter motion to Magistrate Judge Wall by Robert Glick, Judith Lockman, Syosset Public Library. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation) (Catalano, Thomas)
July 21, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer H. Pymm on behalf of Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley (aty to be noticed) (Pymm, Jennifer)
July 21, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes Colwin on behalf of Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley (aty to be noticed) (Colwin, Mercedes)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley answer due 8/14/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 7/17/2009. (Disbrow, Sandra)
July 17, 2009 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley. (Sutton, Leigh)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER TO ANSWER The stipulation 9 is hereby So Ordered. Defendant Utica National Insurance Company answer due 7/31/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 6/15/2009. (Disbrow, Sandra)
June 15, 2009 Filing 9 Letter enclosing Stipulation Extending Time to be So Ordered by Hon. Judge Platt by Utica National Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation Extending Time) (Farber, Braden)
June 10, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Granofsky on behalf of Syosset Public Library, Judith Lockman, Robert Glick (aty to be noticed) (Granofsky, Richard)
June 10, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Catalano on behalf of Syosset Public Library, Judith Lockman, Robert Glick (aty to be noticed) (Catalano, Thomas)
June 4, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Brinn. Utica National Insurance Company served on 5/19/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Nardo, Raymond)
June 4, 2009 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Brinn. Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley served on 5/20/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Nardo, Raymond)
June 4, 2009 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Brinn. Judith Lockman served on 5/20/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Nardo, Raymond)
June 4, 2009 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Brinn. Syosset Public Library served on 5/20/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Nardo, Raymond)
June 3, 2009 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Brinn. Robert Glick served on 5/20/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Nardo, Raymond)
March 20, 2009 Case Ineligible for Arbitration (Bollbach, Jean)
March 19, 2009 Summons Issued as to Syosset Public Library, Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley, Utica National Insurance Company, Judith Lockman, Robert Glick. (Carine, Sandra)
March 19, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Receipt #29294) against Syosset Public Library, Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley, Utica National Insurance Company, Judith Lockman, Robert Glick $ 350 Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Joshua Brinn. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carine, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinn v. Syosset Public Library et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Brinn
Represented By: Raymond Nardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syosset Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Lockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?