Solis v. SCA Restaurant Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Hilda L. Solis |
Defendant: |
SCA Restaurant Corp. and Luigi Quarta |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv02212 |
Filed: |
May 26, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Central Islip Office |
County: |
Nassau |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bianco |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Thomas Boyle |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting 86 Motion for Attorney Fees. For the reasons discussed herein, the Court grants plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and costs. Plaintiff is awarded $8,183.45 in costs and $5,062.50 in attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/14/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
|
April 5, 2013 |
Filing
83
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the reasons set forth herein, the Court concludes, after carefully considering the evidence introduced at trial, the arguments of counsel, and the controlling law on the issues presented, that the Secretary has shown by a preponderance of the evidence that defendants violated the minimum wage, overtime, record-keeping, and anti-retaliation provisions of the FLSA. The Court hereby enters judgment in the amount of $277,734.24 against defendants, consisting of $ ;137,867.12 of unpaid damages, $137,867.12 in liquidated damages, and $2,000 in retaliatory damages. A prospective injunction restraining defendants from future violations of the FLSA is also imposed. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/5/2013. (Pilmar, Philip)
|
December 1, 2011 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' request that the automatic stay arising under Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code be found to apply to this action is denied. The action is exempt from the automatic stay under the police and regulatory powers exemption set forth in Section 362(b)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/1/2011. (Weber, Rebecca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?