In the Matter of the Petition of Fire Island Ferries, Inc. v. Voubouris et al
Petitioner: In the Matter of the Petition of Fire Island Ferries, Inc.
Respondent: Jennifer Ghany and Anastasid Voubouris
Case Number: 2:2011cv03475
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER re [164, 166, 167]: The Court finds that its December 6, 2019 Order 160 is not subject to appellate jurisdiction under either 28 U.S.C. § 1292(a)(1) or 28 U.S.C. § 1292(a)(3). Accordingly, this Court has not been divested of jurisdiction and will proceed with a bench trial to determine damages. See attached Order. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/16/2020. (Hoon, Megha)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying 159 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Claimant Diaz's motion to dismiss is denied. A telephone conference will be held in this matter on December 13, 2019 at 2:30 P.M. to discuss the bench trial. Petitioner should init iate the call and counsel for both sides shall be on the line before calling Chambers at (631) 712-5650. In the event counsel is unavailable at the scheduled time, s/he shall consult with opposing counsel and provide two alternate dates and/or times by letter filed on ECF no later than December 11, 2019. See attached Memorandum & Order for details. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 12/6/2019. (Hoon, Megha)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re 143 , 144 : For the reasons discussed in the attached Order, the Court declines Claimants' request to hold a jury trial on the issue of damages. A telephone conference will be held in this matter on January 15, 2019 at 3:30 P.M. to d iscuss the impending bench trial. Petitioner should initiate the call and counsel for both sides shall be on the line before calling Chambers at (631) 712-5650. In the event counsel is unavailable at the scheduled time, s/he shall consult with opposing counsel and provide two alternate dates and/or times by letter filed on ECF no later than January 11, 2019. See attached Order. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/7/2019. (Bochner, Francesca)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: FIF's petition for exoneration or, in the alternative to limit is liability, is denied. See attached Memorandum & Order. The parties will be notified of a date for conference to discuss the remaining issue(s).(Gapinski, Michele) Modified on 2/5/2018 (Lundy, Lisa).
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: Claimants' two pronged request, as set forth in their post-trial reply (Doc. 126 at 19) and their letter to the Court dated April 17, 2017 (Doc. # 132) is denied in toto. Accordingly, the Court's decision on petitioner's application to limit its potential liability to the value of the Courier, now sub judice, will be decided on the evidence adduced at trial. See attached. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 7/6/2017. (Gapinski, Michele)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Petition of Fire Island Ferries, Inc. v. Voubouris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer Ghany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anastasid Voubouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of the Petition of Fire Island Ferries, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Hornig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?