K-Beech, Inc. v. John Does 1-37 Featured Case
Plaintiff: K-Beech, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-37
Case Number: 2:2011cv03995
Filed: August 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Presiding Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by K-Beech, Inc. Without Prejudice of All Remaining John Doe Defendants (Abramson, Frederic)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER & REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 Amended Complaint filed by K-Beech, Inc. For the reasons set forth in the attached report, it is recommended that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/1/2012. (Disbrow, Sandra)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motions to quash 7 , 13 , 14 , 16 , 17 , 34 for the reasons set forth in the Order & Report and Recommendation 39 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/1/2012. (Disbrow, Sandra)
February 22, 2012 Order Dismissing Parties: Endorsed on Doc # 38 - John Doe #5 is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 2/22/2012. (Best, Patricia)
February 21, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by K-Beech, Inc. of John Doe 5 With Prejudice (Abramson, Frederic)
January 23, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Murtha on behalf of John Doe 35 (aty to be noticed) (Murtha, James)
January 20, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 Letter MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served on Earthlink filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Abramson, Frederic)
January 17, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Effectuate Service on Doe Defendants by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Abramson, Frederic)
January 13, 2012 Filing 34 Letter MOTION to Quash Subpoena Served on Earthlink by Doe #2. (Attachments: # 1 Doe #2 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service) (Augustine, Joseph)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Subpoena. Defendant Doe #2 must respond to the subpoena no later than 1/13/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/29/2011. (Demosthenous, Constantina)
December 28, 2011 Filing 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Subpeona from plaintiff by Doe #2. (Augustine, Joseph)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 32 : Plaintiff's request for an extension of time, through January 16, 2012, to effectuate service of the summons and Complaint on each of the doe Defendants is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 12/19/2011. (Monaco, Laura)
December 16, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Effectuate Service on Doe Defendants by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Abramson, Frederic)
December 2, 2011 Order Dismissing Parties endorsed on doc # 31. Defendant Doe 13 is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 12/2/2011. (Best, Patricia)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating 8 Motion to Quash in light of the dismissal from this action of defendant John Doe #32. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/2/2011. (Disbrow, Sandra)
December 1, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by K-Beech, Inc. with Prejudice of Doe 13 Only (Abramson, Frederic)
November 21, 2011 Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown added. Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to case. (Siegfried, Evan)
November 18, 2011 Order Dismissing Parties: Doc # 30 is So Ordered and Party John Doe #32 is terminated with prejudice.. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/18/2011. (Best, Patricia)
November 17, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by K-Beech, Inc. With Prejudice of Doe #32 Only (Abramson, Frederic)
November 10, 2011 Filing 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Filed by John Doe #16. filed by John Does 1-37 (John Doe #16.) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Fagan, Linda)
November 7, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE by K-Beech, Inc. re 26 Memorandum in Opposition, of Filing Response to Motion to Quash (Abramson, Frederic)
November 7, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by K-Beech, Inc. re 25 Memorandum in Opposition, 26 Memorandum in Opposition, of Filing Exhibit A (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Abramson, Frederic)
November 4, 2011 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Compel the Court to issue an order granteing leave to proceed anonymously filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Abramson, Frederic)
November 4, 2011 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, filed by John Doe #30. filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Abramson, Frederic)
November 3, 2011 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 13 Letter MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Abramson, Frederic)
November 3, 2011 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 7 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Abramson, Frederic)
November 2, 2011 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Filed by John Doe #16. filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Abramson, Frederic)
November 1, 2011 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 8 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Abramson, Frederic)
November 1, 2011 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 7 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Abramson, Frederic)
October 28, 2011 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Does 1-37, filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Abramson, Frederic)
October 28, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, filed by John Doe #30. by John Does 1-37. (Montero, Edher)
October 28, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Filed by John Doe #16. by John Does 1-37. (Montero, Edher)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 9 Motion for Leave to File. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/28/2011. (Sofio, Lisa)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER re 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Filed by John Doe #16. filed by John Does 1-37. The Court directs that the cover letter accompanying DE 16 be filed under seal until a decision is rendered on the Motion to Quash. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/28/2011. (Sofio, Lisa)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER re 17 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, filed by John Doe #30. filed by John Does 1-37. The Court directs that the cover letter accompanying DE 17 be filed under seal until a decision is rendered on the Motion to Quash. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/28/2011. (Sofio, Lisa)
October 27, 2011 Filing 13 Letter MOTION to Quash Subpoena by John Doe. Modified on 10/28/2011 (Fagan, Linda).
October 27, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Rosenzweig on behalf of Doe 29 John (aty to be noticed) (Rosenzweig, James)
October 26, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE by K-Beech, Inc. of Filing Supplemental Authority in Opposition to John Doe 10's Motion to Quash and for a Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Authority) (Abramson, Frederic)
October 25, 2011 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 7 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash and For a Protective Order filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Abramson, Frederic)
October 25, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum in Support of Joinder that Exceeds the Page Limit Under Local Rules by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Abramson, Frederic)
October 19, 2011 Filing 19 Letter from John Doe to Clerk's Office, dated 10/17/2011 re: To advise the Clerk of defts "IP" address; and to further advise the Clerk of the enclosed "Motion to Dismiss and, in the alternative, to Quash and Issue a Protective Order and Motion for Leave to proceed anonymously." (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 10/28/2011) (Fagan, Linda)
October 19, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Compel the Court to issue an order granteing leave to proceed anonymously. (Fagan, Linda)
October 17, 2011 Filing 8 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena by John Doe #32. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law In Support, # 2 Declaration Declaration of John Doe #32, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Geisa Balla and Exhibits, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Balla, Geisa)
October 11, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Quash by John Does 1-37. (Montero, Edher)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third-party subpoenas prior to a Rule 26(f) conference is GRANTED. The Court orders the following: (1) Plaintiff may serve subpoenas pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on the ISPs listed in Exhibit B to the Fieser Declaration: EarthLink, Optimum Online, Road Runner, and Verizon Internet Services to obtain the name, address, telephone number, email address and Media Access Control address for each Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to attach a copy of this Order to the subpoena. (2) Within seven days of service of each subpoena, the ISPs shall reasonably attempt to identify each Defendant and provide him or her with a copy of the subpoena and this Order. If any of the ISPs are unable to determine, to a reasonable degree of technical certainty, the identity of the user of a particular IP address, it shall so notify Plaintiff's counsel. (3) The ISPs shall have twenty-one (21) days from the service of the subpoena to move to quash or otherwise object to the subpoena. Each Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days from receipt of the subpoena from the ISP to move to quash or otherwise object to the subpoena. (4) Absent any motion to quash or objection, the ISPs shall produce the information sought to the Plaintiff within twenty-one (21) days after notifying each Defendant pursuant to paragraph (2) above. (5) Plaintiff may only use the information disclosed pursuant to the subpoenas for the purpose of protecting and enforcing Plaintiff's rights as set forth in the Complaint. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/16/2011. (Sofio, Lisa)
August 25, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Tobias Fieser in Support, # 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Abramson, Frederic)
August 24, 2011 Case Ineligible for Arbitration (Bollbach, Jean)
August 18, 2011 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case (Major, Jasmine)
August 18, 2011 Filing 3 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Copyright Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (Major, Jasmine)
August 18, 2011 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by K-Beech, Inc.. (Major, Jasmine)
August 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by K-Beech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Major, Jasmine)
August 18, 2011 FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 4653032891 (Major, Jasmine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K-Beech, Inc. v. John Does 1-37
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-37
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K-Beech, Inc.
Represented By: Frederic Robert Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?