Paswall v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Evelyn Paswall
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01378
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Presiding Judge: Arthur D. Spatt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2013 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/11/2012. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) Modified on 6/11/2012 to correct a typographical error (Imrie, Robert).
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 9 : The parties have advised that they agree to a sixty (60) day modification to the dates set forth in the proposed scheduling order. Accordingly, the initial conference scheduled for June 13, 2012 is canceled. The scheduling order will be entered by the court incorporating the proposed modification and a final conference will be scheduled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/8/2012. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
June 7, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Evelyn Paswall. (Smith, Derek)
June 1, 2012 Filing 8 Defendant Apple inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Crispi, Thomas)
May 14, 2012 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., filed by Evelyn Paswall. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Smith, Derek)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
April 30, 2012 Filing 5 Defendant Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Crispi, Thomas)
April 30, 2012 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Crispi, Thomas)
April 30, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Crispi on behalf of Apple Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Crispi, Thomas)
April 5, 2012 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evelyn Paswall. Apple Inc. served on 3/30/2012, answer due 5/29/2012. (Phillips, William)
March 22, 2012 Case Ineligible for Arbitration (Bollbach, Jean)
March 20, 2012 FILING FEE: $350, receipt number 4653041474. (Carine, Sandra)
March 20, 2012 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (Carine, Sandra)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Evelyn Paswall. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carine, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paswall v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Paswall
Represented By: Derek T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?