Ahmed et al v. Town of Oyster Bay et al
Plaintiff: |
Tarik Ahmed, Timothy A. Lester and Locust Valley Tobacco, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Diana S. Aquiar, Joseph Ciambra, Frederick P. Ippolito and Town of Oyster Bay |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv03654 |
Filed: |
July 24, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Central Islip Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bianco |
Presiding Judge: |
William D. Wall |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 17, 2023 |
Filing
103
ORDER: Currently before the Court is Defendant Joseph Ciambras ("Defendant") multipart motion in limine (ECF No. 99 ("Defendants Motion")). Based on the foregoing (SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details), Defendant's Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. This matter will proceed to jury selection and trial beginning on January 23, 2023. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR DETAILS. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/17/2023. (LC)
|
September 29, 2021 |
Filing
86
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Diana S. Aquiar and Joseph Ciambra, (ECF No. 80 ), which I referred to Magistrate Judge Locke for a report and recommendation. Judge Locke recommends that the mo tion be granted as to Aquiar and denied as to Ciambra. ( the "R&R"). (ECF No. 83 .) Ciambra timely filed objections to the R&R. (ECF No. 84 .) Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Aquiar and DENIES the motion as to Ciambra. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment accordingly, and dismiss Aquiar as a party to this action. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/29/2021. (Coleman, Laurie)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants in part and denies in part the motion to dismiss. The Court dismisses the procedural due process claim because plaintiffs had an ad equate post-deprivation remedy, and dismisses Lester for lack of standing. The Court denies the motion with respect to Ahmed's and Locust Valley Tobacco's substantive due process claim. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/18/2014. (Chipev, George)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?