Sky Medical Supply Inc. v. SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sky Medical Supply Inc.
Defendant: Benjamin Osiashvili, Mikael Oshiashvili, Aleksey Vayner, Benjamin Osi, Manager Defendant D, Lisa Nason, Nathan Zemel, Mark Wilner, Yakov Perper, Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, William S. Kritzberg, Tatiana Sharahy, Jonathan Glassman, Roy Brown, Daniel Chikvashvili, Damion A. Martins, Nationwide Management Inc., Svetlana Osiashvili, Notary A, William A. Ross, Yak Aranbayev, Vinay Das, Lilian Bobelian, Linda Ackerman, Christopher Ferrante, Olga Gusakov, Yin Faith Mao, Mari Dejesus, Robert A. Sohn, Notary C, Gary J. Florio, Larisa N. Mikver, Joseph C. Cole, Demit Karakizis, Dante Brittis, Mat Gottlieb, Walter Ploski, Berry Katzman, Manager Defendant B, Mitchell Horowitz, BAB Management Inc., Stanley Ross, Management Company E, Michael Leibowitz, Benjamin Nachamie, Joseph Bittar, Nelly Vayner, Anna Krol, Brian Freindlich, Pamela Levine, Patricia Holland, Lawrence Chiaromonte, Leonard Landesberg, Andrew Bazos, Timothy Chung, Denis Mann, Julio Westerband, Al Maurovsky, Renat R. Sukhov, Iqbal Merchant, MD, Charlett Demarco, Manager Defendant C, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Notary B, Evgeniya Vakhidova, Wayne Kerness, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Charles Bagley, James Graziano, Manager Defendant A, Anatoly Risman, Robert Hyman, Notary D, John Kim, Alex Vayner, Warren Cohen, Antonio Martins, Veniamin Osiashvili, Mark Weber, Elena Belkin, Lisa George, Management Company D, Ali Mohsin, Management Company C, Michael Osiashvili, Alan Ng, Manager Defendant E, Mitchell L. Weisman, Oleg Fuzolav, Andrew Miller, Robert Michaels, Drew Stein, Management Company A, Management Company B, Eka Bass, George A. Gainor, George Etzl, William Rosner, Thomas Blando, Irving Etkind and Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC doing business as All Borough Medical, PC
Interested Party: Government Employees Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: BDB Management and TCMR Management, Inc.
Special Master: Clifford S. Robert
Case Number: 2:2012cv06383
Filed: December 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
2 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #657 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Notwithstanding what appears to be an objection by Plaintiffs' counsel, the application for a final extension is granted. The deadline to produce the subject documents to the Special Master is extended to July 17, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/10/2020. (Ameri, Mana)
June 9, 2020 Filing 657 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Documents with Special Master by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #656 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline to produce the subject documents to the Special Master is extended to June 15, 2020. Although the Court is cognizant of the circumstances created by COVID-19, the Court assumes that counsel has some electronic information and telephonic access to their clients. It may be necessary for the Defendants to respond as much as they reasonably can under the circumstances and to follow up with supplemental responses. Defendants' counsel is advised that the Court is not in a position to extend this deadline again without a particularized showing of good cause, including the specific obstacles preventing counsel from obtaining the subject documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/18/2020. (Ameri, Mana)
May 14, 2020 Filing 656 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #655 Motion for Discovery. The deadline for the Defendants to provide the subject documents to the Special Master is extended to May 22, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/4/2020. (Ameri, Mana)
April 30, 2020 Filing 655 MOTION for Discovery Extension by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER temporarily denying #650 Motion for Discovery. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR RULINGS AND DIRECTIVES. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/31/2020. (Tomlinson, A.)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER denying #651 , without prejudice, Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Implementation of this Order is deferred until April 20, 2020 for the reasons set forth in the Court's directives. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/31/2020. (Tomlinson, A.)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER regarding #652 : The Court has reviewed #652 Plaintiff's letter correspondence. Once a decision has been rendered on Plaintiff's pending motion at DE #650 it will be posted on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/10/2020. (Ameri, Mana)
March 6, 2020 Filing 652 Letter regarding pending discovery motions by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 651 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal , with attachments that include opposition to Nationwide Defendants' motoin to limit discovery at DE 650, by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Nationwide Parties' letter motion at DE 650, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Sky's memo in opposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Sky's memo in opposition) (Tsirelman, Gary)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a response to #650 by close of business Monday, August 12, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/9/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 650 Letter MOTION for Discovery -- Letter per July 8, 2019 Order, seeking rejection of plaintiff's request for Chase documents outside Court-Ordered limitation on scope of subpoenas -- Confidential attachments filed with hard copy by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER re #646 and #647 : SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/8/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of #644 the extension of time to complete expert discovery, Defendants' #630 #631 and #632 motions for a pre-motion conference are terminated as moot. Defendants may renew their request for a pre-motion conference at the close of expert discovery. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/31/2019. (Knapp, Cody)
May 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #648 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to seal Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's motion filed at DE #647 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/22/2019. (Cento, Patrick) Modified on 5/22/2019 (Toritto, Jim).
May 22, 2019 Filing 648 Letter MOTION to Seal Document #647 Letter MOTION for Discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Tsirelman, Gary)
May 21, 2019 Filing 647 Letter MOTION for Discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Bowers, Nicholas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 646 Letter MOTION for Discovery -- Letter re Special Master Costs by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: counsel for the Nationwide Defendants is directed to re-file the application at DE #645 as a letter motion on ECF. Counsel are reminded that all requests for relief must be filed as motions on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/21/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
May 20, 2019 Filing 645 Letter re Special Master Costs by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner (Douglas, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 644 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Telephone Status Conference held on May 13, 2019. DE #637 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. (Cento, Patrick)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: due to a last minute, trial-related conflict, this afternoon's telephone conference is adjourned to 3:30 p.m. on Monday, May 13, 2019. Counsel are requested to call the Court's teleconference line at that time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/8/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: the Court is conducting a jury trial this week, and anticipates having to charge a jury tomorrow. In light of this fact, the Court is rescheduling tomorrow's conference from 1 p.m. to 3 p.m. -- a time the Court anticipates it is more likely to be free -- and is converting the conference to a telephone conference. Counsel are directed to call into the Court's conference line tomorrow at 3 p.m.: 866-590-5055, access code: 9720458. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/7/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
May 7, 2019 Filing 643 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel E. Ronneburger on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (aty to be noticed) (Ronneburger, Ariel)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #642 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to May 8, 2019 at 1 p.m. Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/26/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
April 25, 2019 Filing 642 MOTION to Adjourn Conference due to medical emergency by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #641 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Conference is adjourned to April 29, 2019 at 11:45 a.m. Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/12/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
April 11, 2019 Filing 641 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference from April 23, 2019 to either April 29, 2019 or May 3, 2019 by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: the Court is scheduling this matter for an in-person conference on April 23, 2019 at 2 p.m. to address Plaintiff's motion to re-open discovery, DE #637 , and Defendants' opposition thereto. Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/10/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
March 7, 2019 Filing 640 Letter to Hon. Kathleen Tomlinson in opposition to Plaintiff's March 5, 2019 Letter by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 639 RESPONSE in Opposition re #637 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Discovery regarding Defendants Westerband and Ferrante filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Robert A. Sohn, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 638 RESPONSE to Motion re #637 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Discovery regarding Defendants Westerband and Ferrante filed by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 637 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , MOTION for Discovery regarding Defendants Westerband and Ferrante by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 27, 2019 Filing 636 Letter by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Robert A. Sohn, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 635 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Telephone Conference held on 2/20/2019 Parties are directed to file a status report, with this Court, as to the Daubert issues outlined on the record within one (1) week of the date of this conference. Parties are further advised that if they wish to re-open discovery, a motion should be made to Magistrate Judge Tomlinson within two (2) weeks of the date of this conference. (FTR Log #4:12-4:36.) (Bollbach, Jean)
February 19, 2019 Filing 634 RESPONSE in Opposition re #632 First MOTION for pre motion conference , #630 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, -- Letter re Anticipated Joining in GW Defendants' Intended Motion to Strike and Preclude and in opposition to GW Defendants' Motion for a Premotion Conference filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 633 RESPONSE to Motion re #631 MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for February 20, 2019 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, #627 Letter, #630 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, -- Letter re Anticipated Joi Letter filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Robert A. Sohn, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 632 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
February 15, 2019 Filing 631 MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for February 20, 2019, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, #627 Letter, #630 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, -- Letter re Anticipated Joining in GW Defendants' Intended Motion to Strike and Preclude by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 630 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, -- Letter re Anticipated Joining in GW Defendants' Intended Motion to Strike and Preclude by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/8/2019. (Tomlinson, A.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #628 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court has received the defendants' letter requesting a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving to strike. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone pre-motion conference on Wednesday, February 20, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/8/2019.(Allen, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 628 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Robert A. Sohn, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 627 Letter with regard to deadlines set by the Court for Plaintiff to file a financial expert report by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Robert A. Sohn, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 626 STIPULATION AND ORDER voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. terminated.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/3/2019. (Bollbach, Jean)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 625 STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to William Kritzberg MD. William Kritzberg (MD) terminated.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/3/2019.
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 624 STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to Eitan Dagan. Eitan Dagan terminated.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/3/2019.
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 623 STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to Mitchell L Weisman MD. Mitchell L. Weisman (MD) terminated.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/3/2019. (Bollbach, Jean)
December 20, 2018 Filing 622 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant William Kritzberg, MD by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 621 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Eitan Dagan by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 620 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 619 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Mitchell Weisman, MD by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #618 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for expert witness reports is extended to January 30, 2019. The deadline for Plaintiffs to exchange any financial expert reports is also extended to January 30, 2019. The deadline for the parties to seek a pre-motion conference regarding any Daubert motions is extended to February 19, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 11/16/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
October 31, 2018 Filing 618 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 617 SPECIAL MASTER REPORT Report and Recommendation in accordance with the Court's July 1, 2018 Order by Clifford S. Robert (Robert, Clifford)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER. By Order dated September 21, 2018, the Court ordered counsel for defendants to submit a letter to the Court by October 5, 2018 indicating whether there is any objection to adjourning the requested pre-motion conference until the close of discovery. The Court further instructed that the failure to notify the Court of any objections by October 5, 2018 would result in the Court adjourning the conference. By letter dated October 5, 2018, the Nationwide defendants advised the Court that they have no objection to an adjournment. None of the other defendants have objected to an adjournment. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pending requests for a pre-motion conference are denied without prejudice to renewal at the close of discovery. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/9/2018. (Karamigios, Anna)
October 5, 2018 Filing 616 Letter by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
October 5, 2018 Filing 615 Letter to Judge Bianco per September 21, 2018 Order by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner (Douglas, David)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER re #613 Special Master - Letter reporting status of discovery issues and requesting extension of time to submit final report and recommendation filed by Clifford S. Robert. Time extended until October 29, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/28/2018. (Ryan, Mary)
September 27, 2018 Filing 613 SPECIAL MASTER LETTER Letter reporting status of discovery issues and requesting extension of time to submit final report and recommendation by Clifford S. Robert (Robert, Clifford)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER. In light of Judge Tomlinson's September 18, 2018 Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for defendants shall submit a letter to the Court by October 5, 2018 indicating whether there is any objection to adjourning the requested pre-motion conference until the close of discovery. The failure to notify the Court of any objections by October 5, 2018 will result in the Court adjourning the conference. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/21/2018. (Karamigios, Anna)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #605 Motion for Extension. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/18/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
September 17, 2018 Filing 611 REPLY in Opposition to Defendants' motions for summary judgment conferences filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 610 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
September 17, 2018 Filing 609 MOTION for pre motion conference re motion for summary judgment by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 608 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Letter from E. Christopher Murray, Esq. to Hon. John F. Bianco requesting a pre-motion conference in connection with a proposed summary judgment motion seeking dismissal of the action against Damian Martins by Damion A. Martins. (Murray, E.)
September 16, 2018 Filing 607 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re motion for summary judgment by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 606 RESPONSE in Opposition re #605 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with respect to exchange of expert reports filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
August 7, 2018 Filing 605 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with respect to exchange of expert reports by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
August 2, 2018 Filing 604 SPECIAL MASTER LETTER Letter requesting telephone conference by Clifford S. Robert (Robert, Clifford)
July 10, 2018 Filing 603 SPECIAL MASTER LETTER Letter requesting information regarding open discovery dispute(s) by Clifford S. Robert (Robert, Clifford)
July 3, 2018 Filing 602 Letter to counsel for TCMR Management Inc. with copy of court order at DE 600 and affidavit of service by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
July 3, 2018 Filing 601 Letter to counsel for BDB Management NY Inc. with copy of court order at DE 600 and affidavit of service by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/2/2018. (Tomlinson, A.)
June 27, 2018 Filing 599 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 31, 2018, before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 518-581-8973. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2018. (Kanellopoulos, John)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #572 , #574 , #575 , and #576 , as these motions were addressed in the Court's Minute Order from the 5/31/18 Conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/20/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
June 20, 2018 Filing 598 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Status Conference held on 5/31/18 to address DE #572 , #574 , #575 , and #576 . SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. (Cento, Patrick) (Ryan, Mary).
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER permitting counsel to bring equipment into Court for purposes of conducting depositions. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/20/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
June 8, 2018 Filing 596 STATUS REPORT JOINT status report, as directed by the Court on May 31, 2018, regarding bank subpoenas for Nationwide Management Inc., TCMR and BDB by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: the Court is advancing tomorrow's Conference from 3 p.m. to 1:30 p.m. Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/30/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
May 29, 2018 Filing 595 Letter submitted jointly by all parties concerning the status of DE 572 and 574-576, as requested by the Court, by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: the Court reminds the parties that this matter is set down for a status conference next Thursday, May 31, 2018 at 3 p.m. The Court requests that by close of business on Tuesday, May 29, 2018, counsel submit a joint statement to the Court addressing the status of the pending discovery motions, DE #572 , DE #574 - #576 , and whether any of the issues raised have been resolved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/25/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: the Court is setting this matter down for a Status Conference on May 31, 2018 at 3 p.m. to address outstanding discovery motions DE #572 and DE #574 - #577 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/30/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
February 1, 2018 Filing 594 Letter regarding amended bank subpoena for SCS, and annexed subpoena by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 SUBPOENA) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 30, 2018 Filing 593 Letter by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re DE #592 . To the extent counsel's correspondence requests relief from the Court, this request is DENIED, without prejudice, as it is not properly filed as a motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/30/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
January 29, 2018 Filing 592 Letter by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vogel, Justin)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER addressing #590 re: deadline to file letter requests for pre-motion conference. After conferring with Judge Bianco, the Court is holding this deadline in abeyance pending resolution of the outstanding motions. Counsel will be notified of the new deadline when the motions are resolved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/26/2018. (Tomlinson, A.)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 591 STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to Denis Mann. Denis Mann (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/22/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)
January 22, 2018 Filing 590 Letter re Pre-Motion Conference Requests with Respect to Summary Judgment Motions by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner (Douglas, David)
January 22, 2018 Filing 589 RESPONSE in Opposition re #575 MOTION to Compel Julio Westerband, M.D., to provide testimony filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vogel, Justin)
January 21, 2018 Filing 586 RESPONSE in Opposition re #576 MOTION to Compel Nationwide Defendants to provide testimony filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 588 STIPULATION AND ORDER voluntarily dismissing with prejduice as to Mitchell Ehrilich MD. Mitchell Ehrlich (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/19/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 587 STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to Mark Weber,MD. Mark Weber (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/19/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)
January 19, 2018 Filing 585 RESPONSE in Opposition re #574 MOTION to Compel Tatiana Sharahy, M.D., and Patient Focus Medical Examinations, P.C., to provide testimony Opposition Letter filed by Tatiana Sharahy. (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Per DE 583, DE 577 is deemed withdrawn as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/19/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
January 19, 2018 Filing 584 STIPULATION of Dismissal solely as to Defendant Dennis Mann, M.D. by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #583 Motion to Withdraw previous MOTION to Compel as to SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. to provide testimony. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/19/2018. (Tomlinson, A.)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #578 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to serve the modified subpoena at issue is extended to February 1, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/19/2018. (Tomlinson, A.)
January 19, 2018 Filing 583 MOTION to Withdraw #577 MOTION to Compel SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., to provide testimony by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 19, 2018 Filing 582 STIPULATION of Dismissal solely as to Defendant Marc Weber, M.D., corrected with all signatures by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 19, 2018 Filing 581 STIPULATION of Dismissal solely as to Defendant Mitchell Ehrlich, M.D., corrected with all signatures by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 19, 2018 Filing 580 STIPULATION of Dismissal solely as to Defendant Mitchell Ehrlich, M.D. by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 19, 2018 Filing 579 STIPULATION of Dismissal solely as to Defendant Marc Weber, M.D. by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 18, 2018 Filing 578 MOTION for Extension of Time to File the modified bank subpoena pertaining to Defendant SCS by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Counsel for Defendants are reminded that to the extent they choose to oppose Plaintiff's motions to compel, DE #574 - DE #577 , the time for doing so is set out in paragraph 4 of this Court's most recent Minute Order, DE #567 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/17/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Court is directing Plaintiff's counsel to forward to Chambers by overnight mail courtesy copies of the full deposition transcripts relative to the four motions to compel, DE #574 - DE #577 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/16/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
January 15, 2018 Filing 577 MOTION to Compel SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., to provide testimony by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2018 Filing 576 MOTION to Compel Nationwide Defendants to provide testimony by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2018 Filing 575 MOTION to Compel Julio Westerband, M.D., to provide testimony by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2018 Filing 574 MOTION to Compel Tatiana Sharahy, M.D., and Patient Focus Medical Examinations, P.C., to provide testimony by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bowers, Nicholas)
December 28, 2017 Filing 573 REPLY in Opposition re #572 Letter MOTION to Quash Proposed "Modified" Subpoenas filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit Modified "Claim-Specific" Subpoenas, #3 Exhibit Letter to Nationwide Re: Authorizations, #4 Exhibit Transcript of Hon. Joseph F. Bianco's oral decision, #5 Exhibit Excerpts from Osiashvili Transcript) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
December 22, 2017 Filing 572 Letter MOTION to Quash Proposed "Modified" Subpoenas by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
December 21, 2017 Filing 571 Subpoena by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
December 21, 2017 Filing 570 Subpoena by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
December 21, 2017 Filing 569 Subpoena by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
December 21, 2017 Filing 568 Subpoena by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
December 18, 2017 Filing 567 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Discovery Status Conference held on 12/18/2017. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. (Cento, Patrick)
December 9, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re #565 and #566 . This case is set down for an in-person conference on December 14, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. at which time counsel are to be prepared to address the contents of DE 565 and 566. The Court does not intend to adjourn this date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/9/2017. (Tomlinson, A.)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #564 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated November 13, 2017, defendants request an extension of time to submit their request for a pre-motion conference on their anticipated motion for summary judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants shall submit their request for a pre-motion conference by January 25, 2018. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 11/21/2017. (Karamigios, Anna)
November 14, 2017 Filing 566 Letter as to outstanding discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 14, 2017 Filing 565 Letter by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
November 13, 2017 Filing 564 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File requests for a pre-summary judgment motion conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
November 13, 2017 Filing 563 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 2, 2017, before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. Transcriber Writers Cramp, Inc., Telephone number 609-588-8043. Email address: wtrscramp@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2018. (Kanellopoulos, John)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order In light of Judge Bianco's Order of 11/2/17 [DE 562], the Court is directing counsel to provide an update as to what discovery remains to be completed in this matter. This joint submission is to be filed by 11/14/17. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 11/6/2017. (Cento, Patrick)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in detail on the record during today's telephone conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to set aside or modify Magistrate Judge Tomlinson'sorder (ECF No. 532) is denied.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 11/2/2017. (Bollbach, Jean)
November 2, 2017 Filing 561 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:denying #532 Motion to Set Aside ; denying #534 Motion to Set Aside ; oral ruling held on 11/2/2017. (FTR Log #3:22.) (Bollbach, Jean)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone conference with the Court on Thursday, November 2, 2017 at 3:00 p.m., at which time the Court will orally rule on the pending motion at ECF No. 532. At the time of the conference, counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at 631-712-5670. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/23/2017. (Consalvo, Mikayla)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER Re: DE 557, 558, 559 and denying #554 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying #555 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/5/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
September 5, 2017 Filing 559 Letter of clarification by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
September 1, 2017 Filing 558 Letter regarding outstanding depositions by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Bowers, Nicholas)
September 1, 2017 Filing 557 Letter regarding August 22, 2017 Order and outstanding depositions by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re #556 Affidavit filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc., #554 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Wayne Kerness, #555 Answer to Complaint filed by Yin Faith Mao. The Court has reviewed the parties multiple submissions concerning a further extension of the discovery deadlines in this matter. See DE 554, 555, 556. Having done so, the Court defers issuing a ruling as to these requests at this time. Rather, the Court directs the parties to provide a specific listing of all outstanding depositions as well as the proposed dates of completion. This information is to be provided in writing by August 31, 2017. Upon receiving this additional information, the Court will consider the extension request. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/22/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
August 21, 2017 Filing 556 RESPONSE to Motion re #555 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , #554 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Letter motion for an extension of the fact discovery deadline UPDATED request pursuant to continued deposition of Plaintiff filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
August 4, 2017 Filing 555 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
August 3, 2017 Filing 554 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Letter motion for an extension of the fact discovery deadline by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
July 12, 2017 Filing 553 Letter in response to Defendants' Letter dated July 11, 2017 and in opposition to Defendants' request to strike arguments and to file a sur-reply by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Nachmani, Jacob)
July 11, 2017 Filing 552 Letter requesting the Court to disregard the new argument raised by Plaintiff in the Reply Memorandum, or, in the alternative, to allow GW Defendants to file a Sur-Reply letter by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
July 7, 2017 Filing 551 REPLY in Support re #550 Reply in Support, Exhibits to be filed under seal filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Bowers, Nicholas)
July 7, 2017 Filing 550 REPLY in Support re #534 First MOTION to Set Aside Or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 (with grammatical corrections to Plaintiff's original motion) filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stefan Belinfanti, #2 Declaration of Nicholas Bowers, #3 Spine Specialists Decision, #4 Warren Rehab Decision, #5 Pointe Physical Therapy Decision) (Bowers, Nicholas)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #549 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal. Counsel is directed to file the original documents under seal as separate entries. Instructions on filing sealed documents on ECF are located at www.nyed.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/7/2017. (Consalvo, Mikayla)
July 7, 2017 Filing 549 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2) (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 22, 2017 Filing 548 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecilia Rose Ehresman on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (aty to be noticed) (Ehresman, Cecilia)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #547 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #547 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. By letter dated June 21, 2017, plaintiff requests an extension of time to file its reply brief in connection with plaintiff's appeal of Magistrate Judge Tomlinson's Order, as well as leave to file excess pages in the reply brief. Defendants consent to both requests. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requests are granted. Plaintiff's reply brief shall be no more than twenty-five pages, and the reply brief shall be due by July 7, 2017. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/22/2017. (Consalvo, Mikayla)
June 21, 2017 Filing 547 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief, Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Nachmani, Jacob)
June 19, 2017 Filing 546 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #534 First MOTION to Set Aside Or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 (with grammatical corrections to Plaintiff's original motion), #532 First MOTION to Set Aside or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
June 16, 2017 Filing 545 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #534 First MOTION to Set Aside Or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 (with grammatical corrections to Plaintiff's original motion), #532 First MOTION to Set Aside or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 filed by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., TCMR Management, Inc.. (Douglas, David)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER denying #536 , #537 , #538 . SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/16/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
June 16, 2017 Filing 543 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #532 First MOTION to Set Aside or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Memorandum in Opposition) (Vogel, Justin)
June 16, 2017 Filing 542 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Nachmani on behalf of Sky Medical Supply Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Nachmani, Jacob)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #539 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court is in receipt of the GW defendants' May 26, 2017 letter requesting a two-week extension of time to file their opposition to plaintiff's motion, and plaintiff's May 26, 2017 letter opposing that request. In light of the GW defendants' counsel's need to address issues in another matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted; defendants' and plaintiff's respective impending deadlines associated with the motion shall be extended by two weeks. However, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's request that the Court adjust the discovery deadlines by two weeks in light of its decision to grant defendants' request is also granted. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/26/2017. (Consalvo, Mikayla)
May 26, 2017 Filing 541 REPLY to Response to Motion re #539 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File request a brief extension of time to file opposition to plaintiff's motion (docket # 532) Response to GW Defendants' motion for an extension, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 26, 2017 Filing 540 Letter regarding Defendant Aleksey Vayner by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
May 26, 2017 Filing 539 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File request a brief extension of time to file opposition to plaintiff's motion (docket # 532) by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
May 26, 2017 Filing 538 Letter in response to plaintiff's letter filed last evening (docket #537) by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
May 25, 2017 Filing 537 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #536 Letter, request to appoint a discovery master by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
May 24, 2017 Filing 536 Letter requesting a conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
May 12, 2017 Filing 535 Letter to Hon. Joseph F. Bianco regarding the grammatical corrections made to Plaintiff's original motion at DE 532 by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 12, 2017 Filing 534 First MOTION to Set Aside Or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 (with grammatical corrections to Plaintiff's original motion) by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order at DE 524, #2 Exhibit Subpoenas, #3 Exhibit Damages Spreadsheet, #4 Exhibit Court Appearance Information, #5 Exhibit Transcript from MTD (Hon. Bianco), #6 Exhibit Bank Records, #7 Exhibit Bank Records, #8 Exhibit Bank Records, #9 Declaration Declaration) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #533 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated May 3, 2017, the GW defendants request a three-week extension of time to file their opposition to plaintiff's motion to set aside an order issued by Magistrate Judge Tomlinson. Plaintiff consents. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. The GW defendants' opposition shall be due by June 2, 2017. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 05/03/2017. (Consalvo, Mikayla)
May 3, 2017 Filing 533 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition to plaintiff's motion to set aside Magistrate Tomlinson's Order by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
April 28, 2017 Filing 532 First MOTION to Set Aside or Modify the Magistrate's Order at DE 524 by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order at DE 524, #2 Exhibit Subpoenas, #3 Exhibit Damages Spreadsheet, #4 Exhibit Court Appearance Information, #5 Exhibit Transcript from MTD (Hon. Bianco), #6 Exhibit Bank Records, #7 Exhibit Bank Records, #8 Exhibit Bank Records, #9 Declaration Declaration) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #528 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's April 4, 2017 request for an extension of time to file objections to Magistrate Judge Tomlinson's March 24, 2017 ruling; the GW defendants' April 5, 2017 letter and the Nationwide defendants' April 5, 2017 letter opposing the request; and plaintiff's April 5, 2017 letter in further support of the request. Given the complexity of the motion and the Passover holidays, the Court grants plaintiff's request for a three-week extension to file objections to the ruling. With respect to any prejudice to defendants that could result in light of the discovery deadline, the Court can request that the Magistrate Judge extend the discovery deadline, if that becomes necessary by virtue of any delay in a disposition of any appeal. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/6/2017. (Consalvo, Mikayla)
April 5, 2017 Filing 531 REPLY in Opposition re #528 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections and a motion to modify or set aside filed by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, TCMR Management, Inc., Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
April 5, 2017 Filing 530 REPLY in Opposition , REPLY in Support of motion to extend time to object and move to modify/set aside filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 5, 2017 Filing 529 REPLY in Opposition re #528 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections and a motion to modify or set aside filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
April 4, 2017 Filing 528 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections and a motion to modify or set aside by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 29, 2017 Filing 527 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service for Affidavit of Service of March 24, 2017 Memorandum and Order (Doc. No. 524) served on JPMorgan Chase Bank on 3/28/2017 by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Barkins, Gillian)
March 29, 2017 Filing 526 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of March 24, 2017 Memorandum and Order (Doc. No. 524) served on JPMorgan Chase Bank on 3/28/2017, filed by BDB Management, Nationwide Management Inc., TCMR Management, Inc.. (Douglas, David)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #495 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/24/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER denying #459 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part #478 Motion to Quash. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff's motion to quash the GEICO Subpoena [DE 459] is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Quash the Chase Subpoenas [DE 478] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Defendants are directed to serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on non-party JP Morgan Chase Bank forthwith and to file proof of such service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/24/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER denying #520 Motion for Discovery. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/24/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
February 23, 2017 Filing 522 NOTICE of Change of firm, address, email, phone by Andrew P. Nitkewicz (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
February 20, 2017 Filing 521 RESPONSE in Opposition re #520 Letter MOTION for Discovery regarding scope of discovery filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
February 6, 2017 Filing 520 Letter MOTION for Discovery regarding scope of discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #519 Motion for Leave to File. The Court has reviewed the Plaintiff's letter motion [DE 519] and the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to submit its letter motion by February 6, 2017. Defendants' opposition is likewise due on February 21, 2017 after which the Court will deem the motion fully briefed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/24/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
January 23, 2017 Filing 519 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Amended Letter Motion Regarding Scope of Discovery, and to grant Defendants two weeks to respond to such submission by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER denying #517 Motion for Discovery. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/18/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
January 16, 2017 Filing 517 Letter MOTION for Discovery regarding scope of discovery pursuant to DE 503 by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
December 19, 2016 Filing 516 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson:finding as moot #472 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; Status Conference held on 12/19/2016; Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2016 re #513 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Denis Mann, Mitchell L. Weisman, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Mitchell Ehrlich, William S. Kritzberg, Dante Brittis, Eitan Dagan, Robert A. Sohn, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Mark Weber, Julio Westerband, #472 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference , for permission to make motions to compel and to extend the discovery deadline, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc., #514 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. (Roman, Joshua)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #515 Letter, filed by Damion A. Martins. The Court has reviewed the letter request submitted by Defendant Damion A. Martins, M.D. and in light of its contents, the request is GRANTED. As such, Defendant's lead counsel will be permitted to substitute another attorney from his office to attend the December 16, 2016 conference, so long as the substitute attorney is fully versed with the facts and circumstances of this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 11/30/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
November 29, 2016 Filing 515 Letter from E. Christopher Murray, Esq. to Hon. A. Kathleen Tomlinson requesting that another attorney from my office, authorized to act on behalf of Damion A. Martins, M.D., appear at the December 16, 2016 pre-motion conference concerning discovery issues by Damion A. Martins (Murray, E.)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #513 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; denying #514 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court has reviewed both DE 513 filed by the GW Defendants as well as DE 514 filed by Plaintiff Sky Medical. Based upon these filings, and the fact that they appear to involve all parties to this litigation, the Court directs that counsel for all parties appear in person before the undersigned on December 16, 2016 at 10 a.m. Counsel are further directed to ensure their availability through the remainder of the business day on December 16, 2016 pending further direction from the Court to be provided on the date and time set forth above. Furthermore, the Court requires lead counsel for each party to be present. No adjournments of this conference date will be granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 11/28/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
November 23, 2016 Filing 514 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
October 27, 2016 Filing 513 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #511 Letter, filed by Denis Mann, Mitchell L. Weisman, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Mitchell Ehrlich, William S. Kritzberg, Dante Brittis, Eitan Dagan, Robert A. Sohn, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Mark Weber, Julio Westerband. The Court has reviewed the Letter [DE 511] submitted by the GW Defendants and hereby REJECTS the letter in its entirety. Initially, the Court points out that to the extent the GW Defendants seek relief relating to a discovery related issue, a letter motion filed in accordance with Rule 7 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as Local Civil Rule 7.1(d) is required. Further, even had the GW Defendants filed the instant request as a letter motion, it would still have been improper inasmuch as the Court had previously directed both parties that prior to any motion being filed, leave from the Court was required. See DE 435. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/19/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
October 17, 2016 Filing 512 Letter in opposition to GW Defendant's MOTION to lift the stay, by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
October 17, 2016 Filing 511 Letter Hon Tomlinson by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #506 , #507 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court has reviewed both DE 506, filed by the Plaintiffs, as well as DE 507, filed by the GW Defendants and the Court hereby DENIES both motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/29/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #509 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Joseph Grace terminated. The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to terminate Attorney Daniel Grace's appearance in this matter and remove his name from the ECF docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/28/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
September 28, 2016 Filing 510 ANSWER to #394 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
September 27, 2016 Filing 509 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Daniel Grace, who has left Plaintiff's firm by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
September 27, 2016 Filing 508 ANSWER to #382 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 507 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #506 Letter , MOTION for Extension of Time to File and in opposition to plaintiff's application dated 9-23-16 by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-EMAIL, #2 Exhibit 2-EMAILS, #3 Exhibit 3-EMAILS) (Vogel, Justin)
September 23, 2016 Filing 506 Letter 12-cv-06383 by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
September 19, 2016 Filing 505 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #503 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,, Affidavit of Svetlana Osiashvili, submitted per Magistrate Judge Tomlinson's instruction at pages 23-24 of Court's September 7, 2016 Memorandum and Order by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner (Douglas, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 504 Letter re Nationwide Defendants and Patient Focus Defendants not intending to file amended pleadings with respect to their counterclaims by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner (Douglas, David)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER denying #428 Motion for Discovery; granting #432 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #433 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #434 Motion to Compel. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/7/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #413 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/24/2016. (Bollbach, Jean)
August 24, 2016 Filing 501 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Bench Ruling held on 8/24/2016 - decision made on the record (Tape #ftr 3:23 - 3:41.) (Bollbach, Jean)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone conference with the Court on August 24, 2016 at 3:00 p.m., at which time the Court will orally rule on the pending motion. At the time of the conference, counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/16/2016. (Akers, Medora)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #499 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The letter motion submitted jointly by the GW Defendants and the Nationwide Defendants is GRANTED to the extent that the deadline for submission of a letter to Judge Bianco seeking a pre-motion conference in anticipation of summary judgment motion practice is held in abeyance pending a decision on the underlying discovery motions pending before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/10/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
August 10, 2016 Filing 500 RESPONSE to Motion re #499 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File (extension of time to file a request for a pre-motion conference) filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
August 9, 2016 Filing 499 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File (extension of time to file a request for a pre-motion conference) by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #496 Motion for Extension of Time to File. In light the fact that the GW Defendants have filed their opposition [DE 498] to Plaintiff's letter motion [DE 495] the Court finds the extension request contained in instant letter motion to be moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/15/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
July 15, 2016 Filing 498 REPLY in Opposition re #495 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery With the Court's Permission filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
July 15, 2016 Filing 497 RESPONSE in Opposition re #495 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery With the Court's Permission filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
July 14, 2016 Filing 496 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition to Plaintiff's motion (Docket No. 495) by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
July 12, 2016 Filing 495 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery With the Court's Permission by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER re #491 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney. Attorney Andrew P. Nitkewicz (Avelino Nitkewicz LLP) and Traci Money Strickland terminated. Andrew P. Nitkewicz (Cullen and Dykman) added. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/11/2016. (Ryan, Mary)
July 8, 2016 Filing 493 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Andrew P. Nitkewicz (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
July 8, 2016 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Nitkewicz on behalf of Tatiana Sharahy (notification declined or already on case) (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
July 8, 2016 Filing 491 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Andrew P. Nitkewicz (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
July 8, 2016 Filing 490 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Nitkewicz on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC (notification declined or already on case) (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
July 6, 2016 Filing 489 Letter to inform Court of pending meet and confer by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 28, 2016 Filing 488 NOTICE of Appearance by Gillian Barkins on behalf of Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (aty to be noticed) (Barkins, Gillian)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER re #485 Letter filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/27/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
June 20, 2016 Filing 486 Letter to Hon Tomlinson in response to plaintiff's counsel's letter dated June 16, 2016 by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
June 16, 2016 Filing 485 Letter in opposition to Defendants' request concerning Expert Witness Reports by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 14, 2016 Filing 484 Letter Hon Tomlinson re rebuttal expert reports by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
May 25, 2016 Filing 483 REPLY in Opposition re #478 Letter MOTION to Quash Three Subpoenas served by Plaintiff on non-party JP Morgan Chase Bank filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 23, 2016 Filing 482 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Douglas on behalf of TCMR Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Douglas, David)
May 23, 2016 Filing 481 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TCMR Management, Inc. (Douglas, David)
May 23, 2016 Filing 480 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Douglas on behalf of BDB Management (aty to be noticed) (Douglas, David)
May 23, 2016 Filing 479 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BDB Management (Douglas, David)
May 20, 2016 Filing 478 Letter MOTION to Quash Three Subpoenas served by Plaintiff on non-party JP Morgan Chase Bank by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to the Hon. Tomlinson from Vogel, dated 5/6/16, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to the Hon. Tomlinson from Douglas (Nationwide Defendants), dated 5/9/16, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to the Hon. Tomlinson from Douglas (TCMR Mgt. Inc.), dated 5/9/16, #4 Exhibit D - Subpoena to Produce to JP Morgan Chase Bank, dated 4/13/16, #5 Exhibit E - Subpoena to Produce to JP Morgan Chase Bank (re: Nationwide Mgt. of NY), dated 4/21/16, #6 Exhibit F - Subpoena to Product to JP Morgan Chase Bank (re: TCMR Mgt., Inc.), dated 4/21/16, #7 Exhibit G - Ex. 7 to the Second Amended Complaint) (Vogel, Justin)
May 19, 2016 Filing 477 Letter Clarifying May 17, 2016 Letter by Government Employees Insurance Company (Levy, Barry)
May 18, 2016 Filing 476 Mail receipt (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 17, 2016 Filing 475 Letter in Response to the Court's May 5, 2016 Order by Government Employees Insurance Company (Levy, Barry)
May 12, 2016 Filing 474 Letter seeking permission to Reply to GW Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter to Extend Discovery (which GW Defendants had already consented to) by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 12, 2016 Filing 473 RESPONSE in Opposition re #472 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference , for permission to make motions to compel and to extend the discovery deadline, filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
May 10, 2016 Filing 472 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference , for permission to make motions to compel and to extend the discovery deadline, by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting #468 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; granting #469 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; granting #470 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/10/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
May 9, 2016 Filing 470 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re motion to quash subpoena by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Douglas, David)
May 9, 2016 Filing 469 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re motion to quash subpoenas by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Douglas, David)
May 6, 2016 Filing 468 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER re #459 Letter MOTION to Quash third-party subpoena MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/5/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #466 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. In light of this Court's prior Order of January 26, 2016 [DE 435], the April 28, 2016 submission of plaintiff's counsel [DE 466] is hereby REJECTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/29/2016. (Kandel, Erin)
April 28, 2016 Filing 466 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Order Dismissing Party Renat R. Sukhov(MD) Deft terminated voluntarily dismissed with prejudice.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/21/2016. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 21, 2016 Filing 464 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Renat Sukhov by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 463 RESPONSE in Opposition re #459 Letter MOTION to Quash third-party subpoena MOTION for Protective Order filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #462 Reply in Opposition, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Svetlana Osiashvili, Mikael Oshiashvili, Aleksey Vayner, Benjamin Osiashvili. Pursuant to this Court's Individual Practice Rules, replies are not permitted on letter motions. The Court points out that counsel had the opportunity to file its motion as one on Notice pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure which would have allowed for a reply. Further, counsel did not seek permission to file the instant reply in this context. Consequently, DE 462 is rejected as an improper reply and will not be considered by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/18/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
April 15, 2016 Filing 462 REPLY in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoena Served Upon GEICO filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Douglas, David)
April 15, 2016 Filing 461 RESPONSE in Opposition re #459 Letter MOTION to Quash third-party subpoena MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Justin)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #460 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Quash portion of Non-Party Subpoena. Based on the representations made by counsel in DE 460, the Court is GRANTING the additional time requested. The Court assumes that Plaintiff's counsel does not object since there has been no further filing. The "GW Defendants'" time to file their opposition is extended to April 15, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/12/2016. (Tomlinson, A.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 460 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition to plaintiff's motion quash a portion of the non-party subpoena served on GEICO by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
March 28, 2016 Filing 459 Letter MOTION to Quash third-party subpoena, MOTION for Protective Order by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Bowers, Nicholas)
March 14, 2016 Filing 458 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:oral argument held on 3/14/2016; decision reserved (Tape #ftr 5:02 - 5:18.) (Bollbach, Jean)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #456 Motion for Extension of Time to File; deferring ruling on #456 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's letter motion and hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's request for an extension of the briefing schedule with respect to its motion to quash. However, the Court notes that the dates provided by Plaintiff's counsel regarding the deadline for the GW Defendants to submit opposition and as to Plaintiff's reply, if any, are incorrect as they do not properly track the date intervals set in the Court's initial briefing schedule [DE 453]. As such the amended briefing schedule is as follows: Plaintiff's motion is to be filed by March 28, 2016. Any opposition is to be filed by April 12, 2016. If Plaintiff seeks to file a reply it shall be submitted by April 18, 2016. Furthermore, the Court is deferring any ruling on Plaintiff's request for a Pre-Motion Conference until the parties certify compliance with Local Civil Rule 37.3 as to the discovery issues enumerated in Plaintiff's motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/11/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
March 11, 2016 Filing 457 RESPONSE to Motion re #456 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File a motion to quash the subpoenaLetter MOTION for pre motion conference for permission to file motions to compel responses to Plaintiff's supplemental discovery demands, filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Letter, dated January 29, 2016) (Vogel, Justin)
March 10, 2016 Filing 456 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File a motion to quash the subpoena, Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for permission to file motions to compel responses to Plaintiff's supplemental discovery demands, by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 10, 2016 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Ortiz, Grisel)
March 4, 2016 Filing 455 REPLY in Support re #416 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against Patient Focus Defendants filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
March 4, 2016 Filing 454 REPLY in Support re #413 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against Nationwide Defendants filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #446 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/3/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #448 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney filed by Tatiana Sharahy, Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC. Attorney Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha, Michael Adrian Battle and Jeffrey M. Eilender terminated. Andrew P. Nitkewicz and Traci M. Strickland added. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/2/2016. (Ryan, Mary)
March 2, 2016 Filing 451 RESPONSE in Opposition re #446 MOTION for pre motion conference for a protective order and to quash subpoena filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-e-mail, #2 Exhibit B-Geico complaint) (Vogel, Justin)
March 2, 2016 Filing 450 NOTICE of Change of J. Vogel's e-mail address by Justin M. Vogel (Vogel, Justin)
March 1, 2016 Filing 449 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Nitkewicz on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (aty to be noticed) (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
March 1, 2016 Filing 448 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Andrew P. Nitkewicz (Nitkewicz, Andrew)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #447 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court is in receipt of the GW Defendants' letter motion seeking a brief extension of time to file a response to Plaintiff's letter motion seeking a premotion conference [DE 446] and the request is hereby GRANTED. The GW Defendants are directed to file their response by close of business on March 2, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/1/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
February 29, 2016 Filing 447 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #446 MOTION for pre motion conference for a protective order and to quash subpoena by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
February 26, 2016 Filing 446 MOTION for pre motion conference for a protective order and to quash subpoena by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 24, 2016 Filing 445 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #416 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (O'Murchadha, Niall)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #444 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. By letter dated February 17, 2016, plaintiff Sky Medical requests an extension of time to serve and file plaintiff's reply in support of its motion to dismiss the counterclaims brought by defendants Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Osiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, and Aleksey Vaynerto ("defendants"). Defendants have consented to this request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's request is granted. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by March 4, 2016. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/18/2016. (Akers, Medora)
February 17, 2016 Filing 444 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Nationwide Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 12, 2016 Filing 442 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Warren Cohen, M.D. by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER Dismissing Parties Re: #442 Stipulation and order of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Warren Cohen(MD). So Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/11/2016. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants Patient Focus and Dr. Tatiana Sharahy ("defendants") have written to Judge Tomlinson by letter dated February 9, 2016, indicating that they would not be filing their opposition to plaintiff's motion to dismiss by the February 10 deadline established by this Court. Although defendants did not seek leave from the Court to depart from the established briefing schedule, defendants shall be permitted to file their opposition on or before February 24, 2016. Plaintiff's reply brief shall now be due on or before March 4, 2016. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/11/2016. (Akers, Medora)
February 10, 2016 Filing 441 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims served on Warren Cohen on February 10, 2016, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
February 10, 2016 Filing 440 Letter re: consent to adjourn opposition by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (O'Murchadha, Niall)
February 10, 2016 Filing 439 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #413 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
January 29, 2016 Filing 438 RESPONSE to Motion re #433 Letter MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Initial Set of Discovery Demands filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
January 28, 2016 Filing 437 RESPONSE in Opposition re #434 Letter MOTION to Compel Responses by Nationwide Defendants to Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Demands filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
January 27, 2016 Filing 436 RESPONSE in Opposition re #432 Letter MOTION to Compel Discovery, and Joinder in GW Defendants' Motion -- Revised Per Court's January 21, 2016 Order filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/26/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
January 25, 2016 Filing 434 Letter MOTION to Compel Responses by Nationwide Defendants to Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Demands by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 25, 2016 Filing 433 Letter MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Initial Set of Discovery Demands by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 24, 2016 Filing 432 Letter MOTION to Compel Discovery, and Joinder in GW Defendants' Motion -- Revised Per Court's January 21, 2016 Order by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Douglas, David)
January 22, 2016 Filing 431 REPLY in Opposition re #428 Letter MOTION for Discovery for an Order directing Plaintiff to produce documents consistent with Rule 34 of the FRCP filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER denying #429 Motion to Compel. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/21/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
January 20, 2016 Filing 429 Letter MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff, as Well as Joinder in GW Defendants' Motion for Discovery by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Douglas, David)
January 19, 2016 Filing 428 Letter MOTION for Discovery for an Order directing Plaintiff to produce documents consistent with Rule 34 of the FRCP by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER denying #422 Motion for Protective Order. The Court has reviewed Defendants' letter motion and Plaintiff's response and the motion is DENIED with limited exceptions as noted in the attached Order. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/14/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
January 14, 2016 Filing 426 REPLY in Opposition re #422 MOTION for Protective Order (revised to reflect grammatical corrections) filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata Sheet for Grammatical Changes to Plaintiff's Reply in Opposition to PF Defendants' Motion for Protective Order) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 13, 2016 Filing 425 RESPONSE in Opposition re #422 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 13, 2016 Filing 424 Letter providing status update by Stanley Ross (Kichloo, Supriya)
January 12, 2016 Filing 423 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter Motion dated 1/11/16 served on Warren Cohen on 1/11/2016, filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (O'Murchadha, Niall)
January 11, 2016 Filing 422 MOTION for Protective Order by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (O'Murchadha, Niall)
January 11, 2016 Filing 421 STIPULATION re Order,, Executed Stipulated Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by Damion A. Martins (Murray, E.)
January 9, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #419 Motion for Extension of Time to File any motions to compel and granting #419 Motion for Extension of deadline to serve third-party discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/9/2016. (Tomlinson, A.)
January 9, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #419 . On December 17, 2015, the Court issued an Electronic Order directing that counsel for Defendant Damion A. Martins, MD and counsel for Defendant Stanley Ross execute the outstanding Stipulation and Order of confidentiality and file a signature page on ECF at which time the Court would be able to "so order" the Stipulation. To date, these parties have failed to comply with that Order. Counsel are hereby given one final opportunity to comply and to do so by January 13, 2016. Any failure to comply will be met with appropriate action by the Court, including potential sanctions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/9/16. (Tomlinson, A.)
January 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson:Motion Hearing/Status Conference held on December 11, 2015. Motion for Discovery #389 GRANTED to the extent set forth in this Order. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL RULINGS AND INFORMATION. Ordered by Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson 12/11/15. NOTE: This Order was inadvertently not posted previously. (Tomlinson, A.)
January 8, 2016 Filing 419 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery service upon Third Parties by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #411 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. the Court is in receipt of the "GW Defendants'" letter motion seeking an extension of time to serve third-party discovery and the motion is hereby GRANTED. The GW Defendants are directed to serve any third-party discovery by January 27, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/7/2016. (Roman, Joshua)
January 6, 2016 Filing 418 MEMORANDUM in Support re #416 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 6, 2016 Filing 417 DECLARATION re #416 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 6, 2016 Filing 416 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 6, 2016 Filing 415 MEMORANDUM in Support re #413 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 6, 2016 Filing 414 DECLARATION re #413 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 6, 2016 Filing 413 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 6, 2016 Filing 412 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/11/2015, before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2016. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 6, 2016 Filing 411 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
January 4, 2016 Filing 410 Letter giving notice of Motion to Compel by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 4, 2016 Filing 409 Letter to Magistrate Judge Tomlinson by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner (Douglas, David)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #408 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion seeking an extension of time to serve third-party discovery and the motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to serve its third-party discovery requests by January 8, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/30/2015. (Roman, Joshua)
December 29, 2015 Filing 408 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #407 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court is in receipt of the "GW Defendants'" letter motion seeking an extension of time to serve their third-party subpoenas and the motion is hereby GRANTED. The "GW Defendants" are directed to serve any third-party subpoenas by January 8, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/28/2015. (Roman, Joshua)
December 23, 2015 Filing 407 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #406 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated December 18, 2015, counsel for plaintiff requests a two-week extension of time to file a motion to dismiss the pending counterclaims asserted by defendants Patient Focus Medical Examinations, P.C., Tatiana Sharahy, M.D., Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Osiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, and Aleksey Vayner. Defendants have consented to this request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's request is granted. The parties shall adhere to the following revised briefing schedule: plaintiff's motion is due January 6, 2016; defendants' opposition is due February 10, 2016; and plaintiff's reply is due February 19, 2016. Oral argument remains scheduled for March 14, 2016. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/21/2015. (Akers, Medora)
December 18, 2015 Filing 406 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
December 18, 2015 Filing 405 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER re #404 Stipulation, filed by Denis Mann, Mitchell L. Weisman, Joseph C. Cole, Christopher Ferrante, Renat R. Sukhov, Mitchell Ehrlich, William S. Kritzberg, Dante Brittis, Eitan Dagan, Robert A. Sohn, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Mark Weber, Julio Westerband. The Court is in receipt of the Joint Confidentiality Stipulation filed by the parties. However, the Court notes that the Stipulation does not appear to be fully executed. Specifically, counsel for Defendant Damion A. Martins, MD and counsel for Defendant Stanley Ross have not executed the Stipulation. As such, the Court directs counsel for the aforementioned parties to file a signature page on ECF at which time the Court will be able to "so order" the Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/17/2015. (Roman, Joshua)
December 15, 2015 Filing 404 STIPULATION Protective Order and confidentiality agreement by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
December 10, 2015 Filing 403 Letter Supplemental Application for leave to appear by telephone. Emergency. by Gary J. Florio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Press Report of Unexpected Remediation Complication) (Creedon, Peter)
December 10, 2015 Filing 402 Letter Requesting Telephonic Appearance by Gary J. Florio (Creedon, Peter)
November 23, 2015 Filing 401 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Telephone Conference held on 11/23/2015, MOTION TO BE FILED BY 12/23/2015 ;RESPONSE BY 1/27/2016 ; REPLY BY 2/5/2016( Status Conference set for 3/14/2016 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1020 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (Tape #ftr 11:08 - 11:11.) (Bollbach, Jean)
November 23, 2015 Filing 400 Letter Hon Bianco regarding today's pre-motion conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
November 20, 2015 Filing 399 RESPONSE to Motion re #396 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #382 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, #394 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, to dismiss counterclaims filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (O'Murchadha, Niall)
November 20, 2015 Filing 398 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/21/2015, before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2016. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 19, 2015 Filing 397 RESPONSE to Motion re #396 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #382 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, #394 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, to dismiss counterclaims filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #396 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated November 9, 2015, plaintiff Sky Medical requests a pre-motion conference in anticipation of filing a motion to dismiss counterclaims filed by defendants Patient Focus Medical Examinations, P.C., d/b/a All Borough Medical, P.C., Tatiana Sharahy, M.D., Nationwide Management, Inc., Benjamin Osiashvili, Mikael Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, and Alex Vayner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that those parties shall participate in a telephone pre-motion conference on Monday, November 23, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. Any other party may join the call. At that time, counsel for plaintiffs shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, defendants may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 11/10/2015. (Akers, Medora)
November 9, 2015 Filing 396 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #382 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, #394 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, to dismiss counterclaims by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
October 30, 2015 Filing 395 STATUS REPORT as to discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
October 26, 2015 Filing 394 AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sky Medical Supply Inc. by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (O'Murchadha, Niall)
October 20, 2015 Filing 393 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, (Second Amended Complaint) by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #392 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion seeking an extension of time to respond to Defendant's Counterclaims and the motion is granted. Plaintiff is directed to serve its response by November 9, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/20/2015. (Roman, Joshua)
October 19, 2015 Filing 392 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Counterclaims by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #391 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Nationwide Management's motion to adjourn the Status Conference scheduled for November 4, 2015 and the motion is hereby GRANTED. However, the Court is unable to reschedule the conference for either date requested by the parties given its current calendar. As such, the Status Conference will be rescheduled to December 11, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/14/2015. (Roman, Joshua)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #389 Motion for Discovery. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter motion [DE 389] seeking to begin third-party discovery and the Court hereby DEFERS ruling on the motion at this time. The Court notes that it has scheduled a Discovery Status Conference with the parties on November 4, 2015 at 4 p.m. and it will take up this issue at that time. The parties are reminded that no later than October 30, 2015, they are directed to submit a joint Status Report as to what discovery, if any, has been completed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/13/2015. (Roman, Joshua)
October 13, 2015 Filing 391 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 13, 2015 Filing 390 RESPONSE in Opposition re #389 MOTION for Discovery permission to conduct third-party discovery filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Presentation of Candidates A- letter) (Zwerling, Andrew)
October 8, 2015 Filing 389 MOTION for Discovery permission to conduct third-party discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting #386 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #294 Amended Complaint with Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint. Dante Brittis answer due 10/20/2015; Joseph C. Cole answer due 10/20/2015; Eitan Dagan answer due 10/20/2015; Mitchell Ehrlich answer due 10/20/2015; Christopher Ferrante answer due 10/20/2015; William S. Kritzberg answer due 10/20/2015; Denis Mann answer due 10/20/2015; SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. answer due 10/20/2015; Robert A. Sohn answer due 10/20/2015; Renat R. Sukhov answer due 10/20/2015; Mark Weber answer due 10/20/2015; Mitchell L. Weisman answer due 10/20/2015; Julio Westerband answer due 10/20/2015.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/8/2015. (Ryan, Mary)
October 7, 2015 Filing 387 ANSWER to #294 SECOND Amended Complaint by Warren Cohen. (Bollbach, Jean)
October 7, 2015 Filing 386 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, with Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
October 5, 2015 Filing 385 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer to Second Amended Complaint served on Warren Cohen on 10/5/2015, filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Eilender, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2015 Filing 384 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Eilender, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2015 Filing 383 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaims served on Warren Cohen on October 5, 2015, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 5, 2015 Filing 382 Nationwide Defendants' ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Sky Medical Supply Inc. by Svetlana Osiashvili, Nationwide Management Inc., Benjamin Osiashvili, Mikael Oshiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #381 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. In light of Judge Bianco's determination [DE 381] this Court is scheduling a status conference for November 4, 2015 at 4 p.m. No later than October 30, 2015, all parties are directed to submit a Status Report as to what discovery, if any, has been completed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/24/2015. (Roman, Joshua)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting/deny in part #342 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting/denying in part #349 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting/denying in part #354 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting/denying in part #357 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth on the record on September 21, 2015, defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 342, 349, 353, 354, 356, and 357) are granted/denied in part with respect to the tenth, eleventh, and twelfth claims (the claims made under theories of common law fraud and unjust enrichment), and are denied in all other respects.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/22/2015. (Bollbach, Jean)cm by chambers to pro se by fcm on 9/22/15 Modified on 9/23/2015 (Bollbach, Jean).
September 21, 2015 Filing 380 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:oral ruling held on 9/21/2015; decision made on the record. See order. (Tape #ftr 4:34 - 5:21.) (Bollbach, Jean)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/21/2015 04:30 PM before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone conference with the Court on Monday, September 21, 2015 at 4:30 p.m., at which time the Court will orally rule on the pending motions to dismiss. At the time of the conference, counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/14/2015. (Mesrobian, David)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal without prejudice as to Evgeniya Vakhidova. Deft Evgeniya Vakhidova terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/29/2015. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 26, 2015 Filing 378 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Evgeniya Vakhidova (O'Murchadha, Niall)
June 9, 2015 Filing 377 NOTICE of Appearance by Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova (notification declined or already on case) (O'Murchadha, Niall)
April 23, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/6/2015, before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. Transcriber AA Express Transcripts, Telephone number 888-456-9716. Email address: AAExpress@Court-Transcripts.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2015. (Cox, Dwayne)
April 6, 2015 Filing 375 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:oral argument held on 4/6/2015- decision reserved (Tape #ftr 4:43 - 6:03.) (Bollbach, Jean)
March 18, 2015 Filing 374 REPLY in Support re #349 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Eilender, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2015 Filing 373 REPLY in Support re #356 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
March 6, 2015 Filing 372 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Reply Memorandum of Law served on Warren Cohen on March 6, 2015, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 6, 2015 Filing 371 REPLY in Support re #342 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Directed Against Second Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #370 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply By letter dated March 6, 2015, counsel for the GW defendants requests an extension until March 18, 2015 to file a reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/6/2015. (Mesrobian, David)
March 6, 2015 Filing 370 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in further support of GW defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: By letter dated March 4, 2015, counsel for defendants Patient Focus and Tatiana Sharahy requests an extension until March 18, 2015 to file a reply. Plaintiff consents to this request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. Oral argument currently remains scheduled for April 6, 2015 at 4:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/4/2015. (Mesrobian, David)
March 4, 2015 Filing 369 Letter by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (O'Murchadha, Niall)
February 24, 2015 Filing 368 Letter Hon. Tomlinson by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #367 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply By letter dated February 2, 2015, defense counsel requests a one-month extension of time to file a reply memorandum of law, as well as leave to file ten extra pages. Plaintiff consents to these requests with respect to all defendants. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requests are granted. All defendants shall file their replies by March 6, 2015, and such replies shall be no longer than 25 pages. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/2/2015. (Mesrobian, David)
February 2, 2015 Filing 367 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #356 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and for a modest increase in page limitation from 15 to 25 pages by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
January 16, 2015 Filing 366 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion Papers, Correspondence served on Defendant Warren Cohen, M.D. on January 15, 2015, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2015 Filing 365 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #354 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2015 Filing 364 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #357 MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint as to me Warren Cohen filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2015 Filing 363 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #356 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2015 Filing 362 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #342 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Directed Against Second Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 15, 2015 Filing 361 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #349 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #353 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #360 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages By letter dated January 8, 2015, plaintiff requests leave to file ten excess pages in its opposition memorandum of law. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs request is granted. Plaintiffs memorandum of law shall be no more than thirty-five pages. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/8/2015. (Mesrobian, David)
January 8, 2015 Filing 360 Second MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for opposing the Motions to Dismiss by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #359 Motion for Extension of Time to File By letter dated November 21, 2014, the plaintiff requests a six-week extension of time to file its opposition to the motions to dismiss. Defendants consent to this request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. The parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule: The plaintiff shall submit its opposition by January 15, 2015. The defendants shall submit any reply papers by February 6, 2015. Oral argument is now rescheduled for Monday, April 6, 2015 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Electronic Order on any pro se defendants forthwith and to file proof of service on ECF. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 11/21/2014. (Mesrobian, David)
November 21, 2014 Filing 359 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 4, 2014 Filing 358 Letter Hon. Bianco with replacement ex 4 by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vogel, Justin)
October 31, 2014 Filing 357 MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint as to me Warren Cohen by Warren Cohen. (Bollbach, Jean)
October 31, 2014 Filing 356 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Zwerling Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1--First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-Memorandum and Order, #4 Exhibit 3--Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4-Report and Denial Chart, #6 Exhibit 5-Damages Spreadsheet, #7 Exhibit 6-Pre Motion Request Letter, #8 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support) (Zwerling, Andrew)
October 31, 2014 Filing 355 MEMORANDUM in Support re #354 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gary J. Florio. (Creedon, Peter)
October 31, 2014 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #352 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gary J. Florio. Document correctly filed in document 354 (Bollbach, Jean)
October 31, 2014 Filing 354 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gary J. Florio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit of Service Pro Se Affidavit of Service) (Creedon, Peter)
October 31, 2014 Filing 353 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Damion A. Martins. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of E. Christopher Murray in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Murray, E.)
October 31, 2014 Filing 352 [CORRECTED BY DOCUMENT 354] Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gary J. Florio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Creedon, Peter) Modified on 10/31/2014 (Bollbach, Jean).
October 31, 2014 Filing 351 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #349 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (O'Murchadha, Niall)
October 31, 2014 Filing 350 MEMORANDUM in Support re #349 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (O'Murchadha, Niall)
October 31, 2014 Filing 349 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (O'Murchadha, Niall)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #347 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #348 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages By letters dated October 27, 2014, and October 28, 2014, defendants request leave to file ten excess pages in their memoranda of law. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' request is granted. Defendants' memoranda of law shall be no more than thirty-five pages. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/28/2014. (Mesrobian, David)
October 28, 2014 Filing 348 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (O'Murchadha, Niall)
October 28, 2014 Filing 347 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel. (Vogel, Justin)
October 23, 2014 Filing 346 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion and Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint served on Warren Cohen on 10/23/14, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 23, 2014 Filing 345 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint served on Warren Cohen on 10/23/14, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 23, 2014 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM in Support re #342 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Directed Against Second Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 23, 2014 Filing 343 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #342 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Directed Against Second Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Douglas, David)
October 23, 2014 Filing 342 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Directed Against Second Amended Complaint by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 16, 2014 Filing 341 Letter objecting to Plaintiff's modified stipulation by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
October 15, 2014 Filing 340 Letter with proposed stipulated protective order and confidentiality agreement by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 proposed stipulated protective order and confidentiality agreement) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
October 15, 2014 Filing 339 Letter with proposed stipulated protective order and confidentiality agreement by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vogel, Justin)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #338 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated September 23, 2014, the GW defendants request an additional three-week extension of time to serve and file their motion to dismiss. Plaintiff has not consented to this request. Based upon the GW defendants' representations in their letter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' request is granted. All parties (including other defendants who plan to file a motion to dismiss) shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: defendants' motions to dismiss shall be filed no later than October 31, 2014; plaintiff's oppositions shall be filed no later than December 1, 2014; defendants' replies shall be filed no later than December 15, 2014; oral argument is adjourned to Monday, January 5, 2015, at 4:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/24/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
September 23, 2014 Filing 338 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File papers in support of the motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint from October 10, 2014 to October 31, 2014 by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #337 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gary J. Florio answer due 10/10/2014. By letter dated September 22, 2014, counsel for defendant Florio requests an extension of time to respond to the second amended complaint. Counsel for plaintiff consents to this request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. Florio shall respond to the second amended complaint by October 10, 2014. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/22/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
September 22, 2014 Filing 337 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Move to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint by Gary J. Florio. (Creedon, Peter)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #333 , #335 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney filed by Tatiana Sharahy and Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC. Attorney Michael Adrian Battle for Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC and Tatiana Sharahy added. Attorney Glenn Michael Jones terminated. NOTE: DE #335 is a duplicate stipulation and order of DE #333 . Order endorsed on DE #333 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/11/2014. (Ryan, Mary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha (O'Murchadha, Niall)
September 10, 2014 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (notification declined or already on case) (O'Murchadha, Niall)
September 10, 2014 Filing 333 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Jeffrey M. Eilender (Eilender, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Eilender on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (notification declined or already on case) (Eilender, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #329 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. After consutling with Judge Bianco, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion to extend the time of Defendants Patient Focus Medical Examinations, P.C., Tatiana Sharahy, M.D. and Eugeniya Vakhideova to respond to the Second Amended Complaint to October 10, 2014. Further, the Court GRANTS the motion to extend the time for submitting automatic disclosures by three (3) weeks for these particular Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/10/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
September 5, 2014 Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Gottlieb on behalf of Sky Medical Supply Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gottlieb, David)
September 5, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova (notification declined or already on case) (O'Murchadha, Niall)
September 5, 2014 Filing 329 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, and to submit automatic disclosures by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova. (Eilender, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova (aty to be noticed) (O'Murchadha, Niall)
September 4, 2014 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Eilender on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova (aty to be noticed) (Eilender, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #326 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated September 4, 2014, the GW defendants request a three-week extension of time to serve and file their motion to dismiss. Plaintiff has consented to this request. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' request is granted. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: defendants' motions to dismiss shall be filed no later than October 10, 2014; plaintiff's oppositions shall be filed no later than November 10, 2014; defendants' replies shall be filed no later than November 24, 2014; oral argument is adjourned to Friday, December 12, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/4/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
September 4, 2014 Filing 326 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File papers in support of the motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
August 19, 2014 Filing 325 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/7/2014, before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Transcriber Writer's Cramp, Inc., Telephone number 732-329-0191. Email address: wtrscramp@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the ranscriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014. (Cox, Dwayne)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Court has received pro se defendant Warren Cohen's August 1, 2014 letter requesting to join in the other defendants' motions to dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cohen's request is granted. The Court will consider Cohen's arguments, along with those raised in the other defendants' motions to dismiss, when considering the legal sufficiency of the second amended complaint as to defendant Cohen. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/1/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
July 31, 2014 Filing 324 Letter dtd. 7/30/14 from pro se deft Warren Cohen to Judge Bianco RE: case status. (Bollbach, Jean)
July 31, 2014 Filing 323 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Damion A. Martins. (Murray, E.)
July 28, 2014 Filing 322 Letter Opposition to GW Defendants' Request for a Premotion Conference by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Bowers, Nicholas)
July 28, 2014 Filing 321 Letter Opposition to SHARAHY and NATIONWIDE DEFENDANTS' motion for premotion conference by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - GEICO's Submission re: Stay, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Allstate's Opp to Motion to Quash (Kazan case), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Judge Steele's Order Denying Motion to Quash) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #319 Motion for Extension of Time to File/respond to second amended complaint-in settlement discussions. Application GRANTED. Dr. Cohen has until July 31, 2014 to respond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/24/2014. (Ryan, Mary)
July 22, 2014 Filing 319 MOTION for Extension of Time to File /respond to second amended complaint - in settlement discussions by Warren Cohen. (Bollbach, Jean)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #316 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court has received Defendant Damion A. Martins, M.D.'s motion. Based on its contents, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion and extends Defendant Damion A. Martins' time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint until July 31, 2014. In light of the fact that this is the second extension, the parties are on notice that the Court does not intend to grant further extensions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/22/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #318 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated July 22, 2014, the GW defendants request a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving to dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this proposed motion shall be addressed at the telephone pre-motion conference already scheduled for July 29, 2014. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/22/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
July 22, 2014 Filing 318 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Zwerling, Andrew)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #317 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated July 22, 2014, the Patient Focus defendants request a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving to dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this proposed motion shall be addressed at the telephone pre-motion conference already scheduled for July 29, 2014. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/22/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
July 22, 2014 Filing 317 MOTION for pre motion conference by Nationwide Management Inc.. (Jones, Glenn)
July 21, 2014 Filing 316 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Letter from E. Christopher Murray, Esq. to Hon. A. Kathleen Tomlinson requesting that the time for defendant Damion A. Martins, M.D. to respond to the Second Amended Complaint be extended from July 22, 2014 through July 31, 2014 by Damion A. Martins. (Murray, E.)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #315 Motion to Adjourn Conference. By letter dated July 16, 2014, the Nationwide Defendants request an adjournment of the pre-motion conference scheduled for July 24, 2014. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. The parties shall participate in a telephone pre-motion conference on Tuesday, July 29, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. At that time, counsel for the Nationwide Defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712-5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/16/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
July 16, 2014 Filing 315 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #314 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated July 11, 2014, the Nationwide Defendants request a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving to dismiss the second amended complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone pre-motion conference on Thursday, July 24, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. At that time, counsel for the Nationwide Defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/14/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
July 11, 2014 Filing 314 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 STIPULATION AND ORDER terminating Wayne Kerness. Wayne Kerness (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/3/2014. (Bollbach, Jean)
July 1, 2014 Filing 312 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Wayne Kerness, MD by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 311 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Correspondence and Order served on Dr. Warren Cohen on 6/25/2014, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 25, 2014 Filing 310 Letter informing Court of service of Second Amended Complaint on Dr. Warren Cohen by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 25, 2014 Filing 309 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Correspondence and Second Amended Complaint served on Dr. Warren Cohen on 6/24/2014, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Correspondence to Dr. Warren Cohen and Second Amended Complaint) (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 25, 2014 Filing 308 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter and Orders served on Dr. Warren Cohen on 6/24/2014, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER re #307 Reply in Support filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc. The Court has received Plaintiff's June 24, 2014 reply in further support of its motion to lift the stay on third-party discovery. Pursuant to Rule III.A.1 of the Court's Individual Practice Rules, replies are not permitted on letter motions. Accordingly, the Court hereby rejects the Plaintiff's June 24, 2014 reply. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Electronic Order on the Pro Se Defendants forthwith and to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/25/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #305 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion of Defendants Wayne Kerness, M.D. and Damion A. Martins, M.D. for an extension of time through July 22, 2014 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. The parties are reminded that pursuant to the Court's June 19, 2014 Electronic Order, the time for ALL DEFENDANTS in this action to respond to the Second Amended Complaint was extended through July 22, 2014. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Electronic Order on the pro se litigants forthwith and to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/24/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #303 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court has received Pro Se Defendant Dr. Warren Cohen's June 18, 2014 letter motion seeking an extension of time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Based on its contents the Court hereby GRANTS the motion and extends Defendant Cohen's time to respond until July 22, 2014. The parties are reminded that pursuant to the Court's June 19, 2014 Electronic Order, the time for ALL DEFENDANTS in this action to respond to the Second Amended Complaint was extended through July 22, 2014. Furthermore, in light of the representations in Dr. Cohen's June 18, 2014 letter motion, the Court directs Plaintiff to respond as to when and how Pro Se Defendant Cohen was served with the Second Amended Complaint. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon the pro se litigants forthwith via overnight mail and first-class mail. Plaintiff's counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/24/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #300 Motion for Discovery. The Court has received Plaintiff's June 19, 2014 letter motion seeking to life the stay of third-party discovery. The Court has also received Defendants' opposition letters [DE 301, 302, 304]. Based on a review of the motion and opposition, the Court hereby DENIES the motion and holds that the stay of all discovery shall remain in effect until the Court's August 7, 2014 in-person Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon the pro se litigants forthwith via overnight mail and first-class mail. Plaintiff's counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/24/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 24, 2014 Filing 307 REPLY in Support re #300 Letter MOTION for Discovery seeking to lift stay as to third-party discovery filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 24, 2014 Filing 306 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter informing Pro se Defenant of Court Order and of Plaintiff's Letter Motion to Lift the Stay on Third-Party Discovery served on Dr. Warren Cohen on 6/20/2014, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 23, 2014 Filing 305 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, from E. Christopher Murray, Esq. to the Honorable Joseph F. Bianco requesting an extension of time to respond to the Second Amended Compalint through and including July 22, 2014 by Wayne Kerness, Damion A. Martins. (Murray, E.)
June 23, 2014 Filing 304 REPLY in Opposition re #300 Letter MOTION for Discovery seeking to lift stay as to third-party discovery filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova. (Jones, Glenn)
June 23, 2014 Filing 302 RESPONSE in Opposition re #300 Letter MOTION for Discovery seeking to lift stay as to third-party discovery filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
June 23, 2014 Filing 301 RESPONSE in Opposition re #300 Letter MOTION for Discovery seeking to lift stay as to third-party discovery filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Zwerling, Andrew)
June 20, 2014 Filing 303 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to second amended complaint by Warren Cohen. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 19, 2014 Filing 300 Letter MOTION for Discovery seeking to lift stay as to third-party discovery by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #298 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion filed by Defendants' Patient Focus Medical Exams P.C., Dr. Tatiana Sharahy, and Evgeniya Vakhidova requesting an extension of time until July 22, 2014 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. The Court, furthermore, clarifies that all Defendants shall have until July 22, 2014 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon the pro se litigants forthwith via overnight mail and first-class mail. Plaintiff's counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/19/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 19, 2014 Filing 299 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter informing pro se Defendant of Court's scheduling order served on Dr. Warren Cohen on June 18, 2014, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 18, 2014 Filing 298 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova. (Jones, Glenn)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the Court's June 17, 2014 Orders extending various Defendants' time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint, the Court hereby ADJOURNS the June 19, 2014 Status Conference to August 7, 2014 at 2 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon the pro se litigants forthwith via overnight mail and first-class mail. Plaintiff's counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/17/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #297 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The motion for an extension of time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint until July 22, 2014 filed by Defendants SCS Support Claim Services, Inc., Eitan Dagan, Dante Brittis, M.D., Joseph C. Cole, M.D., Mitchell Ehrlich, M.D., Christopher Ferrante, M.D., William S. Kritzberg, M.D., Denis Mann, M.D., Robert A. Sohn, M.D., Renat Sukhov, M.D., Mark Weber, M.D., Mitchell L. Weisman, M.D., and Julio Westerband, M.D. is hereby GRANTED. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon the pro se litigants forthwith via overnight mail and first-class mail. Plaintiff's counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/17/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #296 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court has received the Stipulation for an extension of time for Defendants Nationwide Management Inc., Benjamin Osiashvilli, Mikael Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, and Alex Vayner to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion to respond to July 22, 2014. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon the pro se litigants forthwith via overnight mail and first-class mail. Plaintiff's counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/17/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 16, 2014 Filing 297 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 296 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #294 Amended Complaint,,,,, --Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Second Ameded Complaint Unil July 11, 2014 by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
June 11, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE by Sky Medical Supply Inc. of service of order by Hon. A. Kathleen Tomlinson (on 6/9/2014) upon pro se parties (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has scheduled an in-person Status Conference for June 19, 2014 at 12 p.m. in Courtroom 910. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon the pro se litigants forthwith via overnight mail and first-class mail. Plaintiff's counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/9/2014. (Rizvi, Asad)
June 6, 2014 Filing 294 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Sky Medical Supply Inc. against Linda Ackerman, BAB Management Inc., Andrew Bazos, Dante Brittis, Warren Cohen, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, Gary J. Florio, Brian Freindlich, Wayne Kerness, William S. Kritzberg, Management Company A, Management Company B, Management Company C, Management Company D, Management Company E, Manager Defendant A, Manager Defendant B, Manager Defendant C, Manager Defendant D, Manager Defendant E, Denis Mann, Antonio Martins, Damion A. Martins, Andrew Miller, Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, William A. Ross, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Tatiana Sharahy, Robert A. Sohn, Drew Stein, Renat R. Sukhov, Evgeniya Vakhidova, Aleksey Vayner, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Second Amended Complaint) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #252 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #256 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #258 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #260 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #263 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants all moving defendants' motions to dismiss the RICO claims against them, without prejudice. Because the Court has dismissed all federal claims in this action, the Court declines at this juncture to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining declaratory judgment and state law claims, and those claims are dismissed without prejudice. Finally, the Court grants plaintiff's request for leave to amend its RICO claims. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint no later than thirty days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff does not do so, then the Court will order the Clerk of the Court to close this case and enter a judgment for all defendants that is consistent with this Memorandum and Order. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/7/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
March 7, 2014 Filing 292 Letter amended letter to correct typographical error by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 6, 2014 Filing 291 Letter in response and in opp to letter filed by Plaintiff's counsel dated Feb. 25, 2014 & filed on Fed. 26, 2014 by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 6, 2014 Filing 290 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Reply to Plaintiff's Post-Argument Submission served on Warren Cohen, M.D., Drew Stein, M.D., and Andrew Bazos, M.D. on March 5, 2014, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 5, 2014 Filing 289 REPLY in Support re #252 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Accordance with Directive of Judge Bianco at Oral Argument, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 5, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/20/2014, before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. Transcriber Aria Services, Inc., Telephone number 845-260-1377. Email address: aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2014. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 26, 2014 Filing 287 Letter to Hon. Joseph Bianco (Post Hearing Case Law Submission as Requested by the Court) by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3(cont.)) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 25, 2014 Filing 286 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Grace on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Grace, Daniel)
February 20, 2014 Filing 285 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Oral Argument held on 2/20/2014 - decision reserved (Tape #ftr 4:50 - 5:50.) (Bollbach, Jean)
February 11, 2014 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #282 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, #280 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SCS Support Claims Services, Inc.. Bothe of these documents are memoramdums and not motions - have been modified to read as memo (Bollbach, Jean)
February 11, 2014 Filing 284 Letter dtd. 2/11/14 from Warren Cohen to Judge Bianco RE: this is my reply to plaintiffs memo of law in opposition re letter by deft Warren Cohen which was filed by plaintiff on 1/7/14 (270) (Bollbach, Jean)
February 11, 2014 Filing 283 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Dismiss served on Warren Cohen, MD, Drew Stein, MD, Andrew Bazos, MD on 2/11/14, filed by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC. (Jones, Glenn)
February 11, 2014 Filing 282 Memorandum by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC. (Jones, Glenn) Modified on 5/7/2014 to read as memo and not motion(Bollbach, Jean).
February 11, 2014 Filing 281 REPLY in Support re #260 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Zwerling, Andrew)
February 11, 2014 Filing 280 Memorandum by SCS Support Claims Services, Inc.. (Jones, Glenn) Modified on 5/7/2014 to modify text to read memo and not motion (Bollbach, Jean).
February 11, 2014 Filing 279 REPLY in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Wayne Kerness, Damion A. Martins. (Murray, E.)
February 11, 2014 Filing 278 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Nationwide Defendants' Motion to Dismiss served on Warren Cohen, M.D., Drew Stein, M.D., Andrew Bazos, M.D. on February 11, 2014, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
February 11, 2014 Filing 277 REPLY in Support re #252 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #170 Motion to Vacate. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/5/2014. (Bollbach, Jean)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Vacate. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/5/2014. (Bollbach, Jean)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #69 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; finding as moot #87 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; finding as moot #172 Motion for Joinder. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/5/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #274 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #274 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. By letter dated January 14, 2014, defendants request a two-week extension of time in which to file their replies in support of their motions to dismiss, from January 27, 2014 to February 11, 2014, and also, for an increase in the page limitation, from 10 to 25 pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' request is granted. The briefing schedule shall be modified as follows: defendants' replies are due February 11, 2014; oral argument shall be held on Thursday, February 20, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' request for an extension of pages, from 10 to 25 pages, is granted. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/14/2014. (Gibaldi, Michael)
January 14, 2014 Filing 274 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #261 Affidavit of Service, #260 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #267 Memorandum in Opposition, #269 Memorandum in Opposition, #268 Memorandum in Opposition, #270 Memorandum in Opposition, #271 Memorandum in Opposition, #272 Memorandum in Opposition, , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Justin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 273 NOTICE by Sky Medical Supply Inc. of Certificate of Service re: Warren Cohen, MD (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 7, 2014 Filing 272 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #260 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants SCS Support Claims Services, Eitan Dagan, Dante Brittis, MD, Joseph C. Cole, MD, Mitchell Ehrlich, MD, Christopher Ferrante, DC, William S. Kritzberg, MD, Denis Mann, DC, Robert A. Sohn, DC, Renat Sukhov, MD, Mark Weber, MD, Mitchell L. Weisman, MD and Julio Westerband, MD (incl. p.18) filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 7, 2014 Filing 271 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #256 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion and Supporting Affirmation to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as alleged against Kerness and Martins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 7, 2014 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #265 Letter by Defendant Warren Cohen, MD, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 6, 2014 Filing 269 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #263 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
January 6, 2014 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #260 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Eitan Dagan, Dante Brittis, MD, Joseph C. Cole, MD, Mitchell Ehrlich, MD, Christopher Ferrante, DC, William S. Kritzberg, MD, Denis Mann, DC, Robert A. Sohn, DC, Renat Sukhov, MD, Mark Weber, MD, Mitchell L. Weisman, MD and Julio Westerband, MD filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
January 6, 2014 Filing 267 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #252 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Nationwide Management, Benjamin Osiashvili, Mikael Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili and Alex Vayner filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #266 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated November 22, 2013, counsel for the plaintiff requests a four-week extension of time in which to file its opposition to the defendants' motions to dismiss, from December 6, 2013 to January 6, 2014, and also, for an increase in the page limitation, from 25 to 35 pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff's request is granted. The briefing schedule shall be modified as follows: plaintiff's opposition is due January 6, 2014; defendants' replies are due January 27, 2014; oral argument shall be held on Thursday, February 6, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff's request for an extension of pages, from 25 to 35 pages, is granted. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 11/22/2013. (Gibaldi, Michael)
November 22, 2013 Filing 266 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Court has received pro se defendant Warren Cohen's letter of October 23, 2013, in which he requests to join in the defendants' motion to dismiss. In his letter, he indicates that he previously raised this request by letter dated May 14, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Cohen's request is granted. The Court notes that defendant Cohen sets forth individual reasons in support of dismissal of the claims as to him in his October 23, 2013 letter. The Court will consider these arguments, along with those raised in defendants' motion to dismiss, when considering the merits of the motion as to defendant Cohen. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/24/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
October 23, 2013 Filing 265 Letter dtd. 10/23/13 from pro se deft Warren Cohen to Judge Bianco RE: would like to join in on motion to dismiss by other defts. (Bollbach, Jean)
October 23, 2013 Filing 264 NOTICE by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova re #263 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Jones, Glenn)
October 23, 2013 Filing 263 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova. (Jones, Glenn)
October 23, 2013 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband re #260 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #259 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Zwerling, Andrew)
October 23, 2013 Filing 261 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion, Declaration with exhibits, Memo of Law in Support of Motion and Rule 7.1 Statement served on Warren Cohen, MD; Drew Stein, MD: and Andrew Bazos, MD on 10/23/2013, filed by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Zwerling, Andrew)
October 23, 2013 Filing 260 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Memorandum in Support) (Zwerling, Andrew)
October 23, 2013 Filing 259 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. (Zwerling, Andrew)
October 23, 2013 Filing 258 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stanley Ross. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Gordon, Peter)
October 23, 2013 Filing 257 MEMORANDUM in Support re #256 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion and Supporting Affirmation to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as alleged against Kerness and Martins filed by Wayne Kerness, Damion A. Martins. (Murray, E.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 256 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion and Supporting Affirmation to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as alleged against Kerness and Martins by Wayne Kerness, Damion A. Martins. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of E. Christopher Murray, #2 Exhibit A) (Murray, E.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 255 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Affidavit and Memorandum of Law served on Warren Cohen, Drew Stein, and Andrew Bazos on October 23, 2013, filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 23, 2013 Filing 254 MEMORANDUM in Support re #252 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 23, 2013 Filing 253 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #252 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Douglas, David)
October 23, 2013 Filing 252 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
October 15, 2013 Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Vinay Das, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband re #250 Letter, (Vogel, Justin)
October 15, 2013 Filing 250 Letter to Magistrate Tomlinson by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Eitan Dagan, Vinay Das, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER. This case was recently reassigned to the undersigned. The Court notes that Judge Boyle previously set a control date conference for October 16, 2013 and stayed discovery while certain motions are pending before Judge Bianco. The motions at issue are still pending. This Court is therefore cancelling the October 16, 2013 status conference and is directing the parties to contact Chambers within three days of Judge Bianco's decisions (if the case is proceeding at that juncture)to set up a date for an in-person conference. Counsel for SCS Support Claim Services, Inc. is directed to notify the pro se litigants of the cancellation of the October 16 conference forthwith by email or telephone call/message and to follow up with service of a hard copy of the Order upon these pro se litigants by first-class mail. Counsel is further directed to file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/11/2013. (Tomlinson, A.)
October 9, 2013 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Eitan Dagan (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
October 9, 2013 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Eitan Dagan (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
September 18, 2013 Filing 247 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Damion Marhris - docket sheet - utf not deliverable as addressed (Bollbach, Jean)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #246 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #246 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. By letter dated September 3, 2013, counsel for the GW Defendants (identified in prior correspondence) requests a three-week extension of time in which to file their motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint, from September 30, 2013 to October 23, 2013, and also, for an increase in the page limitation, from 25 to 35 pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the GW defendants' request is granted. The briefing schedule shall be modified as follows: defendants' motion to dismiss is due October 23, 2013; plaintiff's opposition is due December 6, 2013; defendant's reply is due December 27, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the GW defendants' request for an extension of pages, from 25 to 35 pages, is granted. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/4/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
September 3, 2013 Filing 246 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion to dismiss the plaintiff's amended complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Memo of Law and Affidavits from 25 pages to 35 pages each by Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Justin)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #237 Motion to Vacate. The default against deft. Damion Martins is vacated and he may file a motion to dismiss in accordance with the briefing schedule previously set for the other defts.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/9/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
August 8, 2013 Filing 244 Summons Issued as to Andrew Bazos at Kent Road (Bollbach, Jean)
August 8, 2013 Filing 243 Summons Issued as to Andrew Bazos at Route 7 (Bollbach, Jean)
August 8, 2013 Filing 242 Summons Issued as to Andrew Bazos at 54th Street (Bollbach, Jean)
August 8, 2013 Filing 241 Summons Issued as to Eitan Dagan at Pasture Circle (Bollbach, Jean)
August 8, 2013 Filing 240 Summons Issued as to Eitan Dagan at Baylis Road (Bollbach, Jean)
August 8, 2013 Filing 239 Summons Issued as to Drew Stein at 44th Street (Bollbach, Jean)
August 8, 2013 Filing 238 Summons Issued as to Drew Stein at 10 Continental Road (Bollbach, Jean)
August 1, 2013 Filing 237 Letter MOTION to Vacate default in appearing and request to file a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint by Damion A. Martins. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Murray, E.)
July 31, 2013 Filing 236 AMENDED COMPLAINT Including Exhibits against All Defendants, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to First Amended Complaint) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
July 17, 2013 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to A. Kathleen Tomlinson. (Marziliano, August)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to Michael Leibowitz with prejudice and without costs. Michael Leibowitz (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/2/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 27, 2013 Filing 234 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice As Against Michael Leibowitz, MD by Michael Leibowitz (Creedon, Peter)
June 21, 2013 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Nadjari on behalf of Damion A. Martins (aty to be noticed) (Nadjari, Douglas)
June 21, 2013 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Christopher Murray on behalf of Damion A. Martins (aty to be noticed) (Murray, E.)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing William Rosner with prejudice and without costs. William Rosner (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/18/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing George A Gainor with prejudice and without costs. George A. Gainor (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/18/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing as to Mark Wilner without costs and with prejudice. Mark Wilner (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/18/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Yin Faith Mao with prejudice. Yin Faith Mao (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/18/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)cm by chambers to pro se by fcm on 6/18/13
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to Lilian Boberlian without prejudice and without costs. Lilian Bobelian (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/18/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 17, 2013 Filing 226 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Damion A Martins returned unable to forward wrong address (Bollbach, Jean)
June 17, 2013 Filing 225 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2013, motion to tbe filed by 9/30/13; response by 11/15/13; reply by 12/6/13; amended complaint to be filed by 7/31/13 (Oral Argument set for 1/9/2014 04:30 PM in Courtroom 920 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (Tape #ftr 4:42 - 4:49.) (Bollbach, Jean)
June 17, 2013 Filing 224 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the action as against Lilian Bobelian by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 17, 2013 Filing 223 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the action as against William Rosner by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 17, 2013 Filing 222 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the action as against George Gainor by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 17, 2013 Filing 221 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the action as against Mark Wilner by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 17, 2013 Filing 220 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/5/13, before Judge E. Thomas Boyle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Typewrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2013. (Talbott, Thomas)
June 14, 2013 Filing 219 Letter informing the court of mailing by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Annex 1, #2 Annex 2, #3 Annex 3) (Bowers, Nicholas)
June 13, 2013 Filing 218 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the action as against Faith Ying Mao by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 217 Letter by Lilian Bobelian, Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Vinay Das, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, George A. Gainor, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel (Vogel, Justin)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #216 Letter filed by Evgeniya Vakhidova, Tatiana Sharahy, Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 6/12/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
June 10, 2013 Filing 216 Letter requesting appearance record be amended by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy, Evgeniya Vakhidova (Jones, Glenn)
June 5, 2013 Filing 215 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle:Initial Conference Hearing held on 6/5/2013. Apperances: For plaintiff: Gary Tsirelman, Nicholas Bowers and Stefan Belinfante present. For defendants: E. Christopher Murray, Justin Vogel, David Douglas, Andrew Zwerling, Richard Asche, Warren Cohen (pro se) Peter Creedon, Glenn M. Jones, present. See Docket Entry #214 for order. (Tape #12:00-1:03.) (Padilla, Kristin) (Main Document 215 replaced on 6/12/2013) (Fagan, Linda). Modified on 6/12/2013 (Fagan, Linda).
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #88 Motion to Stay; granting #89 Motion to Stay; granting #91 Motion to Stay; granting #109 Motion to Stay; granting #117 Motion to Stay; granting #125 Motion to Stay; granting #150 Motion to Stay; granting #158 Motion to Stay; granting #168 Motion to Stay; granting #181 Motion to Stay; granting #185 Motion to Stay; granting #197 Motion to Stay; granting #199 Motion to Stay; granting #200 Motion to Stay; granting #211 Motion to Stay: The moving defendants have made an adequate showing of "good cause" to stay discovery pending the outcome of a motion to dismiss. Discovery is therefore stayed pending the outcome of defendants' motion to dismiss. A status conference is scheduled on October 16, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip, New York. All counsel and pro se parties are directed to appear. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on all pro se defendants upon receipt. SEE Order for further information and instructions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 6/5/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement: Plaintiff's request for permission to submit an amended RICO statement, submitted on May 29, 2013 [Docket Entry No. 209], is granted. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on all pro se defendants upon receipt.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 6/5/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #210 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated June 3, 2013, counsel for the GW defendants (identified in prior correspondence) requests a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving for a stay of the briefing schedule for all defendants' motions in light of a recent matter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the GW defendants' request is granted. The parties shall participate in a telephone conference on Monday, June 17, 2013 at 4:30 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter responding to the GW defendants' June 3 letter. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/4/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
June 3, 2013 Filing 211 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery by Lilian Bobelian, Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Vinay Das, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, George A. Gainor, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Vogel, Justin)
June 3, 2013 Filing 210 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to discuss intention to move for stay of briefing schedule for all Defendants ' motion to dismiss by Lilian Bobelian, Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Vinay Das, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, George A. Gainor, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Vogel, Justin)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice and without costs as to Larisa Likver MD, Larisa N. Likver (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/31/13. (Bollbach, Jean)cm by chambers to pro se by fcm on 5/31/13
May 29, 2013 Filing 209 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #192 Declaration,, RICO Statement by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bowers, Nicholas)
May 29, 2013 Filing 207 STIPULATION of Dismissal of action against Larisa Mikver by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 24, 2013 Filing 208 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Damion Martins dot deliverable as addressed (Bollbach, Jean)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER re #205 Letter: Warren Cohen answer or motion due 5/17/2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 5/20/2013. (Minerva, Deanna)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 STIPULATION AND ORDER/ withdrawal and discontinuace with prejudice and without costs. Leonard Landesberg (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/16/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
May 15, 2013 Filing 204 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the action as to Leonard Landesberg by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
May 15, 2013 Filing 203 NOTICE by Sky Medical Supply Inc. of Service of Process Completion (Tsirelman, Gary)
May 14, 2013 Filing 205 Letter dtd 5/4/13 from Warren Cohen to Pro Se office RE: response to complaint dtd. 5/14/13 and attaching stip of extension of time to be filed. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 stip extending time) (Bollbach, Jean)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #201 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated May 10, 2013, counsel for the GW defendants (identified in prior correspondence) requests a two-week extension to file its motion to dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the GW defendants' request is granted. The briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss is modified as follows: defendants shall file their motion by June 21, 2013; plaintiffs shall file their opposition by August 5, 2013; defendants shall file their reply by August 30, 2013. Oral argument shall remain as scheduled on October 1, 2013. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/13/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
May 10, 2013 Filing 201 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion to dismiss the plaintiff's complaint by Lilian Bobelian, Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Vinay Das, Mitchell Ehrlich, Christopher Ferrante, George A. Gainor, William S. Kritzberg, Denis Mann, William Rosner, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Weber, Mitchell L. Weisman, Julio Westerband, Nathan Zemel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Vogel, Justin)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER. By letter dated May 8, 2013, counsel for defendant Dennis Mann, M.D. requests that defendant be permitted to join the motion to dismiss, to be filed on June 7, 2013, by counsel's other defendants, identified in prior correspondence as the GW defendants. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's request is granted. The briefing schedule shall remain as previously ordered for the above named defendants. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/9/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
May 8, 2013 Filing 202 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Damion Martine order dtd 4/24/13 by ETB- not =deliverable as addresses unable to forward (Bollbach, Jean)
May 8, 2013 Filing 200 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery by Vinay Das. (Vogel, Justin)
May 8, 2013 Filing 199 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery by Dante Brittis. (Vogel, Justin)
May 8, 2013 Filing 198 Letter to be permitted to join in GW defendants' motion to dismiss by Denis Mann (Vogel, Justin)
May 8, 2013 Filing 197 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery on behalf of Denis Mann, M.D. by Denis Mann. (Vogel, Justin)
May 8, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Denis Mann (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
May 8, 2013 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Denis Mann (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
May 3, 2013 Filing 192 DECLARATION RICO Statement by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21-1, #24 Exhibit 21-2, #25 Exhibit 21-3) (Bowers, Nicholas)
May 3, 2013 Filing 191 DECLARATION re #190 Declaration EXHIBITS 1-2 and 1-3 to #190 by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 1-3) (Bowers, Nicholas)
May 3, 2013 Filing 190 DECLARATION RICO Statement by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
May 1, 2013 Filing 194 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Damion Martins (Attachments: #1 order dtd. 4/17/13 by Boyle returned) (Bollbach, Jean)
May 1, 2013 Filing 193 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Damion Martins (Attachments: #1 returned order dtd. 4/18/13 by M.J. Boyle) - unable to forward (Bollbach, Jean)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER. By letter dated April 30, 2013, counsel for defendant Stanley Ross, M.D. requests that defendant be permitted to join the motion to dismiss, to be filed on June 7, 2013, by counsel's other defendants, identified in prior correspondence as the GW defendants. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's request is granted. The briefing schedule shall remain as previously ordered for the above named defendants. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/1/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
April 30, 2013 Filing 189 Letter requesting permission to join Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Stanley Ross (Gordon, Peter)
April 30, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Gordon on behalf of Stanley Ross (aty to be noticed) (Gordon, Peter)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER. By letter dated April 30, 2013, counsel for defendants Nathan Zemel, M.D., Vinay Das, M.D., and Mark Weber, M.D. requests that defendants be permitted to join the motion to dismiss, to be filed on June 7, 2013, by counsel's other defendants, SCS Support Claim Services, Inc., George A. Gainor, M.D., Mitchell L. Weisman, M.D., William S. Kritzberg, M.D., Lilian Bobelian, M.D., Joseph C. Cole, M.D., Mitchell Erlich, M.D., Robert A. Sohn, M.D., Christopher Ferrante, M.D., William D. Rosner, M.D., Julio Westerband, M.D., Dante Brittis, M.D., and Renat Sukhov, M.D. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's request is granted. The briefing schedule shall remain as previously ordered for all of the above named defendants. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/30/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
April 30, 2013 Filing 186 Letter to Hon. Bianco requesting to join in motion to dismiss by Mark Weber (Vogel, Justin)
April 30, 2013 Filing 185 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery by Mark Weber. (Vogel, Justin)
April 30, 2013 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Mark Weber (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 30, 2013 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Mark Weber (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 30, 2013 Filing 182 Letter to Hon Bianco requesting to join in motion to dismiss by Vinay Das, Nathan Zemel (Vogel, Justin)
April 30, 2013 Filing 181 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery by Nathan Zemel. (Vogel, Justin)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: request for certificate of default filed by plaintiff's counsel is withdrawn and that my certificate of default filed with the court is hereby vacated. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/29/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 29, 2013 Filing 180 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Denis Mann served on 4/18/2013, answer due 5/9/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 29, 2013 Filing 179 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Mark Weber served on 4/16/2013, answer due 5/7/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 26, 2013 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Vinay Das (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 26, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Nathan Zemel (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 26, 2013 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Vinay Das (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 26, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Nathan Zemel (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER: By letter dated April 24, 2013, counsel for Evgeniya Vadhidova requests that Vadhidova be permitted to join the motion to dismiss, to be filed on June 7, 2013, by counsel's other defendants, Patient Focus Medical Examinations P.C. d/b/a All Borough Medical PC and Dr. Tatiana Sharahy, M.D. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's request is granted. The briefing schedule shall remain as previously ordered for all of the above named defendants. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/25/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
April 24, 2013 Filing 174 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #136 Order sent to sent to Damion A. Martins Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. (Coleman, Laurie)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between the undersigned, that the time for defendant Warren Cohen, MD, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be extended up to and including May 3, 2013. This stipulation may be filed without further notice. This stipulation may be executed in any number of counterparts and facsimile or electronic copies may serve as the original. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/24/2013. (Major, Jasmine)
April 24, 2013 Filing 172 MOTION for Joinder to joint Ofit Kurman Defendants Patient Focus, All Borourgh Med and Dr. Sharahy by Evgeniya Vakhidova. (Jones, Glenn)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The time for defendant Damion A. Martins to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended ninety (90) days, to May 21, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/24/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie) c/m
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER: By letter dated April 23, 2013, counsel for Renat Sukhov, M.D., requests that Sukhov be permitted to join the motion to dismiss, to be filed on June 7, 2013, by the following defendants: SCS Support Claim Services, Inc., George A. Gainor, M.D., Mitchell Weisman, M.D., William Kritzberg, M.D., Lilian Bobelian, M.D., Joseph Cole, M.D., Mitchell Ehrlich, M.D., Robert Sohn, M.D., Christopher Ferrante, M.D., William D. Rosner, M.D., Julio Westerband, M.D., and Dante Brittis, M.D. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's request is granted. The briefing schedule shall remain as previously ordered for all of the above named defendants. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/23/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
April 23, 2013 Filing 170 MOTION to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default by Evgeniya Vakhidova. (Jones, Glenn)
April 23, 2013 Filing 169 Letter Hon Bianco requesting that the defendant Renat R. Sukhov be permitted to join in on the motion to dismiss by Renat R. Sukhov (Vogel, Justin)
April 23, 2013 Filing 168 Letter MOTION to Stay by Renat R. Sukhov. (Vogel, Justin)
April 22, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicholas Paul Bowers for the Law Firm of Gary Tsirelman, P.C. (Bowers, Nicholas)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: IT IS HBREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED. by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant, that Defendant, Dante Brittis, M.D., has appeared in this action through his counsel, Garfunkel WIld, P.C. and that the Request for the Certificate of Default filed by Plaitiff's Counse1 is hereby witdrawn and that any Certificate of Default filed with the Court is hereby vacated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/18/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 18, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Michael Jones on behalf of Evgeniya Vakhidova (aty to be noticed) (Jones, Glenn)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #163 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The application of defendant Mark Wilner, M.D. dated April 17, 2013 [Docket Entry No. 163] is granted. The initial conference previously scheduled for May 22, 2013 is adjourned to June 5, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip, New York. All counsel and pro se parties are directed to appear. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on all pro se defendants upon receipt. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/18/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie) c/m
April 17, 2013 Filing 163 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference or to be Excused by Mark Wilner. (Asche, Richard)
April 17, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Renat R. Sukhov (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 17, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Renat R. Sukhov (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference previously scheduled for April 18, 2013 is adjourned to May 22, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. to afford plaintiff the opportunity to complete service on the defendants. Plaintiff is directed to immediately notify and serve a copy of this Order on all pro se defendants upon receipt. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/17/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
April 17, 2013 Filing 159 MOTION to Vacate #145 Clerk's Entry of Default, by Dante Brittis. (Vogel, Justin)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER. By letters dated April 15 and 16, 2013, counsel for Christopher Ferrante, M.D., William D. Rosner, M.D., Julio Westerband, M.D., and Dante Brittis, M.D., request to join the motion to dismiss, to be filed on June 7, 2013 by the following defendants: SCS Support Claim Services, Inc., George A. Gainor, M.D., Mitchell Weisman, M.D., William Kritzberg, M.D., Lilian Bobelian, M.D., Joseph Cole, M.D., Mitchell Ehrlich, M.D., and Robert Sohn, M.D. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's request is granted. The briefing schedule shall remain as previously ordered for all of the above named defendants. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/17/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
April 16, 2013 Filing 158 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery by Julio Westerband. (Vogel, Justin)
April 16, 2013 Filing 157 Letter requesting that defendants, Brittis and Westerband, be permitted to join the defendants' motion to dismiss by Dante Brittis, Julio Westerband (Vogel, Justin)
April 16, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Julio Westerband (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 16, 2013 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Dante Brittis (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 16, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Dante Brittis (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 16, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Julio Westerband (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 15, 2013 Filing 151 Letter requesting that Drs. Ferrante and Rosner be permitted to join the GW defendants' motion to dismiss by Christopher Ferrante, William Rosner (Vogel, Justin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 150 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery by Christopher Ferrante, William Rosner. (Vogel, Justin)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for April 16, 2013 is adjourned to April 18, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip, New York. All counsel are directed to appear. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/15/2013. (Minerva, Deanna)
April 15, 2013 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Christopher Ferrante served on 4/9/2013, answer due 6/10/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 15, 2013 Filing 147 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Vinay Das served on 4/11/2013, answer due 5/2/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 15, 2013 Filing 146 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Stanley Ross served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 15, 2013 Filing 145 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Dante Brittis has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Dante Brittis is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 15, 2013 Filing 144 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Evgeniya Vakhidova has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Evgeniya Vakhidova is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Bollbach, Jean) Modified on 4/15/2013 (Bollbach, Jean).
April 12, 2013 Filing 152 Summons Issued as to Mari Dejesus,Mari Dejesus MD, Denis Mann, Mark Weber. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 12, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Christopher Ferrante (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 12, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Christopher Ferrante (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 12, 2013 Filing 141 Request for Certificate of Default by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 12, 2013 REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time. re #139 Request for Certificate of Default. Julio Westerbend has until 4/18/13 to respond, according to #112 / (Rios, Laura)
April 12, 2013 Filing 140 Request for Certificate of Default by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 12, 2013 Filing 139 Request for Certificate of Default by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 11, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of William Rosner (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 11, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of William Rosner (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying #134 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The initial conference scheduled on April 16, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. shall go forward at that time. All counsel or pro se parties shall be present. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/11/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie) c/m
April 10, 2013 Filing 135 REPLY in Opposition to Defendants' request for adjournment #134 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bowers, Nicholas)
April 9, 2013 Filing 134 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled on 4/16/13 by Lilian Bobelian, Joseph C. Cole, Mitchell Ehrlich, George A. Gainor, William S. Kritzberg, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Robert A. Sohn, Mitchell L. Weisman. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Hon. E. Thomas Boyle, dated 3/26/13, #2 Schedule) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 5, 2013 Filing 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Warren Cohen. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 3, 2013 Filing 131 Summons Issued as to Larisa N. Mikver. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 3, 2013 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Telephone pre motion Conference held on 4/3/2013- motion to be filed by 6/7/13; response by 7/22/13; reply by 8/16/13; oral argument 10/1/13 at 4:00 pm (Tape #ftr 1:45 - 1:53.) (Bollbach, Jean)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER TO ANSWER re #128 Stipulation filed by Gary J. Florio: The time for defendant Gary Florio, M.D. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including April 16, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/3/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie) c/m
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #118 Motion to Set Aside Default. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/2/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #124 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated April 2, 2013, counsel for defendant Robert A. Sohn and counsel for defendant Gary Florio request to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' requests are granted and that they may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/2/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
April 2, 2013 Filing 128 STIPULATION to extend time to answer by Gary J. Florio (Creedon, Peter)
April 2, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE by Gary J. Florio intent to file motion to dismiss (Creedon, Peter)
April 2, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Creedon on behalf of Gary J. Florio (aty to be noticed) (Creedon, Peter)
April 2, 2013 Filing 125 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery and to request an adjournment of conference scheduled for April 16, 2013 by Robert A. Sohn. (Vogel, Justin)
April 2, 2013 Filing 124 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Robert A. Sohn. (Vogel, Justin)
April 2, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Robert A. Sohn (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 2, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Robert A. Sohn (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 2, 2013 Filing 121 Letter regarding pre-motion conference by Lilian Bobelian, Joseph C. Cole, Mitchell Ehrlich, George A. Gainor, William S. Kritzberg, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Mitchell L. Weisman (Vogel, Justin)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file, within 30 days from the filing date herein, a RICO case statement. This statement shall include facts upon which plaintiffs rely to initiate their RICO claims, as a result of the "reasonable inquiry" required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. This statement shall be in a form using the numbers and letters set forth herein, and shall state in detail the information requested herein. SEE Order for further instructions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/2/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #116 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated April 1, counsel for defendant Mitchell Erhlich, M.D. requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this defendant's request is granted and that he may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/2/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
April 1, 2013 Filing 119 REPLY in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #109 Letter MOTION to Stay re #88 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery , #117 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery and request to adjourn initial conference scheduled for April 16, 2013, #91 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery, #88 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bowers, Nicholas)
April 1, 2013 Filing 118 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Mitchell Ehrlich. (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 1, 2013 Filing 117 Letter MOTION to Stay discovery and request to adjourn initial conference scheduled for April 16, 2013 by Mitchell Ehrlich. (Vogel, Justin)
April 1, 2013 Filing 116 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Mitchell Ehrlich. (Vogel, Justin)
April 1, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Mitchell Ehrlich (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
April 1, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Mitchell Ehrlich (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
April 1, 2013 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Andrew Miller served on 3/28/2013, answer due 4/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 1, 2013 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Julio Westerband served on 3/28/2013, answer due 4/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 1, 2013 Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Renat R. Sukhov served on 3/28/2013, answer due 4/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #107 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 28, 2013, counsel for defendants Joseph C. Cole, M.D. and Lilian Bobelian requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these defendants' request is granted and that they may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/1/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 29, 2013 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
March 29, 2013 Filing 109 Letter MOTION to Stay re #88 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery by Lilian Bobelian, Joseph C. Cole. (Vogel, Justin)
March 28, 2013 Filing 108 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, by Lilian Bobelian. (Vogel, Justin)
March 28, 2013 Filing 107 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, on behalf of Joseph C. Cole, MD by Joseph C. Cole. (Vogel, Justin)
March 28, 2013 Filing 106 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Mitchell Horowitz, MD by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 28, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Joseph C. Cole (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
March 28, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Lilian Bobelian (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
March 28, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Joseph C. Cole (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 28, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Lilian Bobelian (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER granting #97 Stipulation filed by Michael Leibowitz: The time for defendant Michael Leibowitz, M.D. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including April 5, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/28/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: By letter dated March 21, 2013, counsel for defendant Michael Liebowitz, M.D. requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this defendant's request is granted and that he may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendant shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/28/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 28, 2013 Filing 99 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Mitchell Ehrlich has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Mitchell Ehrlich is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 27, 2013 Filing 98 Letter Motion for Pre Motion Conference by Michael Leibowitz (Creedon, Peter)
March 27, 2013 Filing 97 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by Michael Leibowitz (Creedon, Peter)
March 27, 2013 Filing 96 Request for Certificate of Default by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in support of Cert of Default with Aff of Service - Mitchell Ehrlich) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 27, 2013 Filing 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Mark Wilner served on 3/6/2013, answer due 4/3/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 27, 2013 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Evgeniya Vakhidova served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 27, 2013 Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Warren Cohen served on 3/14/2013, answer due 4/4/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 27, 2013 Filing 92 Letter Attachment to filing 3.26.13 ltr to Honorable Joseph F. Bianco by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy (Jones, Glenn)
March 27, 2013 Filing 91 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery by Nationwide Management Inc., Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #86 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letters dated March 26, 2013, counsel for defendants Dr. Mitchell Weisman and William S. Kritzberg, M.D. requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these defendants' request is granted and that they may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/27/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to Joseph Bittar (MD). Joseph Bittar (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/26/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to deft. Mitchell Horowitz. Mitchell Horowitz (MD) terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/26/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 26, 2013 Filing 89 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit letter dated 3/11/13) (Jones, Glenn)
March 26, 2013 Filing 88 Letter MOTION to Stay Discovery by George A. Gainor, William S. Kritzberg, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Mitchell L. Weisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 26, 2013 Filing 87 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, by William S. Kritzberg. (Vogel, Justin)
March 26, 2013 Filing 86 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, by Mitchell L. Weisman. (Vogel, Justin)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #85 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 26, 2013, defendants Benjamin Osiashvili, Mikael Osiashvili, and Svetlana Osiashvili request to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these defendants' request is granted and that they may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/26/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 26, 2013 Filing 85 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili. (Douglas, David)
March 26, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Douglas on behalf of Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili (aty to be noticed) (Douglas, David)
March 26, 2013 Filing 83 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Mikael Oshiashvili served on 3/19/2013, answer due 4/9/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 26, 2013 Filing 82 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Aleksey Vayner served on 3/15/2013, answer due 4/5/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 26, 2013 Filing 81 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Michael Leibowitz served on 3/15/2013, answer due 4/5/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 26, 2013 Filing 80 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Dante Brittis served on 3/21/2013, answer due 4/11/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 26, 2013 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Gary J. Florio served on 3/14/2013, answer due 4/4/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 26, 2013 Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Benjamin Osiashvili served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 26, 2013 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Svetlana Osiashvili served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of Mitchell L. Weisman (notification declined or already on case) (Vogel, Justin)
March 25, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of William S. Kritzberg (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
March 25, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of William S. Kritzberg (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 25, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of Mitchell L. Weisman (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #72 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 22, 2013, defendant Dr. Leonard Landesberg requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant's request is granted and that he may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendant shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/25/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 22, 2013 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Damion A. Martins. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 22, 2013 Filing 72 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Leonard Landesberg. (Gruber, Eric)
March 21, 2013 Filing 71 STIPULATION of Dismissal regarding Defendant Joseph Bittar by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 21, 2013 Filing 70 STIPULATION of Dismissal regarding Defendant Mitchell Horowitz, MD by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 21, 2013 Filing 69 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Leibowitz. (Creedon, Peter)
March 21, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Creedon on behalf of Michael Leibowitz (notification declined or already on case) (Creedon, Peter)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Mitchell L. Weisman's answer or motion is due March 29, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/21/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #66 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letters dated March 21, 2013, defendants Aleksey Vayner ("Vayner"), Nationwide Management ("Nationwide"), and Benjamin Nachamie ("Nachamie") request to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these defendants' requests are granted and that they may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/21/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 21, 2013 Filing 67 Letter letter to join pre-motion conference by Benjamin Nachamie (Rubin, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2013 Filing 66 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Aleksey Vayner. (Douglas, David)
March 21, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Douglas on behalf of Aleksey Vayner (aty to be noticed) (Douglas, David)
March 20, 2013 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Mitchell L. Weisman. (Vogel, Justin)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Mark Wilner's answer or motion is due April 3, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/20/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #61 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 19, 2013, counsel for defendant Mark Wilner, M.D. ("Wilner") requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this defendant's request is granted and that he may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Wilner's request for an extension of time to answer or move with respect to the complaint is granted. Wilner shall submit his answer or motion no later than April 3, 2013. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/20/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 19, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A. Adam on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Adam, Sarah)
March 19, 2013 Filing 61 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference participation by counsel by Mark Wilner. (Asche, Richard)
March 19, 2013 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mark Wilner. (Asche, Richard)
March 19, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Asche on behalf of Mark Wilner (aty to be noticed) (Asche, Richard)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #58 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 15, 2013, counsel for defendants Dr. Tatiana Sharahy M.D. ("Dr. Sharahy") and Patient Focus Medical Examinations ("Patient Focus") request to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these defendants' request is granted and that they may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/18/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Set Aside Default. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant, that Defendant, Gergo A. Gainor, M.D., has appeared in this action through his counsel, Garfunkel Wild, P.C., and that the request for the Certificate ofDefault filed by Plaintiffs Counsel is hereby withdrawn and the certificate of Default filed with the Court on March 7, 2013 is vacated. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this stipulation may he signed withelectronic or facsimile signature, which shall be treated as original signature. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/15/2013. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 15, 2013 Filing 58 MOTION for pre motion conference by Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, Tatiana Sharahy. (Jones, Glenn)
March 15, 2013 Filing 57 Summons Issued as to Aleksey Vayner. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 14, 2013 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION regarding personal service of subpoenas for documents by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service personal service of subpoenas) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #54 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 12, 2013, counsel for defendant Wayne Kerness, M.D. ("Kerness") requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kerness's request is granted and that Kerness may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/14/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 13, 2013 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Yin Faith Mao. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 13, 2013 Filing 54 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Wayne Kerness. (Murray, E.)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #53 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 12, 2013, counsel for defendant Nationwide Management, Inc. ("Nationwide") requests to participate in the currently scheduled pre-motion conference scheduled for April 3, 2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Nationwide's request is granted and that Nationwide may participate in the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motions of the various defendants are likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/13/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 12, 2013 Filing 53 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Nationwide Management Inc.. (Douglas, David)
March 12, 2013 Filing 52 MOTION to Set Aside Default by George A. Gainor. (Vogel, Justin)
March 12, 2013 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Mikael Oshiashvili, Benjamin Osiashvili, Svetlana Osiashvili, Evgeniya Vakhidova. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 11, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE by Sky Medical Supply Inc. 3rd party Subpoena Duces Tecum and affidavits of service of hard copies of Subpoenas (affidavit of personal service on CT Corp to be uploaded to ECF shortly) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #49 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. By letter dated March 11, 2013, counsel for defendants requests a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone pre-motion conference on Wednesday, April 3, 2013 at 1:15 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 3/11/2013. (O'Donnell, Kaitlin)
March 11, 2013 Filing 49 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by George A. Gainor, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 8, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of George A. Gainor (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
March 8, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of George A. Gainor (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER granting #44 Stipulation filed by Benjamin Nachamie: Defendant Benjamin Nachamie's answer or motion is due March 31, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/8/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
March 7, 2013 Filing 46 Proposed Pretrial Order proposed certification of default order by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 7, 2013 Filing 45 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant George A. Gainor has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant George A. Gainor is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 7, 2013 Filing 44 STIPULATION Extending Time To Answer by Benjamin Nachamie (Rubin, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2013 Filing 43 Request for Certificate of Default by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Cert of Default) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Leonard Landesberg's answer or motion is due April 3, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/7/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
March 7, 2013 REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time. re #42 Request for Certificate of Default. This appears to be a duplicate of #41 , which has been denied at this time. (Rios, Laura)
March 7, 2013 REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time. re #41 Request for Certificate of Default. Please attach a Proposed Order. (Rios, Laura)
March 6, 2013 Filing 42 Request for Certificate of Default by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 6, 2013 Filing 41 Request for Certificate of Default by Damion A. Martins (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 6, 2013 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the action against Yakov Perper, MD by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
March 6, 2013 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by Anna Krol. (Dembin, Nathan)
March 6, 2013 Filing 38 Amended Summons Issued as to Oleg Fuzolav, Michael Leibowitz, Andrew Miller, Mark Weber. (Bollbach, Jean)
March 6, 2013 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Leonard Landesberg. (Gruber, Eric)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER granting #36 Stipulation filed by William S. Kritzberg: Defendant William S. Kritzberg's answer or motion is due March 29, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/5/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
March 4, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by William S. Kritzberg (Magalhaes, Joao)
March 1, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H. Gruber on behalf of Leonard Landesberg (aty to be noticed) (Gruber, Eric)
March 1, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Michael Jones on behalf of Tatiana Sharahy (aty to be noticed) (Jones, Glenn)
March 1, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Michael Jones on behalf of Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC (aty to be noticed) (Jones, Glenn)
February 27, 2013 Filing 32 Amended Summons Issued as to Dante Brittis, Joseph C. Cole, Renat R. Sukhov, Mark Wilner. (Bollbach, Jean)
February 27, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Rubin on behalf of Benjamin Nachamie (aty to be noticed) (Rubin, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 27, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Vogel on behalf of SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Vogel, Justin)
February 27, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Leslie Zwerling on behalf of SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Zwerling, Andrew)
February 25, 2013 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Mitchell Ehrlich served on 2/21/2013, answer due 3/14/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 25, 2013 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. BAB Management Inc. served on 2/15/2013, answer due 3/8/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 25, 2013 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC served on 2/15/2013, answer due 3/8/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 25, 2013 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default and Affidavit of Service by Sky Medical Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service of Affidavit in Support od Certificate of Default) (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 25, 2013 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. William S. Kritzberg served on 2/6/2013, answer due 4/8/2013., Summons Returned Unexecuted by Sky Medical Supply Inc. as to William S. Kritzberg., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. William S. Kritzberg served on 2/6/2013, answer due 4/8/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Wayne Kerness, M.D.'s answer or motion is due on March 18, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 2/19/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
February 15, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wayne Kerness. (Murray, E.)
February 15, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Christopher Murray on behalf of Wayne Kerness (aty to be noticed) (Murray, E.)
February 13, 2013 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. George A. Gainor served on 2/5/2013, answer due 2/26/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Leonard Landesberg served on 2/12/2013, answer due 3/5/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Mitchell L. Weisman served on 2/12/2013, answer due 3/5/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Wayne Kerness served on 1/28/2013, answer due 2/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Anna Krol served on 2/5/2013, answer due 2/26/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Julio Westerband served on 1/28/2013, answer due 2/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Tatiana Sharahy served on 1/28/2013, answer due 2/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. served on 1/28/2013, answer due 2/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Nathan Zemel served on 1/30/2013, answer due 2/20/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 13, 2013 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Damion A. Martins served on 1/30/2013, answer due 2/20/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER re #9 Stipulation filed by Nationwide Management Inc.: Defendant Nationwide Management Inc.'s answer or motion is due on March 13, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 2/8/2013. (Suarez, Stephanie)
February 7, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. Nationwide Management Inc. served on 1/28/2013, answer due 2/18/2013. (Belinfanti, Stefan)
February 7, 2013 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Until March 13, 2013 by Nationwide Management Inc. (Douglas, David)
February 7, 2013 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Management Inc. (Douglas, David)
February 7, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Douglas on behalf of Nationwide Management Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Douglas, David)
January 23, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tatiana Sharahy. (Bollbach, Jean)
January 22, 2013 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Yakov Perper, Walter Ploski see document for all names (Bollbach, Jean)
January 14, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BAB Management Inc., Nationwide Management Inc., Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC, SCS Support Claims Services, Inc., Tatiana Sharahy. (Attachments: #1 SCS, #2 BAB, #3 Nationwide, #4 Patient Focus) (Bollbach, Jean)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle. Counsel for plaintiff(s) or plaintiff pro se is obligated to serve a copy of this order on each defendant. See order for further instructions.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 1/7/2013. (Lundy, Lisa)
January 7, 2013 Case Ineligible for Arbitration (Serret, Liliana)
January 4, 2013 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol)
December 27, 2012 FILING FEE: $ 350.00, receipt number 4653053025 (McMahon, Carol)
December 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sky Medical Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McMahon, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sky Medical Supply Inc. v. SCS Support Claims Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Osiashvili
Represented By: David S. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikael Oshiashvili
Represented By: David S. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksey Vayner
Represented By: David S. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Osi
Represented By: David S. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manager Defendant D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Nason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Zemel
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wilner
Represented By: Richard M. Asche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakov Perper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patient Focus Medical Examinations, PC
Represented By: Michael Adrian Battle
Represented By: Glenn Michael Jones
Represented By: Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha
Represented By: Cecilia Rose Ehresman
Represented By: Andrew P. Nitkewicz
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Represented By: Traci Money Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Kritzberg
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatiana Sharahy
Represented By: Michael Adrian Battle
Represented By: Glenn Michael Jones
Represented By: Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha
Represented By: Cecilia Rose Ehresman
Represented By: Andrew P. Nitkewicz
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Represented By: Traci Money Strickland
Represented By: Ariel E. Ronneburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Chikvashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damion A. Martins
Represented By: Douglas M. Nadjari
Represented By: E. Christopher Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Management Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Michael Jones
Represented By: David S. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Svetlana Osiashvili
Represented By: David S. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notary A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yak Aranbayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinay Das
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilian Bobelian
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ferrante
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Gusakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yin Faith Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Dejesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Sohn
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notary C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary J. Florio
Represented By: Peter J. Creedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larisa N. Mikver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Cole
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demit Karakizis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dante Brittis
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mat Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Ploski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manager Defendant B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAB Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Ross
Represented By: Peter S. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management Company E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Leibowitz
Represented By: Peter J. Creedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Nachamie
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bittar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelly Vayner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Krol
Represented By: Nathan Dembin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Freindlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Chiaromonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Landesberg
Represented By: Eric H. Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Mann
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Westerband
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Maurovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renat R. Sukhov
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iqbal Merchant, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlett Demarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manager Defendant C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eitan Dagan
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Ehrlich
Represented By: Gillian Barkins
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Zwerling
Represented By: Justin M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notary B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt