Speedfit LLC et al v. Woodway USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Aurel A. Astilean and Speedfit LLC
Defendant: Douglas G. Bayerlein and Woodway USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01276
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A. Matsumoto
Referring Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 134 Letter. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/14/2015. (Kandel, Erin)
October 19, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a third amended complaint is granted. Plai ntiffs shall file their Third Amended Complaint by October 23, 2015. The deadline to submit summary judgment motions is hereby adjourned without date. After defendant has responded to the Third Amended Complaint, the parties are referred to Magistr ate Judge Tomlinson to schedule a conference and set new deadlines for discovery. If the parties wish to schedule briefing for summary judgment motions after completion of discovery, they may request a pre-motion conference as provided in this court's motion practices. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/19/2015. (McNulty, John)
July 14, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2015. John Vodopia, Esq. appeared for plaintiffs and Kadie M. Jelenchick and Jeffrey N. Costakos, Esqs. appeared for defendant Woodway. The court heard oral argument from both parties on plaintiffs' motion to correct inventorship (ECF No. 110 ). For the reasons stated on the record, plaintiffs' motion is granted. (Court Reporter Charlene Heading.) (Alagesan, Deepa)
October 10, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendant Woodway's motions to dismiss or transfer plaintiffs' patent infringement claims in favor of the pending Eastern District of Wisconsin action are denied. Defen dant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' state law claims is denied as to the breach of contract, unjust enrichment, constructive trust and conversion claims, and granted as to the breach of fiduciary duty claim. Defendants shall answer the Ame nded Complaint within the time specified by the Federal Rules, and, per Judge Tomlinson's September 3, 2014 Minute Order, counsel shall contact Judge Tomlinson's chambers within three days to set the remaining discovery schedule. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/10/2014. (Alagesan, Deepa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speedfit LLC et al v. Woodway USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurel A. Astilean
Represented By: Thomas B. Decea
Represented By: Yenisey Rodriguez-McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speedfit LLC
Represented By: Thomas B. Decea
Represented By: Yenisey Rodriguez-McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas G. Bayerlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodway USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?