Cael Technologies (Pvt.) Ltd. v. Precise Voting, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Cael Technologies (Pvt.) Ltd.
Defendant: Precise Voting, LLC. and Votrite, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01470
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Referring Judge: E. Thomas Boyle
Presiding Judge: Leonard D. Wexler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 75 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds that Defendant VotRite's failure to obtain counsel constitutes a default and directs the Clerk of the Court to strike the A nswer from the docket, solely as it pertains to VotRite, and to enter VotRite's default. The Court further construes Plaintiffs Rule 12(c) motion as a motion for a default judgment and, as such, grants Plaintiff a default judgment against VotRit e on all of the claims contained in the Complaint. In addition, due to VotRite's Answer being stricken, the counterclaims pleaded by VotRite are dismissed. Plaintiff is directed to submit a proposed judgment, consistent with this opinion, within ten (10) days. Plaintiff is further directed to advise the Court, within ten (10) days,whether it intends to continue this action with respect to Defendants Precise New York and Precise Delaware. In the event Plaintiff does not intend to continue this action as to either of the remaining defendants, Plaintiff shall file a stipulation of discontinuance within ten (10) days. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 9/26/2016.) (Fagan, Linda)
December 5, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Dismiss Defendants' counterclaims is denied. Plaintiff may renew its arguments for dismissal on a motion for summary judgment at the close of discovery. Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 12/5/2014. c/m by cm/ecf. (Mahon, Cinthia)
February 12, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss: Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted to the extent that the Court applies the "injury rule" in determining when Plaintiff's copyright infringement claim accr ues. In doing so, any claim of copyright infringement based on acts allegedly taken by Defendants prior to March 20, 2010 is time-barred and hereby dismissed. To the extent that the Complaint alleges a claim for copyright infringement based on alleged acts by Defendants subsequent to March 20, 2010, it may proceed. In all other respects, Defendants' motion is denied. So Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 2/12/2014. (Minerva, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cael Technologies (Pvt.) Ltd. v. Precise Voting, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cael Technologies (Pvt.) Ltd.
Represented By: Padmaja Chinta
Represented By: Henry Joseph Cittone
Represented By: Adam D. Finkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precise Voting, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Votrite, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?