Trustees of Empire State Carpenters Annuity, Apprenticeship, Labor-Management Cooperation, Pension and Welfare Funds v. Syracuse Floor Systems, Inc. et al

Defendant: Commercial Floor Solutions, Inc., Syracuse Commercial Floors, Inc. and Syracuse Floor Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of Empire State Carpenters Annuity, Apprenticeship, Labor-Management Cooperation, Pension and Welfare Funds
Case Number: 2:2013cv01509
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra J. Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court Electronic ORDER granting 129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Electronic order granting 130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Calihan Law PLLC and Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP are hereby terminated for the reasons set forth in the attached opinio n. The motion to appear by telephone docketed at 132 is hereby deemed moot. Withdrawing counsel are hereby ordered to serve a copy of this docket entry and attached order on their former clients and all parties are directed to comply with the order and are reminded of the upcoming conference with the District Judge. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/17/2016. (Berson, Alison)
January 13, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: SO ORDERED that the Court is satisfied that the Report is not facially erroneous and therefore, the Report is adopted in its entirety. Accordingly, deft's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and compel arbitration is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/13/2015. (Florio, Lisa)
February 20, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: SO ORDERED that in light of the foregoing and the fact that the remainder of the plausible objections center around an executed CBA, or lack thereof, the Court declines to consider the rest of the Report until the existence of a written CBA i s resolved. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is to terminate defts' motion without prejudice to renewal until after the Court receives the alleged CBA between plaintiffs and SFS. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/20/2014. (Florio, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of Empire State Carpenters Annuity, Apprenticeship, Labor-Management Cooperation, Pension and Welfare Funds v. Syracuse Floor Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Floor Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Netanel Newberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse Commercial Floors, Inc.
Represented By: Netanel Newberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse Floor Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Netanel Newberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Empire State Carpenters Annuity, Apprenticeship, Labor-Management Cooperation, Pension and Welfare Funds
Represented By: Charles R. Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?