Kernan et al v. New York State Department of Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: James M. Kernan, Oriska Corporation and Oriska Insurance Company
Defendant: Eugene Benger, Edward R. Broton, Beth Cohen, Michael V. Imbriano, Benjamin M. Lawsky, Michael A. Mark, James Masterson, Howard D. Mills, III, New York State Department of Financial Services, Jon G. Rothblatt, Charles Buzz Sawyer, Jeffrey A. Stonehill and The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv03196
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 84 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motions to supplement the record on appeal (Docket Entries 84 and 98) are DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/29/2016. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 24 Motion for Leave to File; denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the foregoing reasons, the Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the State Defendants' motion to dismiss and Plainti ffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint are consequently DENIED AS MOOT. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint that provides a short and plain statement of their claims and that includes only simple, direct, a nd concise allegations within thirty (30) days of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiffs are warned that if the amended complaint does not comply with Rule 8, the Court will dismiss this action with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to pro se Plaintiff Kernan. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/31/2014. C/M; C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Pending before the Court are: (1) pro se Plaintiff James M. Kernan's proposed Amended Complaint (Docket Entry 17) and (2) the State Defendants' letter requesting that their pending motion to dismiss be deemed unopposed (Docket Entry 13). The Court REJECTS Mr. Kernan's proposed Amended Complaint; the original Complaint shall remain the operative pleading. The Court, however, DENIES the State Defendants' request to deem their motion unopposed. Thus, in an ab undance of caution, the Court sua sponte GRANTS Plaintiffs an extension through September 23, 2013 to oppose the pending motion to dismiss. No further extensions of Plaintiffs' time to oppose will be granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Kernan. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/9/2013. C/M; C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kernan et al v. New York State Department of Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Benger
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward R. Broton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Cohen
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Imbriano
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin M. Lawsky
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Mark
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Masterson
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard D. Mills, III
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Financial Services
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon G. Rothblatt
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Buzz Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Stonehill
Represented By: Ralph Pernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oriska Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oriska Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?