Webb v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Elizabeth Webb |
Defendant: |
Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01106 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Central Islip Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary R. Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Arthur D. Spatt |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 4, 2019 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the Defendants' 93 motion to strike the Unis Affidavit is granted. Paragraphs seven through 12 of the Unis Affidavit are stricken from the record and Dr. Unis is prohibited f rom testifying as an expert in those matters. Further, the Defendants' 97 motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 dismissing all of the Plaintiff's claims is granted. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the case. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/4/2019. (Coleman, Laurie)
|
February 12, 2018 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 80 Motion to Strike. For the reasons set forth above, the Defendants' motion to strike is granted to the following extent: (1) the Defendants are permitted to re-depose Dr. Unis; (2) Silverson Pareres & Lombardi is ordered to pay the Defendants' attorneys fees associated with the renewed deposition of Dr. Unis; and (3) Silverson Pareres & Lombardi is further ordered to pay the Defendants reasonable attorney's fees that the Defendants incurred in bringing this motion to strike. The Defendants motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 dismissing all of the Plaintiffs claims is denied without prejudice and may be renewed at the close o f the additional discovery period in conformance with this Court's Individual Rules. Discovery is re-opened for the sole purpose of re-deposing Dr. Unis. The Court respectfully refers this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown to set an expedited discovery schedule. SEE ATTACHED DECISION for details. It is SO ORDERED by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/12/2018. (Coleman, Laurie)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?