Thompson v. Spota et al
Plaintiff: AveMaria Thompson
Defendant: Robert Ewald, Thomas J. Spota and Kathleen Wagner
Case Number: 2:2014cv02473
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Arthur D. Spatt
Presiding Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the foregoing reasons. Plaintiffs (Dkt. 126) motion for reconsideration is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/24/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part 108 Motion to Seal. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/23/2018. (Cento, Patrick) (Main Document 113 replaced on 8/23/2018) (Ryan, Mary).
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 67 Motion to Compel. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/27/2017. (Roman, Joshua)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AFFIRMING ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: For the foregoing reasons, the March 31, 2015 Order is affirmed in part and reversed in part. Within 15 days of the date of this Order, plaintiff must file an amended complaint consistent with (1) the unchallenged aspects of the March 31 Order and (2) this Order. sO Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/15/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Spota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Spota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AveMaria Thompson
Represented By: Jason L. Solotaroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?