Oliva v. Brookwood Coram I, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Oliva
Defendant: Nancy Auerbach, Steven Auerback, Brookwood Coram I, LLC and Brookwood Management Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv02513
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Gary R. Brown
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: The Court now dismisses the Brookwood Action for failure to prosecute and noncompliance. The Court also dismisses the Fairfield Action for failure to prosecute and noncompliance. Though the Fairfield Action has not been pending for five years, Plaintiff failed to comply with this Court's September 27, 2019 Order and will not be granted additional leeway in the Fairfield Action simply because it is a newer case. Based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with the September 27, 2019 O rder, together with his prior actions, the Court finds it necessary and appropriate to dismiss the Fairfield Action for failure to prosecute and noncompliance. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that in forma pauperis status for the purpose of an appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to close both the Brookwood Action and the Fairfield Action and to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/15/2019. (CM to pro se plaintiff and judgment clerk) (Florio, Lisa)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS), the Court orders that this action be administratively closed until such time that plaintiff notifies the Court that he can actively participate in this lit igation. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report with the Court by May 28, 2019. Given the administrative closure of the case, plaintiff's letter motion to reconsider the appointment of counsel (ECF No. 102 ) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. SO Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/28/2018. (Civil Case Terminated.)(c/m to pro se) (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court denies plaintiffs request for a preliminary injunction. For the reasons set forth, the Court adopts Judge Shieldss Report and Recommendation in its entirety and denies plaintiffs motion for preliminary relief. (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/30/2016. (c/m to pro se) (Ortiz, Grisel)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 34 Motion to Compel. For the reasons set forth herein, plaintiff's motion for an order directing the Public Access to Court Electronic Records system (PACER) to (1) waive PACER fees he has incurred, (2) reactivate his PACER account and (3) waive future PACER fees while this litigation is pending is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/30/2015. (Petilla, Charlotte)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM & ORDER re: 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; re: 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO RENEW when the case is trial ready, of so warranted at that time. The Court certifies that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and in forma pauperis status is DENIED for the purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to forward copies of the Summonses, Complaint, and this Order to the U.S. Marshal Service for service upon the Defendants without prepayment of fees. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 5/15/2014. (C/M Plaintiff) (Nohs, Bonnie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliva v. Brookwood Coram I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Auerback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookwood Coram I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookwood Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?