Land v. Spizzota et al
Plaintiff: |
Dennis Land |
Defendant: |
Micheal Spizzota and Medical Staff |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv03175 |
Filed: |
May 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Central Islip Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Arlene R. Lindsay |
Presiding Judge: |
Joanna Seybert |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 9, 2014 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - In light of Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff a final opportunity to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with the guidance set forth in the Order not later that November 10, 2014. The Court certifie s pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is DENIED for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/9/2014. C/M (Valle, Christine)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, however the Complaint is sua sponte DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE fo r failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), 1915A(b)(1). Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an Amended Complaint no later than September 5, 2014. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) tha t any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is DENIED for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/5/2014. C/M (Valle, Christine)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?