Schultze Agency Services, LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Schultze Agency Services, LLC
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies LTD, NEC Corporation of America, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., NEC Electronics America Inc, AU Optronics Corporation America, CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., LG Display America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, NEC Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD, Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, Hitachi Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., LG Display Co., LTD., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.) Inc., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Hitachi Displays, LTD, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Case Number: 2:2014cv05875
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re: Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Case Closed. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/12/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 9, 2015 Filing 371 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hannstar Display Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (440) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. In light of the parties' representation that the matter has settled, the parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance by November 20, 2015, or failing that a status report by the same date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/26/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 23, 2015 Filing 370 Joint MOTION to Continue STIPULATION HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. (439) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/5/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 369 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Order Dismissing Parties re #367 Stipulation of Dismissal: Defendants CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD and CHI MEI Optoelectronics Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/21/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 17, 2015 Filing 367 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC (Iovieno, Philip)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (438) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation Pretrial Schedule in Exhibit A of (438) in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/4/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
September 3, 2015 Filing 366 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Stipulation (437) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
July 30, 2015 Filing 365 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
July 4, 2015 Filing 364 Letter Joint Letter re Trial Scheduling by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Order Dismissing Parties: The Court, having considered the stipulation of plaintiffs and certain defendants in these actions, and good cause appearing, orders as follows: 1) The actions filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp.; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. 2) Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. It is so Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/1/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 30, 2015 Filing 362 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Order Dismissing Parties: Party Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, terminated. The actions filed by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2) as against the following Defendant only: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/25/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Stipulation in (433) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (433 in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB) is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/25/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 24, 2015 Filing 360 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
June 15, 2015 Filing 359 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (431) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation in (431) of 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (430) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation in (430) in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Based on representations that the stipulating parties have entered into a confidential settlement agreement, stipulating parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance by June 30, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 11, 2015 Filing 358 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order Joint Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Smith, Kyle)
June 10, 2015 Filing 357 MOTION to Continue Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
May 28, 2015 Filing 356 Proposed Scheduling Order JOINT LETTER REGARDING TRIAL AND PROPOSED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hannstar Display Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Order Dismissing Parties: Re #354 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD. Party LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD. terminated. The Court, having considered the stipulation of plaintiffs and certain defendants in these actions, and good cause appearing, orders as follows: 1. The actions filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp.; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: LG Display Co., Ltd., and LG Display America, Inc. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. It is so Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/13/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB. (Ortiz, Grisel)
May 13, 2015 Filing 354 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Docket Entry (425) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/29/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 28, 2015 Filing 353 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR BIFURCATION BRIEFING by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (424) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation holding deadlines in abeyance in (424) in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/24/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 21, 2015 Filing 352 MOTION to Continue Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. 423 Briefing Schedule is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 10, 2015 Filing 351 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation re (421 in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB) Pretrial Conference - Final, NOTICE OF AGREED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #350 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas W. Zamiska TERMINATED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/10/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
April 9, 2015 Filing 350 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (Zamiska, Nicholas)
April 2, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/30/2015, before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Transcriber Tracy Gribben Transcription LLC, Telephone number 732-263-0044. Email address: Tracy@tgribbentranscription.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Cox, Dwayne)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER re 415 in 09-cv-04845 and 417 in 09-cv-04845 Letter, filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc. These applications are respectfully REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for disposition. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/2/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Posillico, Lauren)
March 30, 2015 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Zweifach on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (aty to be noticed) (Zweifach, Lawrence)
March 26, 2015 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart H. Singer on behalf of Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Singer, Stuart)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (419) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB by ABC Appliance, Inc., Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Mr. Singer is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/25/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
March 24, 2015 Filing 346 Letter to Honorable Joan M. Azrack and Honorable Gary R. Brown by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (Sanders, Joel)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the 3/27/15 conference is rescheduled for 3/30/15 at 2:00 p.m.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/24/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (McMorrow, Karen)
March 6, 2015 Filing 345 Letter to Honorable Joan M. Azrack by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person pretrial conference has been scheduled for March 27, 2015 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse to discuss joint pre-trial order and other matters. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/2/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
February 27, 2015 Filing 344 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Pretrial Order by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Exhibit Attachment E, #6 Exhibit Attachment F, #7 Exhibit Attachment G, #8 Exhibit Attachment H, #9 Exhibit Attachment I, #10 Exhibit Attachment J, #11 Exhibit Attachment K, #12 Exhibit Attachment L, #13 Exhibit Attachment M, #14 Exhibit Attachment N) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
February 13, 2015 Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Hartman on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hartman, Brett)
January 15, 2015 Case reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to the case. (Florio, Lisa)
January 12, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Fram on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #341 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Fram is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/12/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
January 9, 2015 Filing 341 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Fram Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7444042. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas Fram ISO, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
January 6, 2015 Filing 340 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie Sung on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Sung, Sophie)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #339 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Civ. R. 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/6/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
January 5, 2015 Filing 339 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas D. Fram Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7432793. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas Fram ISO, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part Docket Entry 409 of 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. The joint proposed order is granted to the extent that the due date for the joint proposed pretrial order is EXTENDED to February 27, 2015. Parties are directed to file detailed deposition designations by April 30, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/30/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #338 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Ms. Sung is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/29/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 23, 2014 Filing 338 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7418489. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung In Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit To Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice) (Sung, Sophie)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #337 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Civ. R. 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/19/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 337 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7408188. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung ISO Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung ISO Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Notice of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Sung, Sophie)
December 3, 2014 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean David Unger on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Unger, Sean)
December 3, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Prout on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Prout, Andrew)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #334 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Unger is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/3/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #329 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Prout is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/3/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 2, 2014 Filing 334 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7370596. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sean D. Unger in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Unger, Sean)
November 19, 2014 Filing 333 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:Status Conference held on 11/19/2014. Pretrial order due 1/30/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB(Posillico, Lauren)
November 19, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg D. Andres on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Andres, Greg)
November 17, 2014 Filing 331 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Conference Statement) by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Kim, Soo)
November 14, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Hockett, Christopher)
November 13, 2014 Filing 329 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Andrew G. Prout) Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7333330. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Prout, Andrew)
November 10, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee F. Berger on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Berger, Lee)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #326 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #327 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Berger is directed to register for ECF and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/10/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
November 7, 2014 Filing 327 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lee F. Berger Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7322842. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lee F. Berger, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Proposed Order) (Berger, Lee)
November 7, 2014 Filing 326 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lee F. Berger Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7322822. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lee F. Berger, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Berger, Lee)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #325 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., and CMO Japan Co., Ltd. Mr. Hockett is directed to register for ECF and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/6/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Order Dismissing Parties Party Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. terminated as to document#324.. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/6/2014. (Lundy, Lisa)
November 5, 2014 Filing 325 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher B. Hockett. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7316572. by CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Hockett, Christopher)
November 5, 2014 Filing 324 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
November 4, 2014 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mark Curran on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Curran, Christopher)
October 29, 2014 Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel S. Sanders on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (notification declined or already on case) (Sanders, Joel)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #321 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Mr. Sanders is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/28/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 27, 2014 Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joel S. Sanders Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7293982. by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Sanders, Joel)
October 27, 2014 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila Adams on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Adams, Sheila)
October 27, 2014 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas W. Zamiska on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Zamiska, Nicholas)
October 27, 2014 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Pollak on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Pollak, William)
October 23, 2014 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Brass on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (notification declined or already on case) (Brass, Rachel)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (391) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. The status conference for the all Associated Cases scheduled for October 27, 2014 is hereby ADJOURNED to November 19, 2014 at 11:00am. Parties are directed to appear as scheduled at Courtroom 840 in the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/23/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 22, 2014 Filing 316 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 27, 2014 by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (House, Holly) Modified on 5/18/2015 (Ortiz, Grisel).
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #315 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Ms. Brass is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/22/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 21, 2014 Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel S. Brass Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7280734. by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing) (Brass, Rachel)
October 21, 2014 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Lawrence Blumenstein on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (notification declined or already on case) (Blumenstein, Carl)
October 21, 2014 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Farschad Farzan on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Farzan, Farschad)
October 21, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Alan Nedeau on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation America, AU Optronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Nedeau, Christopher)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference has been scheduled for October 27, 2014 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 840 in the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #310 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Blumenstein is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/17/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #311 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Farzan is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/17/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #308 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Nedeau is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/17/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 16, 2014 Filing 311 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Farschad Farzan, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7268919. by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice application by Farschad Farzan, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 16, 2014 Filing 310 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl L. Blumenstein, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7268888. by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice application by Carl L. Blumenstein, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 15, 2014 Filing 309 Letter from William Isaacson re Request for Status Conference by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
October 15, 2014 Filing 308 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher A. Nedeau, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7265310. by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice admission of Christopher A. Nedeau, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER: GRANTING the Motion to Consolidate Cases (filed in 09cv4845 as doc. 382). Pursuant to the stipulation filed, upon the remand from the MDL Panel, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 11-cv-02903 (on remand 1:14cv5827), Schultze Agency Services, LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 11-cv-03168 (on remand 2:14-cv-5875), NECO Alliance LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 12-cv-00059 (on remand 1:14-cv-5831) should be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42 with Electrograph Systems, Inc., et al. v. Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, et al., Case No. 2:09-cv-04845 before Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on all parties appearing in the P.C. Richard & Son, Schultze Agency, and NECO Alliance LLC actions. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 5/6/2014. (Kaley, Regina) (Originally filed on 5/6/14 on 2:09cv4845-DRH-GRB) (Mahon, Cinthia)
October 9, 2014 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Covey on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Covey, David)
October 9, 2014 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Soo Yeon Kim on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Kim, Soo)
October 9, 2014 Cases associated: Create association to 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. Case Consolidated. (Mahon, Cinthia)
October 7, 2014 The case of Schultze Agency Services, LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation et al, has been transferred from Northern District of California to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 2:14cv5875 (DRH/GRB). PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must register for a cm/ecf login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov for guidance. (Mahon, Cinthia)
October 7, 2014 Filing 305 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 7, 2014 Filing 304 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-03856. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 6, 2014 This action is electronically remanded to USDC for the Eastern District of New York. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 3, 2014 Filing 303 Conditional REMAND ORDER to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 10/3/14. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURT (11cv3865, 11cv4119 AND 12cv1426) 9220 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 18, 2014 Filing 301 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Suggestion of Remand [Master Docket No. 9220] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS #274 , 9061 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #275 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS FOR WHICH THE PANEL WAS FIRST SOLD TO A THIRD PARTY MANUFACTURER #270 , 9056 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 297 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #296 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9202] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 7)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 296 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc re #275 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9201] (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 295 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #294 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #294 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 294 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #274 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 293 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #292 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9196] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #292 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 292 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #273 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9195] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 291 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC re #275 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case. [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 290 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC re #271 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Third Party Manufacturers [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 289 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #288 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #288 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 288 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC re #274 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON UNDISCLOSED CONSPIRATORS OR AFFILIATES #237 , 8921 signed by Judge Illston on 7/3/14 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 285 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #283 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING #242 , 8924 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 283 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation (MDL Dkt. No. 9141) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/30/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 282 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #280 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of #237 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9138] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibits BB and EE to Declaration of Lee F. Berger)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 281 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #279 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. #9135] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/26/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #278 , (9093 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #272 , (9059 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 278 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9093] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 277 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #276 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version [MDL Dkt. No. 9092] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (DUPLICATE OF MAIN DOCUMENTS - Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhbiit EE, #5 Exhibit FF)(Related document(s) #276 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 276 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #237 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9091] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 5, 2014 Filing 275 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, filed as MDL Dkt. No. 9070) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong with supporting Exs. A-I)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/5/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 274 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Docket Nos. 9061 and 9062] (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-48 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 273 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 272 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 271 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #270 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Public Version - Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. 9058] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 270 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 269 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Response re Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED Response (MDL Dkt. No. 9048) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal #243 , 8923 in 7-1827. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #241 , (8920 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen"), CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #235 , (8917 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 265 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying #257 , (8984) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Counsel shall take care to include the correct case numbers in it's filings, there were several incorrect numbers in the caption.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 9, 2014 Filing 262 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensation at Trial [MDL No. 9010] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 261 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #260 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O-1, #16 Exhibit O-2, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z-1, #28 Exhibit Z-2, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV)(Related document(s) #260 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 260 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [Master Docket No. 8991] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 259 Remark : (A) Defendants Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Dkt. No. 8916), filed March 18, 2014 in Case No. 3:11-cv-0624, will be withdrawn only with regard to the Stipulated Plaintiffs listed above. The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFone Wireless Inc.s claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; (B) Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (Dkt. No. 8915), filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida and California law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFones Florida law claim in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; and (C) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (Dkt. No. 8924) filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to the state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to the Sherman Act claims alleged by all plaintiffs (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims; Stipulating Plaintiffs are not dismissing, and will continue to prosecute, their claims against Defendants under the Sherman Act, withdrawing motions. (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 257 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC to File Under Seal portions of their opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh C)[MDL No. 8984](Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 256 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims (MDL Dkt. No. 8983) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Filing 254 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 8976) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Filing 253 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 16, 2014 Filing 251 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 250 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 7, 2014 Filing 248 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule (MDL Dkt. No. 8947) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/7/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 247 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 246 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.s Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (MDL No. 8923) filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 245 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (MDL No. 8917) filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 244 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds (MDL No 8920). filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 243 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Redacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #4 Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #5 Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #6 Redacted Exhibits 47-48, #7 Unredacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #8 Unredacted Exhs 1-18, #9 Unredacted Exhs 27-35, #10 Unredacted Exh 36, #11 Unredacted Exhs 37-38, #12 Unredacted Exh 39, #13 Unredacted 40-42, #14 Unredacted 47-48)[MDL No.8923](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 242 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brownstein ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 19-26, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 43-46, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 47-48)[MDL No.8924](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, IncAdministrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. 8920] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 240 DECLARATION of Weifan Wang in Opposition to #236 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Certification of Authenticity [MDL Dkt. 8919] filed byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Related document(s) #236 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 239 Declaration in Support of #236 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [MDL Dkt. 8918] filed byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63)(Related document(s) #236 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 238 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #237 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. 8922] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z, #26 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #237 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 237 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [MDL Dkt. 8921] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 236 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc Defendants' Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [MDL Dkt. 8916] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 235 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., HannStar Display Corporation. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8917), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Request to Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Request to Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Request to Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Request to Seal), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)[MDL NO. 8917](Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 234 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8915) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEN TE-HSIANG, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PO CHIU)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #232 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 232 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] OrderRegarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues [MDL No. 8879] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 28, 2014 Filing 230 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 1/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 13, 2014 Filing 228 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Track 2 Deadlines; MDL Dkt. No. 8849 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/13/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 19, 2013 Filing 226 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions in Track 2 8838 (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 11, 2013 Filing 224 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation America 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines in Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 27, 2013 Filing 222 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 8804 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 220 NOTICE by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 219 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation with Proposed Order of Dismissal; MDL Dkt. No. 8789 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 13, 2013 Filing 218 NOTICE by HannStar Display Corporation Notice of Withdrawal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 210 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 209 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 208 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); DKT No. 8636 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 20, 2013 Filing 207 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #204 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #202 , 8498 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re #201 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 204 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply With Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8553 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 29, 2013 Filing 203 NOTICE by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 202 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEPOSITIONS IN TRACK 2 [MDL DKT NO. 8498] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 201 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL DKT NO. 8497] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 13, 2013 Filing 200 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #198 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 24, 2013 Filing 198 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records"; MDL Dkt. No. 8350 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #193 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER ORDER FURTHEREXTENDING TIME TO MEET ANDCONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONSTO COMPEL 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 21, 2013 Filing 193 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 191 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8159 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #186 . (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re #179 . 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #156 . (7973) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re #179 . (8060) stipulation and proposed order re Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 12, 2013 Filing 186 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Hansen (Hansen, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra West Neukom (West Neukom, Sandra) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 7, 2013 Filing 181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel [MDL No. 8065] (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #169 . (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Filing 179 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8060 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #165 . (7987) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI: Stipulation with proposed order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (AMENDED DOCUMENT of 7984 by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #162 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #167 .(7999) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #166 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #165 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #164 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #160 . (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #157 . (7980) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Motions to Compel in Tweeter filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 170 NOTICE by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 169 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8035 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 30, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 167 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7999 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 166 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8000 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 165 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7989 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 164 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7988 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #158 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 162 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8001 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 161 Notice of Motion/Stipulation - AMENDED DOCUMENT by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Amendment to #159 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7987. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 160 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7985 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 159 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #161***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7984 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 158 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7983 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 157 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Motions to Compel (Roger, Kent) [MDL NO. 7980].(Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 156 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison) [MDL NO. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7895) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (150) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI extending deadline for depositions filed by Hitachi (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)(correct attachment for entry #7909) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #153 . (7919) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 16, 2013 Filing 153 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7919 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/16/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ***ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT *** ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7895) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (150) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI extending deadline for depositions filed by Hitachi (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #149 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 13, 2013 Filing 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Depositions filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 5/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 8, 2013 Filing 149 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Close of Fact Discovery with Respect to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. and Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. Depositions [MDL No.7866]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #147 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 23, 2013 Filing 147 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7770 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 146 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #143 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 144 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 14, 2013 Filing 143 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL No. 7652]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 12, 2013 Filing 142 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Schultze Agency Services, LLC [ MDL Dkt. No. 7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 1, 2013 Filing 140 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 10, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 21, 2012 Filing 137 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Schultze Agency Services, LLC Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 13, 2012 Filing 135 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 134 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 133 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 132 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 18, 2012 Filing 131 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint byHannstar Display Corporation. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 130 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.'s Answer to Schultze Agency Services, LLC's (Tweeter) Second Amended Complaint byChunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 129 Toshiba Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended Complaint Docket #63 and 67) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 128 Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended Complaint Docket #63 and 67) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 127 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended Complaint Docket #63 and 67) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 126 Toshiba America Electric Components, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint Docket #63 and 67) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 125 Hitachi Defendants' ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint by Schultze Agency Services, LLC byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 124 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint of Schultze Agency Services, LLC byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 123 Defendant LG Display America Inc.'s ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint Answer to Plaintiff Schultze Agency Services, LLC (on Behalf of Tweeter OPCO, LLC and Tweeter NEWCO, LLC)'s Second Amended Complaint byLG Display America, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 122 Defendant LG Display Co. Ltd.'s ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint Answer to Plaintiff Schultze Agency Services,,LLC (on Behalf of Tweeter OPCO, LLC and Tweeter NEWCO, LLC's Second Amended Complaint byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 121 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended) of Schultze Agency Services (Tweeter) bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 120 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended) of Schultze Agency Services (Tweeter) bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 119 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 118 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 117 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second) of Schultze Agency Services LLC on Behalf of Tweeter OPCO, LLC and Tweeter NEWCO, LLC bySanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 116 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended) (6755 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) byAU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 115 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 114 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byNEC Corporation of America. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 113 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 112 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 111 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 12, 2012 Filing 110 ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION (N/K/A CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION), CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., AND CMO JAPAN CO., LTD. TO SCHULTZE AGENCY SERVICES, LLC ON BEHALF OF TWEETER OPCO, LLC AND TWEETER NEWCO, LLC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Hon. Susan Illston granting (6460) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI for Extension of Time to Respond to Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint and Tech Data's First Amended Complaint.Associated Cases: 3:07-md-01827-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 14, 2012 Filing 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint and Tech Data's First Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Schultze Agency Services, LLC PROOFS OF SERVICE ON FOREIGN DEFEDANTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING NEC'S MOTION TO DISMISS(5459) (5460) (80) (81) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 2, 2012 Filing 105 CLERKS NOTICE: the motions to dismiss scheduled for argument on 8/3/12 are deemed submitted without argument. # 80 MOTION to Dismiss. # 81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. THIS IS A DOCKET TEXT ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/2/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 1, 2012 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart H. Singer (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 8/1/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 103 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 102 CLERKS NOTICE: Motion Hearing set for 7/13/12 is continued to 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint, #80 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 100 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 99 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 98 Request for Judicial Notice re #97 Reply to Opposition/Response NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re Track Two Plaintiffs' Scheduling Motion filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C-D to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 27, 2012 Filing 97 REPLY (re #92 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 26, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 19, 2012 Filing 93 RESPONSE (re #92 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order Re: Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 23, 2012 (pursuant to stipulation 5765 the following motions are set for 7/13/12.Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5460 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint, (5459 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint, (81 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (5707) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (88) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI continuing hearing on motion to dismiss from 5/25/12 to 7/13/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 22, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5459 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint, (80 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 18, 2012 Filing 90 REPLY (re #81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint ) filed byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 5/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 18, 2012 Filing 89 REPLY (re #80 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint ) filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 5/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 16, 2012 Filing 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Reply and Continuing Hearing Date Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 5/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. granting ( 5578 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #67 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting ( #106 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #83 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting ( #117 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #28 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #35 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 11, 2012 Filing 86 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Special Master Quinn's Order Regarding Subpoenas to John Metzler and applEcon LLC by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2012) Modified on 5/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 4, 2012 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint ) SCHULTZE AGENCY SERVICES, LLCS (TWEETER) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS TWEETERS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/4/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 4, 2012 Filing 84 RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint ) SCHULTZE AGENCY SERVICES, LLCS (TWEETER) OPPOSITION TO NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS TWEETERS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/4/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
May 2, 2012 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 26, 2012 Filing 82 Special Masters Order RE LG Display's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas to Applecon LLC and John Metzler (Hrg. 4-6-12). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 4/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 13, 2012 Filing 81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/4/2012. Replies due by 5/16/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Jessica Ourk, #2 Proposed Order)(Roger, Kent) (Filed on 4/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 13, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/27/2012. Replies due by 5/4/2012. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 4/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 5, 2012 Filing 79 RESPONSE to re #61 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 3, 2012 Filing 78 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #71 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Further Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #71 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 3, 2012 Filing 77 REPLY (re #71 MOTION to Compel ) Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 4/2/12 granting ( 5348 ) Stipulation to dismiss Samsung in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #74 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
April 2, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 30, 2012 Filing 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 73 REDACTION to #72 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #71 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E - F, #3 Exhibit G - H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J - K, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N - Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 72 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #69 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Exhibit A to Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #70 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 71 REDACTION to #70 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 70 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #69 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( 99 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #146 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #90 in 3:10-cv-05625-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co. Ltd., ( #111 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( 5304 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #68 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #124 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #88 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd... Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 23, 2012 Filing 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 22, 2012 Filing 67 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #64 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 3/22/12granting (5249) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (65) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI For Extension of Time To Respond and to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 21, 2012 Filing 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Extension of Time To Respond and to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 3/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal 5197 ( #62 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) . Signed by Judge Illston on 3/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012) Modified on 3/20/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 16, 2012 Filing 63 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 16, 2012 Filing 62 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 13, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
March 5, 2012 Filing 60 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Regarding Defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd.s Response to the First Amended Complaint. filed by Mitsui & Co (#4844 and #52) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING NEC DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (TWEETER) re #37 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2012) Modified on 2/24/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS (TWEETER) re #35 , #54 , #55 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2012) Modified on 2/24/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER attached in error. no new order with respect to this entry by Judge Illston signed on 2/21/12granting (4844) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (52) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012) Modified on 2/23/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 21, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #54 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 21, 2012 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESECHEDULE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 21, 2012 Filing 54 Joinder to #35 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Reply in Support Thereof (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #53 ) by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 2/21/2012) Modified on 2/22/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 21, 2012 Filing 53 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #54 . *** MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Reply in Support Thereof filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 2/21/2012) Modified on 2/21/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 21, 2012 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd.s Response to the First Amended Complaint. filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2012) Modified on 2/22/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #47 signed by Judge Illston on 2/13/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2012) Modified on 2/21/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 10, 2012 Filing 50 REPLY (re #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss In Part, Tweeter's First Amended Complaint ) filed byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 2/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 10, 2012 Filing 49 REPLY (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Schultze Agency Services, LLC's (Tweeter) First Amended Complaint ) filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 2/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 10, 2012 Filing 48 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REPLY (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Schultze Agency Services, LLC's (Tweeter) First Amended Complaint ) filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 2/10/2012) Modified on 2/10/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 10, 2012 Filing 47 Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 2/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 1, 2012 Filing 46 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 45 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - SCHULTZE AGENCY SERVICES, LLCS (TWEETER) OPPOSITION TO #37 NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS TWEETERS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/1/2012) Modified on 2/2/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (see entry No. 4708 and 44) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting (4693) Ex Parte Application in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (40) Ex Parte Application in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE ILLSTON ON 1/30/12. THIS IS A TEXT DOCKET ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 27, 2012 Filing 43 RESPONSE (re #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss In Part, Tweeter's First Amended Complaint ) filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 27, 2012 Filing 42 Request for Judicial Notice re #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss In Part, Tweeter's First Amended Complaint filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 27, 2012 Filing 41 RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Schultze Agency Services, LLC's (Tweeter) First Amended Complaint ) filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 27, 2012 Filing 40 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re36](tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/13/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 10, 2012 Filing 38 Request for Judicial Notice re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Schultze Agency Services, LLC's (Tweeter) First Amended Complaint filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 10, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Schultze Agency Services, LLC's (Tweeter) First Amended Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/27/2012. Replies due by 2/10/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 10, 2012 Filing 36 Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #34 filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 10, 2012 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss In Part, Tweeter's First Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/27/2012. Replies due by 2/10/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roger, Kent) (Filed on 1/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
January 10, 2012 Filing 34 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #36 . *** Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro In Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/10/2012) Modified on 1/11/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 16, 2011 Filing 33 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #29 . (#4282) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011) Modified on 12/12/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 7, 2011 Filing 31 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 6, 2011 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. Filed bySchultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 6, 2011 Filing 29 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re: 30(b)(6) depos (#4211) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting extension of time to respond to amended complaint re #25 . (#4203) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Tracy L. Cole and Michael E. Mumford (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 29, 2011 Filing 25 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. AND MITSUI & CO. (U.S.A.), INC. TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting withdrawal of motion (#20) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 7, 2011 Filing 23 Motions terminated: ( #3973, 3967 AND 3974) (18 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., (3967 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., (3973 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.., ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 22 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER WITHDRAWING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS, NECS MOTION TO DISMISS, SANYO CES MOTION TO DISMISS, AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tweeter's Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/3/2011. Replies due by 11/10/2011. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 19 Joinder to Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Tweeter Plaintiffs' Complaint by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/3/2011. Replies due by 11/10/2011. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. / Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Lazerwitz, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER (11-3856) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. to Respond to the Complaint and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 30, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McCann (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 15, 2011 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL re #9 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/8/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes Through its U.S. Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION to Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes Through its U.S. Counsel filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/8/2011. Replies due by 9/15/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne Nardacci, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Nardacci Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting extension of time to respond to complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 16, 2011 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, WAIVER OF SERVICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 8/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (Attachments: #1 standing orders and cmc order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
August 8, 2011 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:11-cv-03168. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 25, 2011 Filing 4 A certified copy of the JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order received from the USDC, NDCA, directing the transfer of this action under 28 U.S.C., Section 1407 to the NDCA for the reasons stated in the order of 4/17/07, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Susan Yvonne Illston. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the JPMDL. (Attachments: #(1) Transfer Letter Request) (Mahon, Cinthia) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 25, 2011 Case extracted and electronically transferred to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. MDL No. 1827 IN RE: TFT-LCD (FLAT PANEL) ANTITRUST LITIGATION. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Mahon, Cinthia) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 22, 2011 Filing 3 Emails received from the JPMDL regarding the filing of a conditional transfer order finalized and minute order re: MDL No. 1827 In RE: TFT-LCD (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation. No opposition to the transfer order was received and the order is directed to the Clerk of the USDC, NDCA for filing. The transferee clerk is directed to transmit a cert. copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (Mahon, Cinthia) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 7, 2011 Case Ineligible for Arbitration (Bollbach, Jean) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 1, 2011 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Major, Jasmine) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 1, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, LTD., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Major, Jasmine) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 1, 2011 Summons Issued as to AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, LTD., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. (Major, Jasmine) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]
July 1, 2011 FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 465303030970 (Major, Jasmine) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultze Agency Services, LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies LTD
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan CO., LTD
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: David M. Covey
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Sophie Sung
Represented By: Lee F. Berger
Represented By: Nicholas Fram
Represented By: Andrew G. Prout
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corporation
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Jason Bussey
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD
Represented By: Lawrence J. Zweifach
Represented By: Joel S. Sanders
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., LTD.
Represented By: Sophie Sung
Represented By: Lee F. Berger
Represented By: Nicholas Fram
Represented By: Andrew G. Prout
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.) Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, LTD
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Represented By: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schultze Agency Services, LLC
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Melissa B Felder
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: Christopher V. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?