Allstate Indemnity Company v. Collura et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, Bank of New York Mellon, Capital One Home Loans, LLC, Christine Collura, Paul Collura, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv05047
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Presiding Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 109 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion for summary judgment (D.E. 109) is GRANTED and BNY's cross-motion (D.E. 110) is DENIED. The Government is directed to submit an appropriate order to this Court regarding disbursement of the Proceeds. Upon such disbursement, the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and mark this case CLOSED. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/13/2020. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Reconsideration; For the foregoing reasons, Allstate's motion for reconsideration (Docket Entry 91) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Allstate is directed to deposit $69,596.04 with the Court within ten (10) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. The Colluras are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance dismissing their counterclaim against Allstate within fifteen (15) days of the date of th is Memorandum and Order. After the deposit of the Settlement Amount and submission of the stipulation of discontinuance, Allstate will be dismissed from this action. However, as discussed above, if Allstate seeks to withhold the recoverable depreciation of $4,013.86 until proof of repairs is submitted, it will remain a party to the case until that issue is resolved. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 2/5/2018. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM & ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; For the foregoing reasons, BNY's objections are OVERRULED, and the R&R is ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART. Plaintiff's motion to deposit funds (Docket Entry 56) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, Plaintiff may proceed under Statutory Interpleader but must deposit $363,000 with the Court. At that time, Plaintiff may request that it be discharged from the case. Plaintiff is directed to file a letter indica ting if it is willing and able to deposit $363,000 with the Court within ten (10) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Additionally, Plaintiff's motion for a default judgment (Docket Entry 59) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter default judgments against Capital One Home Loans, LLC and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/22/2017. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Collura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Karen Maria Berberich
Represented By: Rosa M. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Home Loans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Collura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?