Gilday et al v. SDS Telecom Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John W. Gilday, Kevin Harvey and John Doe and Jane Doe
Defendant: SDS Telecom Inc. and Sean Stevens
Case Number: 2:2015cv06962
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Gary R. Brown
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 26 Motion for Damages; adopting Report and Recommendations as to 29 Report and Recommendations: The Court adopts the R&R in its entirety. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff 9;s renewed motion for damages is granted and plaintiffs are awarded $19, 682.11, plus interest at the rate of 6% per annum from June 15, 2015 to the entry of judgment, against defendant SDS Telecom Inc. In accordance with the March 22, 2017 Order of the Court, the claims against defendant Sean Stevens are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 9/23/2019. (Gapinski, Michele)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : The Court adopts Judge Brown's R&R in its entirety. As to whether the additional materials submitted by Plaintiff warrant an award of damages, that matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Brown for Repo rt and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's renewed motion for damages is denied without prejudice; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Brown for a Report and Recommendation as to whether the additional materials submitted by Plaintiff warrant an award of damages. See attached. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 9/18/2018. (Gapinski, Michele)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : This Court adopts the February 28, 2017 Report and REcommendation of Judge Brown as if set forth herein. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for a default judgment against defendant SD S Telecom Inc. as to liability is granted, the motion for default judgment against defendant Sean Stevens is denied, and that an award of damages against defendant SDS Telecom Inc. is denied, with leave to renew. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/22/2017. (Gapinski, Michele)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilday et al v. SDS Telecom Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Gilday
Represented By: Stephen J Fraher
Represented By: James J. Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Harvey
Represented By: Stephen J Fraher
Represented By: James J. Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe and Jane Doe
Represented By: Stephen J Fraher
Represented By: James J. Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDS Telecom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?