Mindy Weiss Party Consultants, Inc. v. Carl et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mindy Weiss Party Consultants, Inc.
Defendant: Bernard Carl and Joan Carl
Case Number: 2:2017cv00850
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Referring Judge: Gary R. Brown
Presiding Judge: Leonard D. Wexler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Capuder on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Capuder, Douglas)
March 19, 2017 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Joan Carl. (Capuder, Douglas)
March 19, 2017 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Bernard Carl. (Capuder, Douglas)
February 17, 2017 4 Summons Issued as to Bernard Carl, Joan Carl, on 02/17/2017. (Fagan, Linda)
February 16, 2017 3 Proposed Summons. by Mindy Weiss Party Consultants, Inc. (Bensinger, Menachem)
February 16, 2017 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 16, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 16, 2017 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 16, 2017 Proposed summons is rejected; the defendants listed in the section that reads "To: (Defendant's name and address)" do not match the defendants in the caption of the complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9293486 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Mindy Weiss Party Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E) (Bensinger, Menachem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mindy Weiss Party Consultants, Inc. v. Carl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Weiss Party Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Menachem Mendel Bensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?