Flores et al v. Town of Islip et al
Plaintiff: Ana Flores, Rene Flores, Maria Magdalena Hernandez, Make the Road New York, New York Communities For Change and Magali Roman
Defendant: Islip Town Board, Suffolk County Board of Elections and Town of Islip
Case Number: 2:2018cv03549
Filed: June 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Gary R. Brown
Presiding Judge: Arthur D. Spatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction in its entirety Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/28/2019. (Bollbach, Jean)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SHORT ORDER: SEE ATTACHED. Therefore, the Plaintiffs are directed to file a letter that details the precise form of relief they seek in this proceeding (the Letter). The Letter must not be longer than one page and shall be filed on or before April 19, 2019. SO Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/18/2019. (Cubano, Jazmin)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM of DECISION & ORDER: SO ORDERED that the Islip Defendants' motion Dkt. 95 in limine is denied and the Plaintiffs' letter motion Dkt. 93 is granted. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 4/8/2019. (Florio, Lisa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores et al v. Town of Islip et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Flores
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Represented By: Debra Sue Cohen
Represented By: Gregory F Laufer
Represented By: Tricia Sophia Lindsay
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Amy Katherine Nemetz
Represented By: Paul Andrew Paterson
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Pernick
Represented By: Danielle Brittany Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Flores
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Represented By: Debra Sue Cohen
Represented By: Gregory F Laufer
Represented By: Tricia Sophia Lindsay
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Amy Katherine Nemetz
Represented By: Paul Andrew Paterson
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Pernick
Represented By: Danielle Brittany Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Magdalena Hernandez
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Represented By: Debra Sue Cohen
Represented By: Gregory F Laufer
Represented By: Tricia Sophia Lindsay
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Amy Katherine Nemetz
Represented By: Paul Andrew Paterson
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Pernick
Represented By: Danielle Brittany Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Make the Road New York
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Represented By: Debra Sue Cohen
Represented By: Gregory F Laufer
Represented By: Tricia Sophia Lindsay
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Amy Katherine Nemetz
Represented By: Paul Andrew Paterson
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Pernick
Represented By: Danielle Brittany Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Communities For Change
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Represented By: Debra Sue Cohen
Represented By: Gregory F Laufer
Represented By: Tricia Sophia Lindsay
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Amy Katherine Nemetz
Represented By: Paul Andrew Paterson
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Pernick
Represented By: Danielle Brittany Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magali Roman
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Represented By: Debra Sue Cohen
Represented By: Gregory F Laufer
Represented By: Tricia Sophia Lindsay
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Amy Katherine Nemetz
Represented By: Paul Andrew Paterson
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Pernick
Represented By: Danielle Brittany Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islip Town Board
Represented By: John Ryan DiCioccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Board of Elections
Represented By: Leonard G. Kapsalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Islip
Represented By: John Ryan DiCioccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?