Liranzo v. Recco Home Care Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ambar Liranzo
Defendant: Frank J. Recco and Recco Home Care Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03688
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #7 : The time for Frank J. Recco and Recco Home Care Service, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including September 14, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/15/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by Frank J. Recco, Recco Home Care Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation) (Davidoff, Philip)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ambar Liranzo. Recco Home Care Service, Inc. served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (Romero, Peter)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ambar Liranzo. Frank J. Recco served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018. (Romero, Peter)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Frank J. Recco, Recco Home Care Service, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank J. Recco, Recco Home Care Service, Inc., Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Ambar Liranzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romero, Peter) Modified on 6/26/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).
June 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liranzo v. Recco Home Care Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Recco
Represented By: Philip K Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recco Home Care Service, Inc.
Represented By: Philip K Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambar Liranzo
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?