Gismondi v. The Long Island Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Joseph J. Gismondi
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv04144
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arthur D Spatt
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2018 11:15 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/4/2018. (McMorrow, Karen)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (Alston, Karla)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit for The Long Island Railroad Company. (Alston, Karla)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 20, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 20, 2018 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10598496 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Joseph J Gismondi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (Vogt, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gismondi v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Karla R Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Gismondi
Represented By: Philip John Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?