Calixte v. Simpson et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Calixte, Jr.
Defendant: John R. Longo, Kenneth M. Cozza and Tova B. Simpson
Case Number: 2:2018cv04186
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Calixte, Jr. Kenneth M. Cozza served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018; John R. Longo served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018; Tova B. Simpson served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Ortiz, Grisel)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS), if service is not made upon the defendants by December 18, 2018, or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is to provide a copy of this Order to the defendants along with the summonses and complaint, and shall file proof of service with the Court. Plaintiff is required to advise the Clerk of Court of any changes of address. Failure to keep the Court informed of plaintiff's current address may result in dismissal of the case. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/10/2018. (c/m to pro se) (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 9/28/2018 Re: proposed summons issued. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kenneth M. Cozza, John R. Longo, Tova B. Simpson. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Pro Se Litigant to Pro Se Office dated 9/24/2018 Re: Proposed Summons for the Clerks Office to Issue. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Pro Se Litigant from Pro Se Office dated 9/19/2018 Re: This letter acknowledges receipt of your civil action(s). (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
September 17, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653132335 (Cox, Dwayne)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joseph Calixte, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calixte v. Simpson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Cozza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tova B. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Calixte, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?