Salinas et al v. Stewart Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jose Salinas and Karla Salinas
Defendant: Independent Printing Company (IPCO), PMC Printing Machinery Company Division, Thomas Industries Inc., Stewart Industries Inc. and Stewart Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv04451
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Steven I Locke
1 Judge: Arthur D Spatt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadia Del Toro on behalf of Stewart Industries, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Del Toro, Nadia)
August 8, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Kanellopoulos, John)
August 8, 2018 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2018: #1 No Additional Corrections) (Kanellopoulos, John).
August 7, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Statement and Exhibits served on David Grossman & Associates, PLLC, Frankini & Harms, Baxter Smith & Shapiro PC on 08/07/2018, filed by Stewart Industries, Inc.. (Xu, Jie)
August 7, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stewart Industries, Inc. (Xu, Jie)
August 7, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Stewart Industries, Inc. (Xu, Jie)
August 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stewart Industries, Inc. from Supreme Court, case number 611651/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-10639491) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Xu, Jie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas et al v. Stewart Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Printing Company (IPCO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC Printing Machinery Company Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jie Xu
Represented By: Nadia Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Salinas
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Salinas
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?