Conte v. The County of Suffolk
Plaintiff: Peter J. Conte
Defendant: County of Suffolk and The County of Suffolk
Case Number: 2:2018cv04543
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The County of Suffolk. (Mitchell, Brian)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order served on County of Suffolk on 09/04/2018, filed by Peter J. Conte. (Schweitzer, Timothy)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled to be held before the undersigned on 12/10/2018 is advanced to 10/22/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 at the Central Islip Courthouse. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/4/2018. c/ECF (Adell, April)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing served on County of Suffolk on 08/21/2018, filed by Peter J. Conte. (Schweitzer, Timothy)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter J. Conte. The County of Suffolk served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Schweitzer, Timothy)
August 14, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 12/10/2018 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The County of Suffolk. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 13, 2018 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; defendant was deleted and re-entered; then document entry #1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The County of Suffolk Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Peter J. Conte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna)
August 10, 2018 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number 0207-10650208 (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conte v. The County of Suffolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Suffolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Suffolk
Represented By: Brian C. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter J. Conte
Represented By: Timothy F. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?