Aptive Environmental, LLC v. Village of Floral Park, New York

Plaintiff: Aptive Environmental, LLC
Defendant: Village of Floral Park, New York
Case Number: 2:2018cv04690
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
0 Judge: Joseph F Bianco
1 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court has received defendant's letter requesting an extension of time to file its response and an adjournment of the hearing scheduled for October 4, 2018. Defendant states that it makes this request with the understanding that the temporary restraining order against defendant remains in full force and effect. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on consent, defendant's response is due by October 19, 2018, plaintiff's reply is due by October 26, 2018, and the hearing is rescheduled to November 5, 2018, at 1:15 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/21/2018. (Baum, Sabrina)
September 20, 2018 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Order to Show Cause presently returnable on October 4, 2018 by Village of Floral Park, New York. (Ryan, John)
August 31, 2018 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aptive Environmental, LLC. Village of Floral Park, New York served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Vuotto, Jonathan)
August 29, 2018 Featured Case ORDER: Based on the information Attorney Vuotto conveyed to Chambers regarding the Notice of Change of Address, the Court is vacating its 8/27/2018 electronic order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/29/2018. (McCuiston, Hannah)
August 27, 2018 Featured Case ORDER re #14 : The Court requests that a representative of Aptive Environmental, LLC sign off on the notice as well. Counsel may resubmit his filing once it complies with the Court's directive. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/27/2018. (McCuiston, Hannah)
August 24, 2018 Featured Case ORDER deferring ruling on #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; deferring ruling on #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court can rule on these motions, the Court requires that the original certificate(s) of good standing be forwarded to Chambers for review. Counsel is therefore directed to mail the original certificate(s) to the attention of the Hon. A. Kathleen Tomlinson, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, NY 11722. Once the Court has received the original certificate(s), it will rule on the motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/24/2018. (McCuiston, Hannah)
August 24, 2018 14 NOTICE of Change of Email & New Firm Contact Information by Jonathan P Vuotto (Vuotto, Jonathan)
August 23, 2018 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Of Jonathan Kelley Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10679895. by Aptive Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Vuotto, Jonathan)
August 23, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Of Jeremy Fielding Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10679890. by Aptive Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Vuotto, Jonathan)
August 23, 2018 11 Summons Issued as to Village of Floral Park, New York. (Bollbach, Jean)
August 22, 2018 10 Proposed Summons. by Aptive Environmental, LLC (Vuotto, Jonathan)
August 21, 2018 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Show Cause Hearing held on 8/21/2018, ( preliminary hearing for 10/4/2018 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1040 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (FTR Log #2:53-2:56.) (Bollbach, Jean)
August 21, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 10/4/2018 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1040 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. See document for detailsOrdered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/21/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)
August 21, 2018 7 Notice of Related Case; 18-cv-4711-DRH-ARL (Cox, Dwayne)
August 21, 2018 6 Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment for issuance of proposed TRO by Aptive Environmental, LLC. (Vuotto, Jonathan)
August 20, 2018 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco: CIVIL CAUSE FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF: Jonathan P. Vuotto, Jeremy Fielding,Jonathan D. Kelley, present. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT: No Appearance. Show Cause Hearing held on 8/20/2018 at 2:45 PM. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1040 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. (FTR Log #2:43-2:47.)(Ortiz, Grisel)
August 20, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER - The Court has received plaintiff's motion for an order to show cause for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. The parties shall appear on August 21, 2018, at 2:00 p.m., to address the order to show cause (and the request for a temporary restraining order). Any written response by the defendant with respect to the request for a temporary restraining order can be filed by 11:00 a.m. on August 21, 2018. Otherwise, counsel for defendant can state his position orally, along with counsel for plaintiff. Counsel for plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on defendant by close of business today. So Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/20/2018. (Valle, Christine)
August 20, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
August 20, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 25944 (Landow, Concetta)
August 20, 2018 2 Proposed Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Aptive Environmental, LLC. (Landow, Concetta)
August 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Village of Floral Park, New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Aptive Environmental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Aptive Enironmental, LLC's Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aptive Environmental, LLC v. Village of Floral Park, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Floral Park, New York
Represented By: John E. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aptive Environmental, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan P Vuotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?