DiGiovanni et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Christine Jenkins, Vito DiGiovanni, Sondra Reiss, Nancy Perry, Valentina Falco, Gloria Eaton and Fatema Tahan
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., McKesson Corp. and Merck & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv04720
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
1 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2018 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:18-cv-20101, filed 09/12/2018. (Florio, Lisa)
September 12, 2018 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
September 12, 2018 11 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 4): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 2, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Harvey Bartle, III. (Florio, Lisa)
September 12, 2018 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 4): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 2, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Harvey Bartle, III. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Florio, Lisa)
August 28, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 , #9 Motion to Stay. In light of Defendants' motion to transfer and consolidate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 before the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPMDL"), and upon a finding that good cause exists, the Court grants the request for a stay in this case pending the JPMDL's decision on the transfer motion. Accordingly, all proceedings and deadlines in this matter are stayed until the earlier of (1) a decision by the JPMDL, or (2) 10/30/18. To the extent either party seeks a further extension of this stay, such an application may be made by letter motion, not to exceed three (3) pages, and shall be submitted prior to the expiration of the term of this stay as set forth above. A control date conference is set for 11/8/18 at 11:15 AM in courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip courthouse. c/ECF Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 8/28/2018. (Disbrow, Sandra)
August 28, 2018 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint, Letter MOTION to Stay by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (McLaughlin, Matthew)
August 28, 2018 8 Letter MOTION to Stay by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (McLaughlin, Matthew)
August 28, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Gordon Possidente on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Possidente, Adam)
August 28, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Basil Lapre on behalf of McKesson Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Lapre, Eric)
August 28, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Philip Kurland on behalf of McKesson Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Kurland, Thomas)
August 21, 2018 4 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 18cv4720. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 21, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 21, 2018 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 21, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 513718/2018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0207-10672031) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Matthew T. McLaughlin, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7) (McLaughlin, Matthew) Modified on 8/21/2018 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiGiovanni et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Jenkins
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito DiGiovanni
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra Reiss
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Perry
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Falco
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Eaton
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatema Tahan
Represented By: Debra Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Represented By: Adam Gordon Possidente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: Eric Basil Lapre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Represented By: Adam Gordon Possidente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?