Brown v. The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York

Plaintiff: Kim M. Brown
Defendant: The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York
Case Number: 2:2018cv04931
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Civil Case Referral/Transfer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York. This case is automatically referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York, as it is related to plaintiff's pending bankruptcy case in that court (Case No. 18-72291) (Florio, Lisa)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(a) and the Standing Orders of Reference in this district, this case is automatically referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York, as it is related to plaintiff's pending bankruptcy case in that court (Case No. 18-72291). Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/10/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)cm by chambers
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
August 30, 2018 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05804. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) for referral to the bankruptcy court. This action is undertaken in the interest of justice and for the convenience of the parties. Plaintiffs motion to remand is denied without prejudice to its renewal in the bankruptcy court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/22/2018) (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Declaration and Memorandum of Law in response to Plaintiff's motion for remand and in support of transfer to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York served on Kim Moorning Brown; Stewart Lee Karlin, Esq.; and Robert L. Pryor, Esq. on 7/31/18. Service was made by MAIL upon Kim Moorning Brown, Stewart Karlin and Robert Pryor and CM/ECF upon Kim Moorning Brown. Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Remand., #16 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion . Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Sara C. Temes in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Remand., #16 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding)(Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Plaintiff Kim M. Brown, proceeding pro se, has filed a motion to remand this action to the Supreme Court for the State of New York, County of New York. (See Dkt. No. 15.) The Court will treat this motion as an opposition to Defendant's motion to transfer the case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Defendant is directed to file its opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand by July 31, 2018. Plaintiff shall file her reply, if any, by August 7, 2018. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 7/31/2018, Replies due by 8/7/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/23/2018) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND PURS. TO 28:1331, 28:1332, 28:1334, 28:1406, 28:1446, 28:1447, 28:1452, AND FED. RULE 9027; re: #15 MOTION to Remand. Document filed by Kim M. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION TO REMAND. Document filed by Kim M. Brown.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 14 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Kim Moorning Brown consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Kim M. Brown.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Pro se, by Kim M. Brown. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Reference to Motion to Dismiss filed in Adversary Proceeding captioned Kim Moorning Brown v. Great Lakes, et al; Adversary Proceeding No. 18-08058 (Bankr. E.D.N.Y.) addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Sara C. Temes dated July 16, 2018. Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York.(Temes, Sara) Modified on 7/30/2018 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant has filed a letter motion to expedite referral of this matter to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York. (Dkt. No. 7.) Defendant asks that this matter be referred to the SDNY Bankruptcy Court so that it may be transferred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York. However, the proper procedure for transfer to the EDNY Bankruptcy Court is for this Court to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, and for it to effect the referral to the EDNY Bankruptcy Court, where Plaintiff's bankruptcy proceeding is pending. Therefore, the parties are directed to state any objection to this Court's transferring the matter to the District Court for the Eastern District of New York by July 20, 2018. Counsel for Defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for Plaintiff by July 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/09/2018) (ama)[Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order served on Stewart L. Karlin, Esq.; Kim Moorning Brown; and Robert L. Pryor, Esq. on 7/10/18. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Therefore, the parties are directed to state any objection to this Court's transferring the matter to the District Court for the Eastern District of New York by July 20, 2018. Counsel for Defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for Plaintiff by July 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/09/2018) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Stewart Lee Karlin, Esq.; Robert L. Pryor, Esq.; and Kim Moorning Brown on 7/6/18. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Referral of Removed Action to SDNY Bankruptcy Court for further adjudication addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Sara C. Temes dated July 6, 2018. Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York.(Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 161215/2017..Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing, #4 Exhibit D - Stipulation for Time to Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Stipulation for Time to Answer, #6 Exhibit F - Notice to Clerk of Removal)(Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order served on Stewart Lee Karlin, Esq. on 6/29/18. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Temes, Sara) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on June 27, 2018. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than July 19, 2018. Counsel for the defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by July 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/28/2018) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sara Christin Temes. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kim M. Brown; The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sara Christin Temes. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Onondaga;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sara Christin Temes to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jurisdiction Code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Sara Christin Temes to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits to pleading must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Relatedness)(Temes, Sara) Modified on 6/28/2018 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 161215/2017. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15254468).Document filed by The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F)(Temes, Sara) Modified on 6/28/2018 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trustees of Teachers College of Columbia University in the City of New York
Represented By: Sara Christin Temes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?