Nowak v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: Martin-Piotr Nowak
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 2:2018cv04972
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. The parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule: Defendant shall submit its motion by November 26, 2018; Pro Se plaintiff shall submit her response by December 28, 2018; and Deft shall submit its reply by 1/14/19 Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/25/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)cm by chambers
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for Defendant's Proposed Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 8, 12(b)(6), and 41(b) by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Scibetta, Brian)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #9 : The time for JPMorgan Chase & Co. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including October 25, 2018. Counsel for the moving party is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the plaintiff upon receipt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/3/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Scibetta, Brian)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase & Co. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Scibetta, Brian)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Peter Scibetta on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co. (aty to be noticed) (Scibetta, Brian)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Bollbach, Jean)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED if service is not made upon the defendant by November 29, 2018, or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is to provide a copy of this Order to the defendant along with the summons and complaint, and shall file proof of service with the Court. Plaintiff is required to advise the Clerk of Court of any change of address. Failure to keep the Court informed of plaintiffs current address may result in dismissal of the case. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 9/6/2018. (Bollbach, Jean)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Letter dtd 9/4/18 from pro se office to pro se RE: this will acknowledge receipt of your civil action (Bollbach, Jean)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
September 4, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 26023 (Cox, Dwayne)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Cox, Dwayne)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase & Co. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Martin-Piotr Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Notice To Clerk, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowak v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Brian Peter Scibetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin-Piotr Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?