Abitmass, LLC v. Incorporated Village of Patchogue et. al.

Plaintiff: Abitmass, LLC
Defendant: Peter Sarich, Planning Department of the Village of Patchogue, Incorporated Village of Patchogue, Carol Giglio, Building Department of the Village of Patchogue and The Planning Department of the Village of Patchogue
Case Number: 2:2018cv05035
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Sokoloff on behalf of Building Department of the Village of Patchogue, Carol Giglio, Incorporated Village of Patchogue, Peter Sarich, The Planning Department of the Village of Patchogue (aty to be noticed) (Sokoloff, Brian)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Building Department of the Village of Patchogue, Carol Giglio, Incorporated Village of Patchogue, Peter Sarich, The Planning Department of the Village of Patchogue. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Abitmass, LLC (Stern, Fredrick)
September 12, 2018 Proposed summons is rejected; the caption on the summons does not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider with the exact copied and pasted Caption as appears on the Complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Abitmass, LLC (Stern, Fredrick)
September 7, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 6, 2018 Proposed summons is rejected for the following reasons: the caption on the summons does not match the caption of the Complaint; specifically, if you use "et. al." you must attach a rider; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect caption and the date on the summons is incorrect as it is added by the Clerk's Office as of the date of issuance (please leave the date blank); the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect date. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10705811 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Abitmass, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stern, Fredrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abitmass, LLC v. Incorporated Village of Patchogue et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abitmass, LLC
Represented By: Fredrick Paul Stern
Represented By: Richard I. Scheyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Sarich
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning Department of the Village of Patchogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incorporated Village of Patchogue
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Giglio
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Department of the Village of Patchogue
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Planning Department of the Village of Patchogue
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?